EP2576033 - DEVICE FOR GASSING LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INVENT Umwelt- und Verfahrenstechnik AG Am Pestalozziring 21 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2013/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÖFKEN, Marcus Platenstraße 22a 91054 Erlangen / DE | [2013/15] | Representative(s) | Gassner, Wolfgang, et al Dr. Gassner & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Marie-Curie-Strasse 1 91052 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Gassner, Wolfgang, et al Dr. Gassner & Partner Marie-Curie-Straße 1 D-91052 Erlangen / DE | Application number, filing date | 11725897.0 | 06.06.2011 | WO2011EP59290 | Priority number, date | DE20101029754 | 07.06.2010 Original published format: DE102010029754 | [2013/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011154354 | Date: | 15.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2576033 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2576033 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01F3/04, C02F3/20 | [2013/15] | CPC: |
C02F3/201 (EP,US);
B01F23/20 (KR);
B01D19/001 (KR);
B01F23/2311 (EP,US);
B01F23/231143 (EP,US);
B01F23/23122 (EP,US);
B01F23/23124 (EP,US);
B01F23/23125 (EP,US);
B01F23/231262 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM BEGASEN VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2013/15] | English: | DEVICE FOR GASSING LIQUIDS | [2013/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT PAR EXPOSITION AU GAZ DE LIQUIDES | [2013/15] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 26.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.03.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 14.05.2014 | BG | 14.05.2014 | CY | 14.05.2014 | EE | 14.05.2014 | HR | 14.05.2014 | LT | 14.05.2014 | LV | 14.05.2014 | MC | 14.05.2014 | MK | 14.05.2014 | MT | 14.05.2014 | RO | 14.05.2014 | RS | 14.05.2014 | SI | 14.05.2014 | SK | 14.05.2014 | SM | 14.05.2014 | TR | 14.05.2014 | LU | 06.06.2014 | NO | 14.08.2014 | GR | 15.08.2014 | IS | 14.09.2014 | PT | 15.09.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | BG | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
MK | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
SM | 14.05.2014 | ||
TR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LU | 06.06.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | BG | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
SM | 14.05.2014 | ||
TR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LU | 06.06.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
SM | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
SM | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 14.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [YD]EP0549518 (HUBER & SUHNER AG [CH]) [YD] 6 * abstract * * figures 1, 2 *; | [AD]DE9415775U (VOGEL MICHAELA [DE]) [AD] 9* figures 1, 1A *; | [XYI]EP0940371 (YIXING GLASS FIBER REINFORCED [CN]) [X] 1-5,7 * abstract * * figures 1, 5 * * paragraphs [0010] , [0012] , [0013] * [Y] 6,13 [I] 8-12; | [A]US2003192817 (FRANKEL THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 9 * figures 1, 8, 9 *; | [Y]EP2110170 (ITT MFG ENTERPRISES INC [US]) [Y] 13 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * | by applicant | EP0549518 | DE9415775U | EP0940371 | EP2110170 |