EP2569893 - DAI DESIGNS FOR FDD CARRIER AGGREGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2013/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUO, Xiliang 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Wanshi 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
GAAL, Peter 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
MONTOJO, Juan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
DAMNJANOVIC, Aleksandar 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2013/12] | Representative(s) | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2019/18] |
Former [2013/12] | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11721924.6 | 13.05.2011 | [2019/18] | WO2011US36550 | Priority number, date | US201113106699 | 12.05.2011 Original published format: US201113106699 | US20100345013P | 14.05.2010 Original published format: US 345013 P | [2013/13] |
Former [2013/12] | US20110106699 | 12.05.2011 | |
US20100345013P | 14.05.2010 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011143636 | Date: | 17.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2569893 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2569893 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04L5/14 | [2018/49] | CPC: |
H04L5/0091 (EP,US);
H04L5/001 (EP,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,US);
H04L5/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/12] | H04L5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DAI-ENTWURF FÜR FDD-TRÄGERAGGREGATION | [2013/12] | English: | DAI DESIGNS FOR FDD CARRIER AGGREGATION | [2013/12] | French: | CONCEPTS D'INDICES D'AFFECTATIONS DE LIAISON DESCENDANTE (DAI) POUR AGRÉGATION DE PORTEUSES FDD | [2013/12] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/12] | 27.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 01.05.2019 | AT | 01.05.2019 | CY | 01.05.2019 | CZ | 01.05.2019 | DK | 01.05.2019 | EE | 01.05.2019 | HR | 01.05.2019 | LT | 01.05.2019 | LV | 01.05.2019 | MC | 01.05.2019 | MK | 01.05.2019 | MT | 01.05.2019 | PL | 01.05.2019 | RO | 01.05.2019 | RS | 01.05.2019 | SE | 01.05.2019 | SI | 01.05.2019 | SK | 01.05.2019 | SM | 01.05.2019 | TR | 01.05.2019 | IE | 13.05.2019 | LU | 13.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | CH | 31.05.2019 | LI | 31.05.2019 | BG | 01.08.2019 | NO | 01.08.2019 | GR | 02.08.2019 | IS | 01.09.2019 | PT | 01.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
MT | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IE | 13.05.2019 | ||
LU | 13.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IE | 13.05.2019 | ||
LU | 13.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IE | 13.05.2019 | ||
LU | 13.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IE | 13.05.2019 | ||
LU | 13.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
TR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LU | 13.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
LU | 13.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
LU | 13.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
RS | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 01.05.2019 | |
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | LT | 01.05.2019 | |
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | LT | 01.05.2019 | |
NO | 01.08.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XI] - CATT, "UL ACK/NACK Transmission Design in FDD with CA", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-100876, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100216), vol. RAN WG1, no. San Francisco, USA; 20100222, XP050418480 [X] 1,10,22,31,43,52,64,65 * sections 2 and 3 * [I] 2-9,11-21,23-30,32-42,44-51,53-63 | [XI] - CATT, "DAI Design for LTE-A", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-102644, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100504), vol. RAN WG1, no. Montreal, Canada; 20100510, XP050419856 [X] 1,10,22,31,43,52,64,65 * sections 2 and 3 * [I] 2-9,11-21,23-30,32-42,44-51,53-63 | [XI] - NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS ET AL, "UL control signalling to support bandwidth extension in LTEAdvanced", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-090724, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090203), no. Athens, Greece; 20090203, XP050318591 [X] 1,10,22,31,43,52,64,65 * paragraph bridging page 2 and page 3 * [I] 2-9,11-21,23-30,32-42,44-51,53-63 | [XI] - HUAWEI, "UL ACK/NACK feedback related DCI design for carrier aggregation", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-101943, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100406), vol. RAN WG1, no. Beijing, china; 20100412, XP050419287 [X] 1,10,22,31,43,52,64,65 * section 2 * [I] 2-9,11-21,23-30,32-42,44-51,53-63 | [A] - NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS ET AL, "On the need for cross-carrier A/N bundling", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-102942, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100504), vol. RAN WG1, no. Montreal, Canada; 20100510, XP050420058 [A] 1-65 * section 2 * | Examination | - SAMSUNG, "Need for DAI and HARQ-ACK Transmission Aspects with CA", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-104576 DAI FOR A_N IN PUSCH, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100817), vol. RAN WG1, no. Madrid, Spain; 20100823, XP050449872 | - CATT, "DAI Design for LTE-A", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-104311, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100817), vol. RAN WG1, no. Madrid, Spain; 20100823, XP050449669 | by applicant | US20130613450 |