EP2559177 - TRANSPORT STREAM PROVIDER, DAB SIGNAL PROVIDER, TRANSPORT STREAM ANALYZER, DAB RECEIVER, METHOD, COMPUTER PROGRAM AND TRANSPORT STREAM SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARTEL-KURZ, Birgit Fichtestr. 21 91054 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
DÖHLA, Stefan Hartmannstr. 47a 91052 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
PROSCH, Markus Max-Busch-Strasse 6 91054 Erlangen / DE | [2013/08] | Representative(s) | Burger, Markus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstraße 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | Burger, Markus, et al Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann Stöckeler Zinkler & Partner Hermann-Roth-Weg 1 82049 Pullach / DE | Application number, filing date | 11720099.8 | 17.05.2011 | WO2011EP57975 | Priority number, date | EP20110153693 | 08.02.2011 Original published format: EP 11153693 | DE20101029114 | 19.05.2010 Original published format: DE102010029114 | [2013/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011144615 | Date: | 24.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2559177 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2559177 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04H60/15, H04N21/647 | [2013/41] | CPC: |
H04H60/15 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/4405 (US);
H04N21/236 (US);
H04N21/2362 (US);
H04N21/266 (US);
H04N21/26606 (US);
H04N21/4381 (US);
H04N21/43853 (US);
H04N21/442 (US);
H04N21/4623 (US);
H04N21/4627 (US);
H04N21/647 (US);
H04N21/8352 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/08] | H04H60/15 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSPORTSTROM-BEREITSTELLER, DAB-SIGNAL-BEREITSTELLER, TRANSPORTSTROM-ANALYSIERER, DAB-EMPFÄNGER, VERFAHREN, COMPUTERPROGRAMM UND TRANSPORTSTROM-SIGNAL | [2013/08] | English: | TRANSPORT STREAM PROVIDER, DAB SIGNAL PROVIDER, TRANSPORT STREAM ANALYZER, DAB RECEIVER, METHOD, COMPUTER PROGRAM AND TRANSPORT STREAM SIGNAL | [2013/08] | French: | FOURNISSEUR DE FLUX DE TRANSPORT, FOURNISSEUR DE SIGNAL DAB, ANALYSEUR DE FLUX DE TRANSPORT, RÉCEPTEUR DAB, PROCÉDÉ, PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE ET SIGNAL DE FLUX DE TRANSPORT | [2013/08] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/08] | 17.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.05.2011 | AL | 19.03.2014 | CY | 19.03.2014 | CZ | 19.03.2014 | DK | 19.03.2014 | EE | 19.03.2014 | FI | 19.03.2014 | HR | 19.03.2014 | LT | 19.03.2014 | LV | 19.03.2014 | MC | 19.03.2014 | MK | 19.03.2014 | MT | 19.03.2014 | RO | 19.03.2014 | RS | 19.03.2014 | SE | 19.03.2014 | SI | 19.03.2014 | SK | 19.03.2014 | SM | 19.03.2014 | IE | 17.05.2014 | LU | 17.05.2014 | BE | 31.05.2014 | CH | 31.05.2014 | LI | 31.05.2014 | BG | 19.06.2014 | NO | 19.06.2014 | GR | 20.06.2014 | IS | 19.07.2014 | PT | 21.07.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 17.05.2011 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
MK | 19.03.2014 | ||
MT | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
SM | 19.03.2014 | ||
IE | 17.05.2014 | ||
LU | 17.05.2014 | ||
BE | 31.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 17.05.2011 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
MT | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
SM | 19.03.2014 | ||
IE | 17.05.2014 | ||
LU | 17.05.2014 | ||
BE | 31.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
MT | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
SM | 19.03.2014 | ||
IE | 17.05.2014 | ||
LU | 17.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
MT | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
SM | 19.03.2014 | ||
IE | 17.05.2014 | ||
LU | 17.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
MT | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
IE | 17.05.2014 | ||
LU | 17.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
IE | 17.05.2014 | ||
LU | 17.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
IE | 17.05.2014 | ||
LU | 17.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
LU | 17.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
LU | 17.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/04] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
LU | 17.05.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 19.03.2014 | |
NO | 19.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [YD] - "Digital Audio Broadcasting (DAB); DMB video services; User application specification", ETSI TS 102 428 VL.2.1, (20090430), XP002664297 [YD] 1-21 * the whole document * | [YD] - "Digital Video Broadcasting (DVB); Support for use of scrambling and Conditional Access (CA) within digital broadcast systems", ETSI, ETR 289, (199610), XP002664298 [YD] 1-21 * the whole document * |