EP2536583 - INDUSTRIAL VEHICLE WITH A HYBRID DRIVE AND CONTINUOUS VARIABLE TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Movimatica SRL Via Maestri del Lavoro 1 12010 Cervasca (Cuneo) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | For all designated states Movimatica SRL Via Maestri del Lavoro 1 12010 Cervasca / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOMA', Aurelio c/o Movimatica S.r.l. Via Maestri del Lavoro 1 I-12010 Cervasca / IT | 02 /
BOSSO, Nicola c/o Movimatica S.r.l. Via Maestri del Lavoro 1 I-12010 Cervasca / IT | 03 /
MERLO, Amilcare c/o Movimatica S.r.l. Via Maestri del Lavoro 1 I-12010 Cervasca / IT | [2012/52] | Representative(s) | Bergadano, Mirko, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2013/23] |
Former [2012/52] | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 11721354.6 | 17.02.2011 | WO2011IB00298 | Priority number, date | IT2010TO00118 | 17.02.2010 Original published format: IT TO20100118 | [2012/52] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011101726 | Date: | 25.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2536583 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2536583 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60K6/365, B60K6/48 | [2012/52] | CPC: |
B60L7/18 (EP);
B60K6/387 (EP);
B60K6/442 (EP);
B60K6/445 (EP);
B60L50/16 (EP);
Y02T10/62 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NUTZFAHRZEUG MIT EINEM HYBRIDANTRIEB UND EINEM STUFENLOSEN GETRIEBE | [2012/52] | English: | INDUSTRIAL VEHICLE WITH A HYBRID DRIVE AND CONTINUOUS VARIABLE TRANSMISSION | [2012/52] | French: | VEHICULE INDUSTRIEL A COMMANDE HYBRIDE ET TRANSMISSION A VARIATION CONTINUE | [2014/20] |
Former [2012/52] | VÉHICULE INDUSTRIEL À COMMANDE HYBRIDE ET TRANSMISSION À VARIATION CONTINUE | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/52] | 03.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.02.2011 | AL | 24.09.2014 | AT | 24.09.2014 | BG | 24.09.2014 | CY | 24.09.2014 | CZ | 24.09.2014 | DK | 24.09.2014 | EE | 24.09.2014 | ES | 24.09.2014 | FI | 24.09.2014 | HR | 24.09.2014 | LT | 24.09.2014 | LV | 24.09.2014 | MC | 24.09.2014 | MK | 24.09.2014 | MT | 24.09.2014 | NL | 24.09.2014 | PL | 24.09.2014 | RO | 24.09.2014 | RS | 24.09.2014 | SE | 24.09.2014 | SI | 24.09.2014 | SK | 24.09.2014 | SM | 24.09.2014 | TR | 24.09.2014 | NO | 24.12.2014 | GR | 25.12.2014 | IS | 24.01.2015 | PT | 26.01.2015 | IE | 17.02.2015 | LU | 17.02.2015 | BE | 28.02.2015 | CH | 28.02.2015 | LI | 28.02.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 17.02.2011 | |
AT | 24.09.2014 | ||
BG | 24.09.2014 | ||
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
MK | 24.09.2014 | ||
MT | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
SM | 24.09.2014 | ||
TR | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
IE | 17.02.2015 | ||
LU | 17.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 17.02.2011 | |
AT | 24.09.2014 | ||
BG | 24.09.2014 | ||
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
MT | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
SM | 24.09.2014 | ||
TR | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
IE | 17.02.2015 | ||
LU | 17.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
MT | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
IE | 17.02.2015 | ||
LU | 17.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
IE | 17.02.2015 | ||
LU | 17.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
IE | 17.02.2015 | ||
LU | 17.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
LU | 17.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
LU | 17.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/44] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
LU | 17.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
HR | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
RS | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 24.09.2014 | |
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
NO | 24.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 24.09.2014 | |
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 24.09.2014 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US2002091028 (KASHIWASE HAJIME [JP]) [AD] 1-9 * paragraphs [0027] - [0030] - [0097] - [0099]; figure 17; claim 1 *; | [A]US2005061564 (KUANG MING LANG [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * figures 3-7; claim 1 *; | [A]US2002082136 (ENDO HIROATSU [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0047] - [0049]; figure 5 * | by applicant | US2002091028 |