EP2533716 - HEATING AND COOLING OF CRYOSURGICAL INSTRUMENT USING A SINGLE CRYOGEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Icecure Medical Ltd. 7 Ha'eshel Street 38900 Caesarea / IL | [2012/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERZAK, Nir 81 Katzenelson Street 53271 Givataim / IL | 02 /
SHARON, Simon 15 Zur Street 30805 Ma'ayan Zvi / IL | [2012/51] | Representative(s) | Curley, Donnacha John, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/34] | Curley, Donnacha John, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [2012/51] | Curley, Donnacha John, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 11725226.2 | 08.04.2011 | [2015/34] | WO2011US31722 | Priority number, date | US20100778172 | 12.05.2010 Original published format: US 778172 | [2012/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011142909 | Date: | 17.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2533716 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2533716 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/00, A61B18/04, A61B18/02 | [2015/15] | CPC: |
A61B18/02 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00041 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0212 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0262 (EP,US);
A61B2018/048 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/51] | A61B18/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERWÄRMUNG UND KÜHLUNG EINES KRYOCHIRURGISCHEN INSTRUMENTS UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES EINZELNEN KÄLTEMITTELS | [2012/51] | English: | HEATING AND COOLING OF CRYOSURGICAL INSTRUMENT USING A SINGLE CRYOGEN | [2012/51] | French: | CHAUFFAGE ET REFROIDISSEMENT D'UN INSTRUMENT CRYOCHIRURGICAL UTILISANT UN SEUL CRYOGÈNE | [2012/51] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/51] | 26.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.04.2011 | AL | 19.08.2015 | AT | 19.08.2015 | BE | 19.08.2015 | BG | 19.08.2015 | CY | 19.08.2015 | CZ | 19.08.2015 | DK | 19.08.2015 | EE | 19.08.2015 | ES | 19.08.2015 | FI | 19.08.2015 | HR | 19.08.2015 | LT | 19.08.2015 | LV | 19.08.2015 | MC | 19.08.2015 | MK | 19.08.2015 | NL | 19.08.2015 | PL | 19.08.2015 | RO | 19.08.2015 | RS | 19.08.2015 | SE | 19.08.2015 | SI | 19.08.2015 | SK | 19.08.2015 | SM | 19.08.2015 | TR | 19.08.2015 | NO | 19.11.2015 | GR | 20.11.2015 | IS | 19.12.2015 | PT | 21.12.2015 | IE | 08.04.2016 | LU | 08.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | MT | 30.04.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 08.04.2011 | |
AT | 19.08.2015 | ||
BE | 19.08.2015 | ||
BG | 19.08.2015 | ||
CY | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
MK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
SM | 19.08.2015 | ||
TR | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
IE | 08.04.2016 | ||
LU | 08.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 08.04.2011 | |
AT | 19.08.2015 | ||
BE | 19.08.2015 | ||
CY | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
MK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
SM | 19.08.2015 | ||
TR | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
IE | 08.04.2016 | ||
LU | 08.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 08.04.2011 | |
AT | 19.08.2015 | ||
BE | 19.08.2015 | ||
CY | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
MK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
SM | 19.08.2015 | ||
TR | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
IE | 08.04.2016 | ||
LU | 08.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 08.04.2011 | |
AT | 19.08.2015 | ||
BE | 19.08.2015 | ||
CY | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
MK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
SM | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
IE | 08.04.2016 | ||
LU | 08.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
BE | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
IE | 08.04.2016 | ||
LU | 08.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
BE | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
LU | 08.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
BE | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
LU | 08.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
BE | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 19.08.2015 | |
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 19.08.2015 | |
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 19.08.2015 | |
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 19.08.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1443069 (DRAEGERWERK AG) [A] 1-12 * figure 1 *; | [X]US5674218 (RUBINSKY BORIS [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7 * column 34, line 24 - line 41; figures 5a,5b *; | [X]US5860971 (CLARKE BRIAN KEVIN RODERICK [GB]) [X] 1,6,7 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2006122590 (BLIWEIS MORDECHAI [IL], et al) [A] 1-12 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2007149959 (DELONZOR RUSSELL L [US], et al) [A] 8-12* figures 2-8 * | by applicant | US2006122590 |