EP2467026 - HEALTHY COFFEE AND METHODS OF ITS PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2022 | Opposition rejected | published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tchibo GmbH Überseering 18 22297 Hamburg / DE | [2012/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BYTOF, Gerhard Tchibo GmbH Überseering 18 22297 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
LANTZ, Ingo Tchibo GmbH Überseering 18 22297 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
STIEBITZ, Herbert Tchibo GmbH Überseering 18 22297 Hamburg / DE | 04 /
MARKO, Doris Guigitzerstr. 8 3001 Mauerbach / AT | 05 /
BÖTTLER, Ute Margaretenstr. 97/2/30 1050 Wien / AT | 06 /
SOMOZA, Veronika Eigelsberg 20 3400 Werding / AT | 07 /
KOTYCZKA, Christine Wittelsbacherallee 90 82140 Olching / DE | 08 /
RUBACH, Malte Gozbertstr. 6 81547 München / DE | 09 /
EISENBRAND, Gerhard Kühler Grund 48/1 69126 Heidelberg / DE | 10 /
BARKURADZE, Tamara Konrad-Adenauer-Str. 65 67663 Kaiserslautern / DE | 11 /
HOFMANN, Thomas Malvenweg 23 85375 Neufahrn / DE | 12 /
WAHL, Anika Strauben 16 73547 Lorch / DE | 13 /
LANG, Roman Frühlingstr. 3 a 85354 Freising / DE | 14 /
EGGERS, Rudolf Alter Postweg 55 21614 Buxtehude / DE | [2013/20] |
Former [2012/26] | 01 /
BYTOF, Gerhard Tchibo GmbH Überseering 18 22297 Hamburg / DE | ||
02 /
LANTZ, Ingo Tchibo GmbH Überseering 18 22297 Hamburg / DE | |||
03 /
STIEBITZ, Herbert Tchibo GmbH Überseering 18 22297 Hamburg / DE | |||
04 /
MARKO, Doris Gulglitzerstr. 8 3001 Mauerbach / AT | |||
05 /
BÖTTLER, Ute Margaretenstr. 97/2/30 1050 Wien / AT | |||
06 /
SOMOZA, Veronika Eigelsberg 20 3400 Werding / AT | |||
07 /
KOTYCZKA, Christine Wittelsbacherallee 90 82140 Olching / DE | |||
08 /
RUBACH, Malte Gozbertstr. 6 81547 München / DE | |||
09 /
EISENBRAND, Gerhard Kühler Grund 48/1 69126 Heidelberg / DE | |||
10 /
BARKURADZE, Tamara Konrad-Adenauer-Str. 65 67663 Kaiserslautern / DE | |||
11 /
HOFMANN, Thomas Malvenweg 23 85375 Neufahrn / DE | |||
12 /
WAHL, Anika Strauben 16 73547 Lorch / DE | |||
13 /
LANG, Roman Frühlingstr. 3 a 85354 Freising / DE | |||
14 /
EGGERS, Rudolf Alter Postweg 55 21614 Buxtehude / DE | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11723868.3 | 27.04.2011 | WO2011EP02118 | Priority number, date | EP20100004602 | 30.04.2010 Original published format: EP 10004602 | [2012/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011134656 | Date: | 03.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2467026 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2467026 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A23F5/04, A23F5/02, A23F5/20 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
A23F5/04 (EP,KR,US);
A23F5/02 (KR);
A23F5/046 (US);
A23F5/20 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GESUNDER KAFFEE UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2012/26] | English: | HEALTHY COFFEE AND METHODS OF ITS PRODUCTION | [2012/26] | French: | CAFÉ SANTÉ ET PROCÉDÉS POUR SA PRODUCTION | [2012/26] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/26] | 06.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
31.01.2014
24.07.2014
ADMISSIBLE J.J.Darboven GmbH & Co. KG Pinkertweg 13 22133 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Glawe, Delfs, Moll, et al, et al Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | 02
23.07.2014
25.07.2014
ADMISSIBLE Mondelez Global LLC Three Parkway North Deerfield, IL 60015 / US Opponent's representative Boult Wade Tennant LLP, et al, et al Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.01.2014
24.07.2014
ADMISSIBLE J.J.Darboven GmbH & Co. KG Pinkertweg 13 22133 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Glawe, Delfs, Moll, et al, et al Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | ||
02
23.07.2014
25.07.2014
ADMISSIBLE Mondelez Global LLC Three Parkway North Deerfield, IL 60015 / US Opponent's representative Boult Wade Tennant, et al, et al Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | |||
Former [2016/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.01.2014
24.07.2014
ADMISSIBLE J.J.Darboven GmbH & Co. KG Pinkertweg 13 22133 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Keussen, Christof, et al, et al Glawe Delfs Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | ||
02
23.07.2014
25.07.2014
ADMISSIBLE Mondelez Global LLC Three Parkway North Deerfield, IL 60015 / US Opponent's representative Boult Wade Tennant, et al, et al Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | |||
Former [2014/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.01.2014
24.07.2014
ADMISSIBLE J.J. Darboven GmbH & Co. / Coffein Compagnie Dr. Erich Scheele GmbH & Co. KG Pinkertweg 13 / Sebaldsbrücker Heerstr. 191 A 22113 Hamburg / 28309 Bremen / DE Opponent's representative Keussen, Christof, et al, et al Glawe Delfs Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | ||
02
23.07.2014
ADMISSIBLE Mondelez Global LLC Three Parkway North Deerfield, IL 60015 / US Opponent's representative Boult Wade Tennant, et al, et al Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | |||
Former [2014/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.01.2014
J.J. Darboven GmbH & Co. / Coffein Compagnie Dr. Erich Scheele GmbH & Co. KG Pinkertweg 13 / Sebaldsbrücker Heerstr. 191 A 22113 Hamburg / 28309 Bremen / DE Opponent's representative Keussen, Christof, et al, et al Glawe Delfs Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2014/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.01.2014
J.J. Darboven GmbH & Co. / Coffein Compagnie Dr. Erich Scheele GmbH & Co. KG Pinkertweg 13 / Sebaldsbrücker Heerstr. 191 A 22113 Hamburg / 28309 Bremen / DE Opponent's representative UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG, et al, et al Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | 04.09.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.03.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.08.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.09.2016 | 21.09.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.03.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.04.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.04.2018 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 15.10.2021 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2022/10] | Appeal following opposition | 01.06.2018 | Appeal received No. T1461/18 | 09.08.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.10.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 18.01.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 15.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 23.10.2013 | CY | 23.10.2013 | HR | 23.10.2013 | MC | 23.10.2013 | MK | 23.10.2013 | MT | 23.10.2013 | RS | 23.10.2013 | SM | 23.10.2013 | GR | 24.01.2014 | IS | 23.02.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | CY | 23.10.2013 | |
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MK | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
SM | 23.10.2013 | ||
GR | 24.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CY | 23.10.2013 | |
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
SM | 23.10.2013 | ||
GR | 24.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 23.10.2013 | |
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
SM | 23.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 23.10.2013 | |
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | CY | 23.10.2013 | |
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 23.10.2013 | |
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | HR | 23.10.2013 | |
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | HR | 23.10.2013 | |
IS | 23.02.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3700462 (STEFANUCCI ARTHUR, et al) [A] 1-13 * example -; claim - *; | [A]US4349573 (STEFANUCCI ARTHUR, et al) [A] 1-13 * example -; claim - *; | [AD]WO8704598 (CODE KAFFEE HANDEL [DE]) [AD] 3 * page 8; claim - *; | [A]EP0755631 (J J DARBOVEN GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 5,6 * claim - *; | [A]WO0167880 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 7; examples 3-6; claim - *; | [AD]EP1808078 (TAMA TLO CORP [JP]) [AD] 1-13 * paragraphs [0117] - [0118] - [0158] *; | [AD] - STEGEN VAN DER G H D, "THE EFFECT OF DEWAXING OF GREEN COFFEE ON THE COFFEE BREW", FOOD CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER LTD, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/0308-8146(79)90027-X, (19790101), vol. 4, no. 1, ISSN 0308-8146, pages 23 - 29, XP000602966 [AD] 5-7,13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0308-8146(79)90027-X | [A] - SOMOZA V ET AL, "Activity-Guided Identification of a Chemopreventative Compound in Coffee Beverage Using in Vitro and in Vivo Techniques", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US LNKD- DOI:10.1021/JF034750E, vol. 51, no. 23, ISSN 0021-8561, (20031105), pages 6861 - 6869, (20031003), XP002524076 [A] 1,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JF034750E | by applicant | WO8704598 | EP1808078 | - STENNART, MAIER, ZEITSCHRIFT FUR LEBENSMITTELUNTERSUCHUNG UND FORSCHUNG, (1993), vol. 196, pages 430 - 434 | - MARTIN, M.J., F. PABLOS, G.A. GUSTAVO, "Discrimination between arabica and robusta green coffee varieties according to their chemical composition", TALANTA, (1998), vol. 46, no. 6, pages 1259 - 1264 | - MAIER, H.G., Grundlagen und Fortschritte der Lebensmitteluntersuchung und Lebensmitteltechnologie, (1981), vol. 18, page 199 | - TRUGO, L.C., R. MACRAE, "A study of the effect of roasting on the chlorogenic acid composition of coffee using HPLC", FOOD CHEMISTRY, (1984), vol. 15, pages 219 - 227 | - CLIFFORD, M.N., "Chlorogenic acids - Their characterisation, transformation during roasting, and potential dietary significance", 2LEME COLLOQUE SCIENTIFIQUE INTERNATIONAL SUR LE CAFé, (2007), pages 36 - 49 | - VAN DER STEGEN, G. H. D., "The effect of dewaxing of green coffee on the coffee brew", FOOD CHEMISTRY, (197901), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 23 - 29 |