EP2580174 - MIXTURE FOR TREATING FERTILIZERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SKW Stickstoffwerke Piesteritz GmbH Möllensdorfer Straße 13 06886 Lutherstadt Wittenberg / DE | [2013/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REINHARDT, Petra Koethener Str. 18 06847 Dessau / DE | 02 /
RADICS, Ute Im Winkel 1a 06888 Dabrun / DE | 03 /
NICLAS, Hans-Joachim Rethelstr. 8 12435 Berlin / DE | [2013/16] | Representative(s) | Schneider, Michael, et al Heisse Kursawe Eversheds Brienner Strasse 12 80333 München / DE | [2016/02] |
Former [2013/16] | Schneider, Michael, et al Heisse Kursawe Eversheds Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft Maximiliansplatz 5 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11723005.2 | 27.05.2011 | [2016/02] | WO2011EP02636 | Priority number, date | DE20101022943 | 08.06.2010 Original published format: DE102010022943 | [2013/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011154100 | Date: | 15.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2580174 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2580174 | Date: | 13.01.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C05G3/08, A01N43/653, A01N43/56 | [2013/16] | CPC: |
C05G3/90 (EP,US);
Y02P60/21 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MISCHUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON DÜNGEMITTELN | [2013/16] | English: | MIXTURE FOR TREATING FERTILIZERS | [2013/16] | French: | MÉLANGE POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'ENGRAIS | [2013/16] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/16] | 24.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.05.2011 | AL | 13.01.2016 | CY | 13.01.2016 | CZ | 13.01.2016 | DK | 13.01.2016 | EE | 13.01.2016 | FI | 13.01.2016 | HR | 13.01.2016 | LT | 13.01.2016 | LV | 13.01.2016 | MC | 13.01.2016 | MK | 13.01.2016 | MT | 13.01.2016 | RO | 13.01.2016 | RS | 13.01.2016 | SE | 13.01.2016 | SI | 13.01.2016 | SK | 13.01.2016 | SM | 13.01.2016 | BG | 13.04.2016 | NO | 13.04.2016 | IS | 13.05.2016 | PT | 13.05.2016 | IE | 27.05.2016 | LU | 27.05.2016 | BE | 31.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 27.05.2011 | |
CY | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
MK | 13.01.2016 | ||
MT | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
IE | 27.05.2016 | ||
LU | 27.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 27.05.2011 | |
CY | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
MK | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
IE | 27.05.2016 | ||
LU | 27.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
IE | 27.05.2016 | ||
LU | 27.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | CZ | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
LU | 27.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
LU | 27.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | CZ | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
LU | 27.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 13.01.2016 | |
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 13.01.2016 | |
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 13.01.2016 | |
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | FI | 13.01.2016 | |
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 13.01.2016 | |
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 13.01.2016 | |
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | Cited in | International search | [ADP]WO2011015305 (PIESTERITZ STICKSTOFF [DE], et al) [ADP] 1-11 * page 4, line 18 - line 20 * * page 5, line 27 - page 6, line 15 * * claim - *; | [A]WO9522515 (PIESTERITZ STICKSTOFF [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * claim - * | by applicant | EP0908430 | DE4405392 | DE10342551 | DE3601805 | DE2531962 | DE4128828 | EP1340738 | EP1323695 | DE102009036229 |