EP2632417 - ACTIVE INGREDIENT COMBINATION AND ANTI-DANDRUFF HAIR TREATMENT PRODUCTS II [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.06.2014 [2014/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHEUNEMANN, Volker Vor dem Weißen Berge 6a 21339 Lüneburg / DE | 02 /
SCHULZE ZUR WIESCHE, Erik Klosterallee 110 20144 Hamburg / DE | [2013/36] | Application number, filing date | 11723444.3 | 01.06.2011 | WO2011EP59038 | Priority number, date | DE20101043076 | 28.10.2010 Original published format: DE102010043076 | [2013/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012055586 | Date: | 03.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2632417 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/27, A61K8/49, A61K8/64, A61Q5/00 | [2013/36] | CPC: |
A61Q5/006 (EP);
A61K8/27 (EP);
A61K8/4933 (EP);
A61K8/64 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/36] | Title | German: | WIRKSTOFFKOMBINATION UND HAARBEHANDLUNGSMITTEL GEGEN SCHUPPEN II | [2013/36] | English: | ACTIVE INGREDIENT COMBINATION AND ANTI-DANDRUFF HAIR TREATMENT PRODUCTS II | [2013/36] | French: | COMBINAISON D'ACTIFS ET AGENTS POUR TRAITER LES CHEVEUX CONTRE LES PELLICULES II | [2013/36] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/36] | 16.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/26] | 05.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2014/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS61243010 (NONOGAWA SHOJI YK) [Y] 1-10 * abstract *; | [YD]EP1238645 (WELLA AG [DE]) [YD] 1-10 * claim - *; | [Y]US2003190371 (GRAAF THALIE PAULINA DE [GB], et al) [Y] 1-10 * claim - *; | [Y]US124751 (LAUER N) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]JPS5292881 | [Y] - "Aq. suspension for treating dandruff-contains antibacterial (2)-zinc-pyridinechiol-(1)oxide and zinc oxide as stabiliser", DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1977, no. 37, Database accession no. 1977-65846Y, XP002670955 & JPS5292881 A 19770804 (NONOGAWA SHOJI KK) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0348015 | EP1238645 | DE3725030 |