EP2572561 - METHOD FOR DIVIDING A LARGE SUBSTRATE INTO SMALLER ONES AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLABLY SELECTIVELY DEPOSITING A SEALANT MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/13] | METHOD FOR DIVIDING A LARGE SUBSTRATE INTO SMALLER ONES AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLABLY SELECTIVELY DEPOSITING A SEALANT MATERIAL | ||
[2016/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flexenable Limited 34 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 0FX / GB | [2015/45] |
Former [2013/13] | For all designated states Plastic Logic Limited 296 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 OFX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIEDEL, David Kyffhaeuserstrasse 32 01309 Dresden / DE | 02 /
LIEHR, Stefan Kieler Strasse 56 01109 Dresden / DE | 03 /
CORTEGA-CAGARA, Rina Anton-Graff Strasse 26 01309 Dresden / DE | [2016/29] |
Former [2013/13] | 01 /
RIEDEL, David Kyffhaeuserstrasse 32 01309 Dresden / DE | ||
02 /
LIEHR, Stefan Kieler Strasse 56 01109 Dresden / DE | |||
03 /
CORTEGA-CAGARA, Rina Anton-Graff Strasse 26 Dresden 01309 / PH | Representative(s) | Evans, Marc Nigel Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/29] | Evans, Marc Nigel Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2013/13] | Evans, Marc Nigel Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 11725894.7 | 03.06.2011 | [2016/29] | WO2011EP59215 | Priority number, date | GB20100009404 | 04.06.2010 Original published format: GB 201009404 | [2013/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011151453 | Date: | 08.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2572561 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2572561 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/28, H01L23/544, H05K1/18, H05K3/00, // H05K1/02, H05K3/32 | [2015/02] | CPC: |
H01L23/544 (EP,GB,US);
H05K3/00 (KR);
H05K3/0011 (US);
G02F1/1333 (GB);
H05K1/02 (KR);
H05K1/0269 (EP,US);
H05K3/0052 (EP,US);
H05K3/06 (US);
H05K3/28 (EP,KR,US);
H05K3/32 (KR);
H01L2223/5442 (EP,US);
H01L2223/54426 (EP,US);
H01L2223/5446 (EP,US);
H01L2223/5448 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H05K1/189 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0108 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09145 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09781 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09918 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10681 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0126 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0228 (EP,US);
H05K2203/1147 (EP,US);
H05K2203/166 (EP,US);
H05K3/323 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49155 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49789 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/13] | H05K3/00, H05K1/02, H05K3/28, H01L21/67, H01L23/31, H01L23/495, H05K1/18, H05K3/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/27] |
Former [2013/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UM EIN BREITES SUBSTRAT IN KLEINERE SUBSTRATE ZU TEILEN UND VERFAHREN UM AUF KONTROLLIERTE WEISE EIN VERSIEGELUNGSMATERIAL SELEKTIV ZU DEPONIEREN | [2016/11] | English: | METHOD FOR DIVIDING A LARGE SUBSTRATE INTO SMALLER ONES AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLABLY SELECTIVELY DEPOSITING A SEALANT MATERIAL | [2016/11] | French: | MÉTHODE POUR DIVISER UN SUBSTRAT LARGE EN SUBSTRATS PLUS PETITS ET MÉTHODE POUR DÉPOSER DE FAÇON CONTRÔLÉE UN MATÉRIAU DE SCELLEMENT | [2016/11] |
Former [2013/13] | VERFAHREN UM EINEN BREITEN SUBSTRAT IN KLEINERE SUBSTRATE ZU TEILEN UND VERFAHREN UM AUF KONTROLLIEREN WEISE EIN VERSIEGLUNGSMATERIAL SELEKTIV ZU DEPONIEREN | ||
Former [2013/13] | METHOD FOR DIVIDING A LARGE SUBSTRATE INTO SMALLER ONES AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLABLY SELECTIVELY DEPOSITING A SEALANT MATERIAL | ||
Former [2013/13] | MÉTHODE POUR DIVISER UN SUBSTRAT LARGE EN SUBSTRATS PLUS PETITS ET MÉTHODE POUR DÉPOSER DE FAÇON CONTROLLÉE UN MATÉRIAU DE SCELLEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/13] | 12.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 15.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/26] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 23.09.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 23.09.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.10.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.06.2011 | AL | 20.07.2016 | AT | 20.07.2016 | BE | 20.07.2016 | CY | 20.07.2016 | CZ | 20.07.2016 | DK | 20.07.2016 | EE | 20.07.2016 | ES | 20.07.2016 | FI | 20.07.2016 | HR | 20.07.2016 | IT | 20.07.2016 | LT | 20.07.2016 | LV | 20.07.2016 | MC | 20.07.2016 | MK | 20.07.2016 | NL | 20.07.2016 | PL | 20.07.2016 | RO | 20.07.2016 | RS | 20.07.2016 | SE | 20.07.2016 | SI | 20.07.2016 | SK | 20.07.2016 | SM | 20.07.2016 | TR | 20.07.2016 | BG | 20.10.2016 | NO | 20.10.2016 | GR | 21.10.2016 | IS | 20.11.2016 | PT | 21.11.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 03.06.2011 | |
AL | 20.07.2016 | ||
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
MK | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 03.06.2011 | |
AL | 20.07.2016 | ||
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 03.06.2011 | |
AL | 20.07.2016 | ||
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 20.07.2016 | |
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 20.07.2016 | |
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 20.07.2016 | |
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 20.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [I]US5266380 (RENGUSO ANTHONY J [US], et al) [I] 1,2,4 * the whole document *; | [I]DE19742839 (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH [KR]) [I] 1,2,4 * the whole document *; | [I]DE19742837 (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH [KR]) [I] 1,2,4 * the whole document *; | [I]DE19742268 (ORGA KARTENSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [I] 1,2,4 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002114507 (LYNCH MARK [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002185482 (COBB BRIAN LEE [US], et al) [A] 5,6 * the whole document *; | [X]US2006078187 (KUDOH KAZUO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US2008244901 (TSUNEKAWA MAKOTO [JP]) [A] 5,6* the whole document *; | [A]US2009314739 (YANG CHIH-KANG [TW], et al) [A] 5,6 * the whole document * |