EP2591157 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR WEAVING PATTERN FORMATION IN WOVEN FABRICS WITH ADDITIONAL WEFT EFFECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lindauer Dornier Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Rickenbacher Str. 119 88131 Lindau / DE | [2016/01] |
Former [2013/20] | For all designated states Lindauer Dornier Gesellschaft Mit Beschränkter Haftung Rickenbacher Str. 119 88131 Lindau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANNES, Christian Roggenzell 15 88239 Wangen / DE | 02 /
MÜLLER, Herbert 12400 Tantallon Court Pineville North Carolina 2813488079 / US | [2013/20] | Application number, filing date | 11724138.0 | 04.05.2011 | [2016/01] | WO2011EP57131 | Priority number, date | DE20101026609 | 09.07.2010 Original published format: DE102010026609 | [2013/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012004021 | Date: | 12.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2591157 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2591157 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | D03D31/00, D03C7/06, D03D13/00, D03D19/00 | [2013/20] | CPC: |
D03C7/06 (EP,US);
D03D47/38 (US);
D03C19/00 (US);
D03C19/005 (EP,US);
D03D13/002 (EP,US);
D03D13/004 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR WEBMUSTERBILDUNG BEI GEWEBEN MIT ZUSATZSCHUSSEFFEKTEN | [2013/20] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR WEAVING PATTERN FORMATION IN WOVEN FABRICS WITH ADDITIONAL WEFT EFFECTS | [2013/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CRÉATION DE MOTIFS TISSÉS SUR DES TISSUS AYANT DES EFFETS DE TRAMES SUPPLÉMENTAIRES | [2013/20] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/20] | 12.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 27.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.05.2011 | AL | 30.12.2015 | BG | 30.12.2015 | CY | 30.12.2015 | CZ | 30.12.2015 | DK | 30.12.2015 | EE | 30.12.2015 | ES | 30.12.2015 | FI | 30.12.2015 | HR | 30.12.2015 | LT | 30.12.2015 | LV | 30.12.2015 | MC | 30.12.2015 | MK | 30.12.2015 | MT | 30.12.2015 | NL | 30.12.2015 | PL | 30.12.2015 | RO | 30.12.2015 | RS | 30.12.2015 | SE | 30.12.2015 | SI | 30.12.2015 | SK | 30.12.2015 | SM | 30.12.2015 | NO | 30.03.2016 | GR | 31.03.2016 | IS | 30.04.2016 | PT | 02.05.2016 | AT | 04.05.2016 | IE | 04.05.2016 | LU | 04.05.2016 | FR | 31.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 04.05.2011 | |
BG | 30.12.2015 | ||
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
MT | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
IE | 04.05.2016 | ||
LU | 04.05.2016 | ||
FR | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 04.05.2011 | |
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
MT | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
IE | 04.05.2016 | ||
LU | 04.05.2016 | ||
FR | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 04.05.2011 | |
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
IE | 04.05.2016 | ||
LU | 04.05.2016 | ||
FR | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
IE | 04.05.2016 | ||
LU | 04.05.2016 | ||
FR | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/26] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
IE | 04.05.2016 | ||
LU | 04.05.2016 | ||
FR | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
LU | 04.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
LU | 04.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | FI | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 30.12.2015 | |
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 30.12.2015 | |
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 30.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4429722 (HERZOG EARL E [US]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2007093504 (ALGESTA S R L [IT], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 27 * * figures 1-7 *; | [A]EP1849897 (TSUDAKOMA IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * figures 1-4 *; | [ED]DE102010007048 (DORNIER GMBH LINDAUER [DE]) [ED] 1-21 * abstract * * paragraph [0069] ** figures 1-9 * | by applicant | US4429722 | - E. GRÄBNER, Die Weberei, (1953), pages 232 - 233 | DE20101007048 |