EP2552640 - FEEDING LUBRICANT FOR CORED WELDING ELECTRODE, CORED WELDING ELECTRODE AND GMAW PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2016 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lincoln Global, Inc. 9160 Norwalk Boulevard Santa Fe Springs, CA 90670 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/06] | For all designated states Lincoln Global, Inc. 17721 Railroad Street City of Industry, CA 91748 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PANDAY, Radhika c/o Lincoln Global, Inc. 17721 Railroad Street City of Industry, CA 91748 / US | 02 /
RAJAN, Vaidyanath, B. 5521 St. Peters Way Mentor, OH 44060 / US | 03 /
REID, Jean, Victoria c/o Lincoln Global, Inc. 17721 Railroad Street City Of Industry, CA 91748 / US | 04 /
SIDDERS, Campbell, Ian c/o Lincoln Global, Inc. 17721 Railroad Street City Of Industry, CA 91748 / US | [2015/39] |
Former [2013/06] | 01 /
PANDAY, Radhika C/o Lincoln Global Inc 17721 Railroad Street City Of Industrie, CA 91748 / US | ||
02 /
RAJAN, Vaidyanath, B. 5521 St. Peters Way Mentor, OH 44060 / US | |||
03 /
REID, Jean, Victoria C/o Lincoln Global Inc 17721 Railroad Street City Of Industrie, CA 91748 / US | |||
04 /
SIDDERS, Campbell, Ian C/o Lincoln Global Inc 17721 Railroad Street City Of Industrie, CA 91748 / US | Representative(s) | Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schloss Schellenberg - Backhaus Renteilichtung 1 45134 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/39] | Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Frühlingstrasse 43A 45133 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2013/06] | GROSSE SCHUMACHER KNAUER VON HIRSCHHAUSEN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Frühlingstrasse 43A 45133 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 11722867.6 | 04.04.2011 | [2015/39] | WO2011IB00724 | Priority number, date | US20100753135 | 02.04.2010 Original published format: US 753135 | [2013/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011121440 | Date: | 06.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2552640 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2552640 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B23K35/36, B23K35/365, B23K35/40, C10M169/02 | [2015/14] | CPC: |
B23K35/36 (EP,US);
B23K35/365 (EP,US);
B23K35/40 (EP,US);
B23K35/404 (EP,US);
C10M169/02 (EP,US);
C10M2201/041 (EP,US);
C10M2201/0416 (EP,US);
C10M2201/062 (EP,US);
C10M2201/0626 (EP,US);
C10M2201/065 (EP,US);
C10M2201/0656 (EP,US);
C10M2201/066 (EP,US);
C10M2201/0666 (EP,US);
C10M2207/125 (EP,US);
C10M2207/1253 (EP,US);
C10M2207/1265 (EP,US);
C10M2213/0626 (EP,US);
C10N2010/02 (EP,US);
C10N2010/04 (EP,US);
C10N2030/06 (EP,US);
C10N2030/12 (EP,US);
C10N2040/17 (EP,US);
C10N2040/246 (EP,US);
C10N2050/015 (EP,US);
C10N2050/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/06] | B23K35/36, B23K35/365, B23K35/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHMIERMITTELZUFÜHRUNG FÜR SCHWEISSELEKTRODE, SCHWEISSELEKTRODE UND GMAW-VERFAHREN | [2013/06] | English: | FEEDING LUBRICANT FOR CORED WELDING ELECTRODE, CORED WELDING ELECTRODE AND GMAW PROCESS | [2013/06] | French: | LUBRIFIANT D'APPORT POUR ÉLECTRODE DE SOUDAGE FOURRÉE, ÉLECTRODE DE SOUDAGE FOURRÉE ET PROCÉDÉ GMAW | [2013/06] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/06] | 29.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.04.2011 | AL | 23.09.2015 | AT | 23.09.2015 | BE | 23.09.2015 | BG | 23.09.2015 | CY | 23.09.2015 | CZ | 23.09.2015 | DK | 23.09.2015 | EE | 23.09.2015 | ES | 23.09.2015 | FI | 23.09.2015 | HR | 23.09.2015 | IT | 23.09.2015 | LT | 23.09.2015 | LV | 23.09.2015 | MC | 23.09.2015 | MK | 23.09.2015 | NL | 23.09.2015 | PL | 23.09.2015 | RO | 23.09.2015 | RS | 23.09.2015 | SE | 23.09.2015 | SI | 23.09.2015 | SK | 23.09.2015 | SM | 23.09.2015 | TR | 23.09.2015 | NO | 23.12.2015 | GR | 24.12.2015 | IS | 23.01.2016 | PT | 25.01.2016 | GB | 04.04.2016 | IE | 04.04.2016 | LU | 04.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | MT | 30.04.2016 | FR | 02.05.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 04.04.2011 | |
AT | 23.09.2015 | ||
BE | 23.09.2015 | ||
BG | 23.09.2015 | ||
CY | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
MK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
SM | 23.09.2015 | ||
TR | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
GB | 04.04.2016 | ||
IE | 04.04.2016 | ||
LU | 04.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 04.04.2011 | |
AT | 23.09.2015 | ||
BE | 23.09.2015 | ||
CY | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
MK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
SM | 23.09.2015 | ||
TR | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
GB | 04.04.2016 | ||
IE | 04.04.2016 | ||
LU | 04.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 04.04.2011 | |
AT | 23.09.2015 | ||
BE | 23.09.2015 | ||
CY | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
MK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
SM | 23.09.2015 | ||
TR | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
GB | 04.04.2016 | ||
IE | 04.04.2016 | ||
LU | 04.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 04.04.2011 | |
AT | 23.09.2015 | ||
BE | 23.09.2015 | ||
CY | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
MK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
SM | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
GB | 04.04.2016 | ||
IE | 04.04.2016 | ||
LU | 04.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
BE | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
GB | 04.04.2016 | ||
IE | 04.04.2016 | ||
LU | 04.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
BE | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
GB | 04.04.2016 | ||
LU | 04.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
FR | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/08] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
BE | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
GB | 04.04.2016 | ||
LU | 04.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
BE | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
LU | 04.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
BE | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
LU | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
BE | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 23.09.2015 | |
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 23.09.2015 | |
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | FI | 23.09.2015 | |
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 23.09.2015 | |
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 23.09.2015 | |
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 23.09.2015 | |
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 23.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH08257788 (NIPPON STEEL WELDING PROD ENG) [X] 1-12 * abstract *; | [X]US2005045699 (KONISHI YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs 0065,0133, 0174, 0177, 0188 - sentences 1, 2, paragraphs 1-7; claims 6, 7 *; | [A]JPH02284792 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]EP1724052 (LINCOLN GLOBAL INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0021]; claims 1-12 *; | [A]JPS57193299 (NIPPON STEEL WELDING PROD ENG) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]JP2002239779 (NIPPON STEEL WELDING PROD ENG) [A] 1-12 * abstract * |