EP2580069 - DATA CARRIER COMPRISING FEATURE REGION AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/16] | DATA CARRIER COMPRISING FEATURE REGION | ||
[2018/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Giesecke+Devrient Currency Technology GmbH Prinzregentenstraße 159 81677 München / DE | [2017/33] |
Former [2013/16] | For all designated states Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREGAREK, André Rimstinger Str. 5 81671 München / DE | 02 /
HEIM, Manfred Auguste-Wittig-Str. 52 83646 Bad Tölz / DE | 03 /
RENNER, Patrick Margeritenweg 23 83677 Reichersbeuern / DE | [2013/16] | Application number, filing date | 11724370.9 | 01.06.2011 | [2019/10] | WO2011EP02724 | Priority number, date | DE20101022990 | 08.06.2010 Original published format: DE102010022990 | [2013/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011154112 | Date: | 15.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2580069 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2580069 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B42D15/00, B41M3/14 | [2018/42] | CPC: |
B41M3/14 (EP,US);
B42D25/435 (US);
B41M5/24 (EP,US);
B41M5/26 (EP);
B42D25/29 (EP,US);
B42D25/41 (EP);
B42D25/43 (EP);
B41M5/267 (EP);
B42D2033/28 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2013/16] | B42D15/00, B42D15/10, B41M3/14, B41M5/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENTRÄGER MIT MERKMALSBEREICH UND VERFAHREN | [2018/42] | English: | DATA CARRIER COMPRISING FEATURE REGION AND METHOD | [2018/42] | French: | SUPPORT DE DONNÉES PRÉSENTANT UNE ZONE CARACTÉRISTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ | [2018/42] |
Former [2013/16] | DATENTRÄGER MIT MERKMALSBEREICH | ||
Former [2013/16] | DATA CARRIER COMPRISING FEATURE REGION | ||
Former [2013/16] | SUPPORT DE DONNÉES PRÉSENTANT UNE ZONE CARACTÉRISTIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/16] | 31.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2017 | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.06.2011 | AL | 06.03.2019 | CY | 06.03.2019 | CZ | 06.03.2019 | DK | 06.03.2019 | EE | 06.03.2019 | FI | 06.03.2019 | HR | 06.03.2019 | LT | 06.03.2019 | LV | 06.03.2019 | MC | 06.03.2019 | MK | 06.03.2019 | MT | 06.03.2019 | RO | 06.03.2019 | RS | 06.03.2019 | SE | 06.03.2019 | SI | 06.03.2019 | SK | 06.03.2019 | SM | 06.03.2019 | TR | 06.03.2019 | AT | 01.06.2019 | IE | 01.06.2019 | LU | 01.06.2019 | BG | 06.06.2019 | NO | 06.06.2019 | GR | 07.06.2019 | BE | 30.06.2019 | IS | 06.07.2019 | PT | 06.07.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 01.06.2011 | |
AL | 06.03.2019 | ||
CY | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
MT | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
AT | 01.06.2019 | ||
IE | 01.06.2019 | ||
LU | 01.06.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 01.06.2011 | |
AL | 06.03.2019 | ||
CY | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
AT | 01.06.2019 | ||
IE | 01.06.2019 | ||
LU | 01.06.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CY | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
AT | 01.06.2019 | ||
IE | 01.06.2019 | ||
LU | 01.06.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
AT | 01.06.2019 | ||
IE | 01.06.2019 | ||
LU | 01.06.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IE | 01.06.2019 | ||
LU | 01.06.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IE | 01.06.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP0543528 (STANDARD REGISTER CO [US]) [X] 1,12,15-17,20 * column 5, lines 3 - 13, 19 - 37, 51 - 53 * * column 6, lines 1 - 5 * * column 7, lines 11 - 34; figures 1, 2c, 3c, 7, 8, 9 * [I] 9,11,13,14; | [XI]US5762378 (PHILLIPS GEORGE K [US]) [X] 1,5,8,12,14,20 * column 3, line 27 - line 50 * * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 3 * * column 5, line 18 - line 24 * * column 6, line 10 - line 31; figure - *[I] 9,11,13,15-17; | [Y]DE102007036622 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 3-11,22-24 * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] - [0013] , [0014] , [0016] , [0018] , [0023] , [0035] , [0038] , [0039] , [0056] , [0057] , [0059] , [0061]; figure - *; | [XYI]US2010084851 (SCHILLING ANDREAS [CH]) [X] 1,2,12,15-18,20,21 * paragraphs [0055] , [0057] , [0059] , [0061] - [0063] - [0069]; figure - * [Y] 3-11,22-24 [I] 13,14,19 | by applicant | US4343885 | EP0290750 | WO02101462 | EP1648969 |