EP2577601 - Providing a watermarked decoded audio or video signal derived from a watermarked audio or video signal that was low bit rate encoded and decoded [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/15] | PROVIDING A WATERMARKED DECODED AUDIO OR VIDEO SIGNAL DERIVED FROM A WATERMARKED AUDIO OR VIDEO SIGNAL THAT WAS LOW BIT RATE ENCODED AND DECODED | ||
[2016/43] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.2017 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIES, Ulrich Friedenauer Str. 20b 30419 Hannover / DE | 02 /
BAUM, Peter, Georg Aschendorfer Str. 25 30539 Hannover / DE | 03 /
ARNOLD, Michael Eichendorffstr. 1b 30916 Isernhagen / DE | 04 /
VOESSING, Walter Remarqueweg 23 30455 Hannover / DE | [2013/15] | Representative(s) | Huchet, Anne, et al TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Hartnack, Wolfgang Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 11720470.1 | 18.05.2011 | WO2011EP58037 | Priority number, date | EP20100305579 | 02.06.2010 Original published format: EP 10305579 | [2013/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011151178 | Date: | 08.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2577601 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06T1/00, G10L19/00, H04L9/18 | [2013/15] | CPC: |
G06T1/005 (EP,KR,US);
H04N5/913 (KR);
G10L19/00 (KR);
G10L19/018 (EP,KR,US);
H04L9/065 (KR);
H04L2209/608 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Title | German: | Bereitstellung eines mit Wasserzeichen versehen, decodierten Audio- oder Videosignals aus einem mit Wasserzeichen versehenem Audio- oder Videosignal, das durch eine niedrige Bitrate codiert und decodiert wurde | [2016/43] | English: | Providing a watermarked decoded audio or video signal derived from a watermarked audio or video signal that was low bit rate encoded and decoded | [2016/43] | French: | Fourniture d'un signal audio ou vidéo de filigrane décodé dérivé d'un signal audio ou vidéo de filigrane qui était codé à faible débit binaire et décodé | [2016/43] |
Former [2013/15] | BEREITSTELLUNG EINES MIT WASSERZEICHEN VERSEHENEN, DECODIERTEN AUDIO- ODER VIDEOSIGNALS AUS EINEM MIT WASSERZEICHEN VERSEHENEM AUDIO- ODER VIDEOSIGNAL, DAS DURCH EINE NIEDRIGE BITRATE CODIERT UND DECODIERT WURDE | ||
Former [2013/15] | PROVIDING A WATERMARKED DECODED AUDIO OR VIDEO SIGNAL DERIVED FROM A WATERMARKED AUDIO OR VIDEO SIGNAL THAT WAS LOW BIT RATE ENCODED AND DECODED | ||
Former [2013/15] | FOURNITURE D'UN SIGNAL AUDIO OU VIDÉO DÉCODÉ FILIGRANÉ DÉRIVÉ D'UN SIGNAL AUDIO OU VIDÉO FILIGRANÉ QUI A ÉTÉ CODÉ ET DÉCODÉ À FAIBLE DÉBIT BINAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 24.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/33] | 31.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2007057813 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [I] - KARTHIK K ET AL, "Video Fingerprinting and Encryption Principles for Digital Rights Management", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, IEEE. NEW YORK, US LNKD- DOI:10.1109/JPROC.2004.827356, (20040601), vol. 92, no. 6, ISSN 0018-9219, pages 918 - 932, XP011112769 [I] 1-10 * abstract * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JPROC.2004.827356 |