EP2572415 - DOOR ASSEMBLY FOR AN INSTRUMENT CABINET AND METHOD FOR CHANGING A STOP SIDE OF A DOOR ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Technology Solutions Intellectual Property GmbH Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | [2013/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBERLING, Toni Ulmenstrasse 16 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | [2013/13] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2014/36] |
Former [2013/13] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11720300.0 | 19.05.2011 | WO2011EP58188 | Priority number, date | DE20101050965 | 10.11.2010 Original published format: DE102010050965 | DE20101021166 | 21.05.2010 Original published format: DE102010021166 | [2013/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011144708 | Date: | 24.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2572415 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2572415 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H02B1/38, E05B63/04, E05D15/50, E05B7/00, E05C9/04, // E05B1/00 | [2014/20] | CPC: |
E05B7/00 (EP,US);
E05D15/507 (US);
E05B63/04 (EP,US);
E05C9/043 (EP,US);
E05D15/502 (EP,US);
H02B1/38 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/13] | H02B1/38, E05B63/04, E05D15/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TÜRANORDNUNG FÜR EINEN GERÄTESCHRANK UND VERFAHREN ZUM ÄNDERN EINER ANSCHLAGSSEITE EINER TÜRANORDNUNG | [2013/13] | English: | DOOR ASSEMBLY FOR AN INSTRUMENT CABINET AND METHOD FOR CHANGING A STOP SIDE OF A DOOR ASSEMBLY | [2013/13] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE PORTE POUR UNE ARMOIRE D'APPAREILS ET PROCÉDÉ POUR INVERSER LE SENS D'OUVERTURE DE PORTE | [2014/20] |
Former [2013/13] | AGENCEMENT DE PORTE POUR UNE ARMOIRE D'APPAREILS ET PROCÉDÉ POUR MODIFIER UN CÔTÉ DE FEUILLURE D'UN AGENCEMENT DE PORTE | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/13] | 29.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.05.2011 | AL | 03.09.2014 | BG | 03.09.2014 | CY | 03.09.2014 | CZ | 03.09.2014 | DK | 03.09.2014 | EE | 03.09.2014 | ES | 03.09.2014 | FI | 03.09.2014 | HR | 03.09.2014 | IT | 03.09.2014 | LT | 03.09.2014 | LV | 03.09.2014 | MC | 03.09.2014 | MK | 03.09.2014 | MT | 03.09.2014 | NL | 03.09.2014 | PL | 03.09.2014 | RO | 03.09.2014 | RS | 03.09.2014 | SE | 03.09.2014 | SI | 03.09.2014 | SK | 03.09.2014 | SM | 03.09.2014 | TR | 03.09.2014 | NO | 03.12.2014 | GR | 04.12.2014 | IS | 03.01.2015 | PT | 05.01.2015 | IE | 19.05.2015 | LU | 19.05.2015 | BE | 31.05.2015 | CH | 31.05.2015 | LI | 31.05.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 19.05.2011 | |
BG | 03.09.2014 | ||
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
MK | 03.09.2014 | ||
MT | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
SM | 03.09.2014 | ||
TR | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
IE | 19.05.2015 | ||
LU | 19.05.2015 | ||
BE | 31.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 19.05.2011 | |
BG | 03.09.2014 | ||
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
MT | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
SM | 03.09.2014 | ||
TR | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
IE | 19.05.2015 | ||
LU | 19.05.2015 | ||
BE | 31.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
MT | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
IE | 19.05.2015 | ||
LU | 19.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
IE | 19.05.2015 | ||
LU | 19.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
LU | 19.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 03.09.2014 | |
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 03.09.2014 | |
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 03.09.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0891027 (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SA [FR]) [A] 1,3,5,6,8,10 * abstract *; | [A]EP1274158 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,3,5,6,8,10 * abstract *; | [A]DE20216744U (RITTAL GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,3,5,6,8,10* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US2003080567 (PEACOCK JAMES LARRY [US], et al) [A] 1,3,5,6,8,10 * abstract *; | [A]DE102007012980 (RITTAL RCS COMM SYSTEMS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,3,5,6,8,10 * abstract * | by applicant | DE102007012980 |