EP2582294 - INTEGRATED PORTABLE DEVICE AND METHOD IMPLEMENTING AN ACCELEROMETER FOR DETECTING ASYMMETRIES IN A MOVEMENT OF A USER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Myotest SA Rue de la Blancherie 61 1950 Sion / CH | [2013/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLACTION, Patrick Route du Belvédère CH-1965 Chandolin-près-Savièse / CH | 02 /
QUIÈVRE, Jacques 18 rue Verlaine F-77540 Rozay en Brie / FR | 03 /
MORIN, Jean-Benoît 168 rue Louis Marchand F-42800 Genilac / FR | [2013/17] | Representative(s) | P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.) Avenue J.-J. Rousseau 4 P.O. Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [2022/48] |
Former [2013/17] | P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.) Av. J.-J. Rousseau 4 P.O. Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 11725061.3 | 08.06.2011 | [2022/48] | WO2011EP59504 | Priority number, date | CH20100000973 | 16.06.2010 Original published format: CH 9732010 | [2013/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011157608 | Date: | 22.12.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2582294 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2582294 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/11, G01C22/00, G06K9/00, A61B5/103 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
A61B5/1038 (EP,US);
A61B5/112 (EP,CH,US);
A63B24/0006 (CH,US);
A61B5/11 (US);
A61B5/1122 (EP,US);
A61B5/6831 (EP,CH,US);
G01C22/006 (EP,CH,US);
G01P15/18 (CH,US);
G06V40/23 (CH,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTE TRAGBARE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN MIT EINEM BESCHLEUNIGUNGSMESSER ZUR DETEKTION VON ASYMMETRIEN IN DER BEWEGUNG EINES BENUTZERS | [2013/17] | English: | INTEGRATED PORTABLE DEVICE AND METHOD IMPLEMENTING AN ACCELEROMETER FOR DETECTING ASYMMETRIES IN A MOVEMENT OF A USER | [2013/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF PORTABLE INTÉGRÉ ET PROCÉDÉ METTANT EN OEUVRE UN ACCÉLÉROMÈTRE POUR DÉTECTER DES ASYMÉTRIES D'UN MOUVEMENT D'UN UTILISATEUR | [2013/17] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 22.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.06.2021 | 02.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.06.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.11.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.07.2013 | 30.06.2014 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.07.2014 | 30.06.2016 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.08.2016 | 30.06.2020 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   23.10.2020 | 30.06.2021 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   24.12.2021 | 30.06.2022 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   25.10.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 30.11.2022 | AT | 30.11.2022 | CZ | 30.11.2022 | DK | 30.11.2022 | EE | 30.11.2022 | ES | 30.11.2022 | FI | 30.11.2022 | HR | 30.11.2022 | IT | 30.11.2022 | LT | 30.11.2022 | LV | 30.11.2022 | MC | 30.11.2022 | NL | 30.11.2022 | PL | 30.11.2022 | RO | 30.11.2022 | RS | 30.11.2022 | SE | 30.11.2022 | SI | 30.11.2022 | SK | 30.11.2022 | SM | 30.11.2022 | NO | 28.02.2023 | GR | 01.03.2023 | IS | 30.03.2023 | PT | 31.03.2023 | IE | 08.06.2023 | LU | 08.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
IE | 08.06.2023 | ||
LU | 08.06.2023 | ||
BE | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
IE | 08.06.2023 | ||
LU | 08.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
LU | 08.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 30.11.2022 | |
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | DK | 30.11.2022 | |
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | DK | 30.11.2022 | |
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 30.11.2022 | |
NO | 28.02.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO0156470 (AGRONOMIQUE INST NAT RECH [FR], et al); | [XI]EP1466557 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [XI]JP2009106387 (PANASONIC ELEC WORKS CO LTD); | [AP]WO2010073044 (UNIV OXFORD BROOKES [GB], et al); | [AP]WO2010150260 (MEDICAL RES INFRASTRUCTURE & HEALTH SERVICES FUND TEL AVIV MEDICAL CT [IL], et al) | Examination | JP2006271893 | JP2009101108 | WO2009094746 | by applicant | EP0418548 | US5056783 | US5474083 | DE4426302 | US5788655 | US5976083 | US6148280 | US6397151 | EP1253404 | WO03032826 | WO2005074795 | WO2005091113 | WO2006030065 | WO2007017471 | EP1754521 | EP1764583 | WO2007036611 | WO2007107491 | EP1862765 | EP1897598 | EP1992389 | US2008288200 | US2009018794 | EP2027817 | WO2009094746 | WO2010046448 |