EP2588361 - STEERING GEAR HOUSING FOR A STEERING UNIT IN A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2016 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch Automotive Steering GmbH Richard-Bullinger-Strasse 77 73527 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE | [2015/19] |
Former [2013/19] | For all designated states ZF-Lenksysteme GmbH Richard-Bullinger-Strasse 77 73527 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIEBER, Jürgen Auf der Weid 3 73655 Plüderhausen / DE | [2013/19] | Application number, filing date | 11726095.0 | 08.06.2011 | WO2011EP59456 | Priority number, date | DE20101030737 | 30.06.2010 Original published format: DE102010030737 | [2013/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012000748 | Date: | 05.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2588361 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2588361 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F16H57/025, B62D3/12 | [2015/07] | CPC: |
B62D3/12 (EP,US);
F16H57/025 (US);
Y10T74/2186 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/19] | B62D3/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LENKGEHÄUSE FÜR EINE LENKEINRICHTUNG IN EINEM FAHRZEUG | [2013/19] | English: | STEERING GEAR HOUSING FOR A STEERING UNIT IN A VEHICLE | [2013/19] | French: | CARTER DE DIRECTION POUR DISPOSITIF DE DIRECTION DANS UN VÉHICULE | [2013/19] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/19] | 27.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.06.2011 | AL | 27.05.2015 | CY | 27.05.2015 | CZ | 27.05.2015 | DK | 27.05.2015 | EE | 27.05.2015 | FI | 27.05.2015 | HR | 27.05.2015 | LT | 27.05.2015 | LV | 27.05.2015 | MC | 27.05.2015 | MK | 27.05.2015 | MT | 27.05.2015 | NL | 27.05.2015 | RO | 27.05.2015 | RS | 27.05.2015 | SE | 27.05.2015 | SI | 27.05.2015 | SM | 27.05.2015 | TR | 27.05.2015 | IE | 08.06.2015 | LU | 08.06.2015 | BE | 30.06.2015 | CH | 30.06.2015 | LI | 30.06.2015 | FR | 27.07.2015 | BG | 27.08.2015 | GB | 27.08.2015 | NO | 27.08.2015 | GR | 28.08.2015 | IS | 27.09.2015 | PT | 28.09.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 08.06.2011 | |
CY | 27.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
MK | 27.05.2015 | ||
MT | 27.05.2015 | ||
NL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SE | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SM | 27.05.2015 | ||
TR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IE | 08.06.2015 | ||
LU | 08.06.2015 | ||
BE | 30.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 27.07.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
GB | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 08.06.2011 | |
CY | 27.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
MT | 27.05.2015 | ||
NL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SE | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SM | 27.05.2015 | ||
TR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IE | 08.06.2015 | ||
LU | 08.06.2015 | ||
BE | 30.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 27.07.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
GB | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 08.06.2011 | |
CY | 27.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
MT | 27.05.2015 | ||
NL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SE | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SM | 27.05.2015 | ||
TR | 27.05.2015 | ||
IE | 08.06.2015 | ||
BE | 30.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 27.07.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
GB | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
MT | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
IE | 08.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 27.07.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
GB | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
IE | 08.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
FR | 27.07.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
GB | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
IE | 08.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
GB | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
IE | 08.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
IE | 08.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CZ | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
IE | 08.06.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | CZ | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | DK | 27.05.2015 | |
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | DK | 27.05.2015 | |
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 27.05.2015 | |
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 27.05.2015 | |
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9005083 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1-3,5-7,10 * page 3, line 19 - page 5, line 23 ** figure - *; | [I]JP2008265648 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] - [0016] * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE102008041501 (ZF LENKSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0010] * * paragraphs [0025] , [0026] * * figure - * | by applicant | JP2008265648 |