EP2563331 - PHARMACEUTICAL POWDER COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2016 [2016/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aesica Formulation Development Limited Q5, Quorum Business Park Benton Lane Newcastle Upon Tyne NE12 8BS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | For all designated states Aesica Formulation Development Limited BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COGHILL, James BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GF / GB | 02 /
ARMSTRONG, Robert BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GF / GB | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | Gilholm, Stephen Philip IPheions Intellectual Property Buzzard Office The Hawk Creative Business Park Easingwold, York YO61 3FE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | Gilholm, Stephen Philip IPheions Intellectual Property Buzzard Office The Hawk Creative Business Park Easingwold, York YO61 3FE / GB | Application number, filing date | 11725788.1 | 28.04.2011 | WO2011GB00671 | Priority number, date | GB20100007290 | 30.04.2010 Original published format: GB 201007290 | [2013/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011135314 | Date: | 03.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2563331 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K9/16, A61K31/55 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
A61K9/006 (EP,US);
A61K31/55 (EP,US);
A61K47/36 (EP,US);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/10] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE PULVERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2013/10] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL POWDER COMPOSITIONS | [2013/10] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES EN POUDRE | [2013/10] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 04.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/16] | 03.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.09.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2005089722 (BIODEL INC [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-29 * page 2, line 15 - line 28 * * page 4, line 24 - page 5, line 15 * * page 6, line 6 - line 14 * * page 7, line 17 - line 31 * * page 11, line 19 - line 31 * * page 13, line 3 - line 5 * [I] 8; | [A]US4229447 (PORTER WILLIAM R) [A] 1-29 * column 1, line 48 - line 64 * * column 3, line 24 - line 45 * * example 1 *; | [A]US2008279784 (CARTT STEVE [US], et al) [A] 1-29 * page 1, paragraph 0009 - paragraph 0010 * * page 2, paragraphs 0019,0024 * * page 26, paragraph 0129 * | by applicant | - Goodman and Gilman's The Pharmacological Basis of Therapeutics, MCGRAW HILL, (1996), page 363 | - A T FLORENCE, D ATTWOOD, Physicochemical Principles of Pharmacy, MACMILLAN, (1998), pages 357 - 360 | - A MARTIN, Physical Pharmacy, WILKINS AND WILKINS, (1993), pages 516 - 519 |