EP2571343 - AN END BIT FOR A SOIL-WORKING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mollsor Aps Brobyvej 92 4180 Sorø / DK | [2013/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MØLLER, Per H. Brobyvej 92 4180 Sorø / DK | [2017/12] |
Former [2013/13] | 01 /
MØLLER, Per H. Brobyvej 92 DK-4180 Sorø / DK | Representative(s) | Zacco Denmark A/S Arne Jacobsens Allé 15 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [2017/12] |
Former [2013/13] | Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 11725314.6 | 16.05.2011 | [2017/12] | WO2011DK50163 | Priority number, date | DK20100070209 | 19.05.2010 Original published format: DK 201070209 | [2013/13] | Filing language | DA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011144211 | Date: | 24.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2571343 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2571343 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A01B15/06 | [2013/13] | CPC: |
A01B15/06 (EP,US);
E02F9/2808 (US);
A01B23/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ECKMESSER FÜR EIN BODENBEARBEITUNGSWERKZEUG | [2013/13] | English: | AN END BIT FOR A SOIL-WORKING TOOL | [2013/13] | French: | POINTE D'EXTRÉMITÉ POUR OUTIL DE TRAVAIL DU SOL | [2013/13] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/13] | 01.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 22.03.2017 | CY | 22.03.2017 | HR | 22.03.2017 | MC | 22.03.2017 | MK | 22.03.2017 | RO | 22.03.2017 | RS | 22.03.2017 | SI | 22.03.2017 | SK | 22.03.2017 | SM | 22.03.2017 | LU | 16.05.2017 | MT | 16.05.2017 | BE | 31.05.2017 | CH | 31.05.2017 | LI | 31.05.2017 | BG | 22.06.2017 | GR | 23.06.2017 | IS | 22.07.2017 | PT | 24.07.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/51] | CY | 22.03.2017 | |
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
MK | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 16.05.2017 | ||
MT | 16.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | CY | 22.03.2017 | |
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 16.05.2017 | ||
MT | 16.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HR | 22.03.2017 | |
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 16.05.2017 | ||
MT | 16.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | HR | 22.03.2017 | |
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 16.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | HR | 22.03.2017 | |
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 16.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | HR | 22.03.2017 | |
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | HR | 22.03.2017 | |
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | HR | 22.03.2017 | |
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | HR | 22.03.2017 | |
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/43] | HR | 22.03.2017 | |
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2047862 (DRUMMOND WILLIAM J) [X] 1,2 * page 1, left-hand column, line 44 - page 1, right-hand column, line 51; figures *; | [X]GB641825 (LUCEAN ARTHUR HEADEN) [X] 1,2,6 * page 3, line 16 - line 62; figure - *; | [X]GB653148 (JOHN VICTOR STOFFER, et al) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 104 - page 3, line 82; figure - *; | [X]GB678382 (FRANK WADE LTD, et al) [X] 7,8 * page 1, line 93 - page 2, line 83; figure - *; | [X]US2690112 (FREVIK RALPH C) [X] 1 * column 4, line 11 - line 41; figures 6-8 *; | [X]US3897642 (HELTON EUGENE L, et al) [X] 1,6 * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 60; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US4754816 (EDMISSION DELMAR D [US]) [X] 7* column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 56; figure - *; | [X]WO0156360 (KVERNELAND KLEPP AS [NO], et al) [X] 1,7 * page 5, line 22 - page 8, line 5; figures 1-10 *; | [X]EP1900269 (KUHN HUARD SA [FR]) [X] 7 * paragraph [0014]; figure 2 * |