EP2580446 - ZONAL MAPPING FOR COMBUSTION OPTIMIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2017 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.06.2017 [2017/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2013/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Guang 523 Hayes Irvine CA 92620 / US | 02 /
WIDMER, Neil, Colin 313 W. Avenida Gaviota San Clemente CA 92672 / US | [2013/16] | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth, et al Global Patent Operations Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/16] | Picker, Madeline Margaret, et al Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6JU / GB | Application number, filing date | 11725582.8 | 02.06.2011 | WO2011US38941 | Priority number, date | US20100796765 | 09.06.2010 Original published format: US 796765 | [2013/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011156203 | Date: | 15.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2580446 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F02C3/00, F23N5/00 | [2013/16] | CPC: |
F23C5/32 (EP,US);
F23C6/045 (EP,US);
F23L7/007 (EP,US);
F23L9/04 (EP,US);
F23N3/002 (EP,US);
F23N5/003 (EP,US);
F23C2201/101 (EP,US);
F23N2237/16 (EP,US);
F23N2241/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/16] | Title | German: | ZONENKARTIERUNG FÜR VERBRENNUNGSOPTIMIERUNG | [2013/16] | English: | ZONAL MAPPING FOR COMBUSTION OPTIMIZATION | [2013/16] | French: | CARTOGRAPHIE ZONALE POUR UNE OPTIMISATION DE LA COMBUSTION | [2013/16] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2013 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 03.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/24] | 27.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4252069 (MCCARTNEY MICHAEL S) [A] 1,5,6,14 * figures 1,5,6 * * column 3, line 11 - line 23 ** column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 8 *; | [A]US2006136161 (DRAXTON DEAN E [US], et al) [A] 1,6,14 * paragraphs [0005] , [0013] , [0016] , [0024] , [0031] , [0035] , [0036]; figure 1 *; | [XAY]EP1793167 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0017] , [0026] , [0027] , [0029] , [0030] , [0039] , [0040]; figure 1 * [A] 6,14 [Y] 5,10,11; | [XYI]GB2443551 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,6-9,12,13 * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0129] - [0134] - [0137] * [Y] 5,10,11 [I] 14; | [A]DE102008056675 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,6,14 * paragraphs [0024] , [0032] , [0033]; figure 1 * |