EP2563527 - METHODS FOR FORMING A CONNECTION WITH A MICROMACHINED ULTRASONIC TRANSDUCER, AND ASSOCIATED APPARATUSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research Triangle Institute 3040 Cornwallis Road P.O. Box 12194 Research Triangle Park, North Carolina 27709 / US | [2013/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAUSCH, David 1721 Wescott Drive Raleigh, North Carolina 27614 / US | 02 /
CARLSON, Jim 4109 Kettering Drive Durham, North Carolina 27713 / US | 03 /
SANDERS, Christopher Brewer 1116 Hawk Hollow Lane Wake Forest, North Carolina 27587 / US | 04 /
GOODWIN, Scott H. 520 Pleasant Green Road Hillsborough, North Carolina 27278 / US | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 11721596.2 | 22.04.2011 | WO2011US33579 | Priority number, date | US20100329258P | 29.04.2010 Original published format: US 329258 P | [2013/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011139602 | Date: | 10.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2563527 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B06B1/06, G10K11/00, H01L41/047 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
B06B1/0622 (EP,US);
H10N30/87 (KR);
A61B8/4494 (US);
A61B8/4444 (US);
B06B1/06 (KR);
G10K11/00 (KR);
G10K11/002 (EP,US);
H10N30/06 (EP,US);
H10N30/082 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER VERBINDUNG MIT EINEM MIKROGEFERTIGTEN ULTRASCHALLWANDLER UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2013/10] | English: | METHODS FOR FORMING A CONNECTION WITH A MICROMACHINED ULTRASONIC TRANSDUCER, AND ASSOCIATED APPARATUSES | [2013/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉS POUR FORMER UNE CONNEXION À UN TRANSDUCTEUR ULTRASONIQUE MICRO-USINÉ, ET APPAREILS ASSOCIÉS | [2013/10] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 01.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/15] | 27.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6308389 (TEZUKA SATORU [JP]); | [AD]US2006238067 (DAUSCH DAVID E [US]); | [A]US2009001853 (ADACHI HIDEO [JP], et al) | by applicant | US7449821 | US20100299514 |