EP2671315 - DETECTION OF WELDED SWITCH CONTACTS IN A LINE CONVERTER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.2017 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2017 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Inc. 12040 Regency Parkway, Suite 200 Cary, NC 27518 / US | For all designated states ABB OY Stromberginkuja 1 00381 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2013/50] | For all designated states ABB Inc. 12040 Regency Parkway Suite 200 Cary, NC 27518 / US | ||
For all designated states ABB OY Stromberginkuja 1 00381 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOKHALE, Kalyan, P. 4595 S. Delphine Drive New Berlin, WI 53151 / US | 02 /
KARRAKER, Douglas, W. S67W 14570 Gaulke Court Muskego, WI 53150 / US | 03 /
PAJARI, Ilkka, T. 5859 Fleming Ct Greendale, WI 53129 / US | 04 /
JUSSILA, Matti, T. Vaskipellontie 2 A 10 FI-01610 Vantaa / FI | [2014/07] |
Former [2013/50] | 01 /
GOKHALE, Kalyan, P. 4595 S. Delphine Drive New Berlin, WI 53151 / US | ||
02 /
KARRAKER, Douglas, W. S67W 14570 Gaulke Court Muskego, WI 53150 / US | |||
03 /
PAJARI, Ilkka, T. 630 N. 4th Street Unit 902 Milwaukee, WI 53203 / US | |||
04 /
JUSSILA, Matti, T. Vaskipellontie 2 A 10 FI-01610 Vantaa / FI | Representative(s) | Postiglione, Ferruccio, et al Gregorj S.r.l. Intellectual Property Via L. Muratori, 13 b 20135 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/50] | Postiglione, Ferruccio, et al Gregorj S.r.l. Intellectual Property Via Muratori, 13 b 20135 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 11724925.0 | 03.06.2011 | WO2011US39053 | Priority number, date | US20100351667P | 04.06.2010 Original published format: US 351667 P | [2013/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011153427 | Date: | 08.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2671315 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/48, H01H47/00 | [2013/50] | CPC: |
H02M1/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/50] | Title | German: | NACHWEIS VON GESCHWEISSTEN SCHALTKONTAKTEN IN EINEM LEITUNGSWANDLERSYSTEM | [2013/50] | English: | DETECTION OF WELDED SWITCH CONTACTS IN A LINE CONVERTER SYSTEM | [2013/50] | French: | DÉTECTION DE CONTACTS DE COMMUTATION SOUDÉS DANS UN SYSTÈME DE CONVERTISSEUR DE DÉFINITION | [2013/50] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/26] | 05.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/50] | 28.08.2013 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 20.09.2013 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 11.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 02.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/32] | 03.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/22] | 25.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.10.2013 | 30.06.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH10144194 (NISSAN MOTOR) [Y] 1,14 * abstract *; | [Y]DE102006030751 (KACO GERAETETECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,14 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0029]; figure 2 *; | [XP]EP2228895 (SMA SOLAR TECHNOLOGY AG [DE]) [XP] 1,14* paragraphs [0023] , [0034]; figure 1 * |