EP2576965 - WELL INTERVENTION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Quality Intervention AS Sognefjordvegen 10 6899 Balestrand / NO | [2013/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALVAERN, Jostein Sognefjordvegen 10 N-6899 Balestrand / NO | [2013/15] | Representative(s) | Piésold, Alexander James Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Piésold, Alexander James Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 11723197.7 | 26.05.2011 | WO2011GB50997 | Priority number, date | GB20100008845 | 26.05.2010 Original published format: GB 201008845 | [2013/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011148184 | Date: | 01.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2576965 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E21B33/072 | [2013/15] | CPC: |
E21B33/072 (EP);
E21B19/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR BOHRLOCHOPERATIONEN | [2013/15] | English: | WELL INTERVENTION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2013/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'INTERVENTION DANS UN PUITS DE FORAGE | [2013/15] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 24.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/08] | 01.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2014/08] | 01.10.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3760875 (BUSKING B) [A] 1-29* the whole document *; | [A]US4024718 (ROCHE JOSEPH R, et al) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [A]US4278362 (SCHERRER NORBERT) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [A]US7654327 (SHIVERS III ROBERT MAGEE [US], et al) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [XA]NO328785B (IMPROVED SOLUTIONS AS [NO]) [X] 1,2,5-10,16,17,20-24 * figures 2,6-10 * [A] 3,4,12-15,18,19,25-29 |