EP2584882 - TINE CONTROL FOR BALERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 29.03.2019 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forage Innovations B.V. Cornelis van der Lelylaan 1 3147 PB Maassluis / NL | [2017/20] |
Former [2013/18] | For all designated states Forage Innovations B.V. Weverskade 110 3147 PA Maassluis / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUENWALD, Tom 1331 Boone Street Pella, Iowa / US | 02 /
REIJERSEN VAN BUUREN, Willem, Jacobus Emmalaan 2a NL-3247 AE Dirksland / NL | 03 /
BERGMANN, Thomas Mühlberg 35 01844 Neustadt Sachsen / DE | [2013/18] | Representative(s) | AGCO Intellectual Property Department AGCO Limited Abbey Park Stoneleigh Kenilworth CV8 2TQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/18] | AGCO Intellectual Property Department AGCO Limited Abbey Park Stoneleigh Kenilworth, Warwickshire CV8 2TQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11726203.0 | 15.06.2011 | [2015/46] | WO2011NL00048 | Priority number, date | US20100357159P | 22.06.2010 Original published format: US 357159 P | [2013/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011162597 | Date: | 29.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2584882 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2584882 | Date: | 11.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/46] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2584882 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A01F15/04, A01F15/10 | [2015/29] | CPC: |
A01F15/101 (EP,US);
A01F15/10 (CN,US);
A01F15/046 (US);
A01F2015/102 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/18] | A01F15/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/18] | Title | German: | STEUERUNG FÜR EINEN ZINKEN FÜR RUNDBALLENPRESSE | [2015/29] | English: | TINE CONTROL FOR BALERS | [2013/18] | French: | ASSERVICEMENT POUR UNE DENT DE PRESSE À BALLE RONDE | [2015/29] |
Former [2013/18] | ZINKENSTEUERUNG FÜR BALLENPRESSEN | ||
Former [2013/18] | COMMANDE DE DENTS POUR PRESSES À FOURRAGE | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/18] | 19.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 31.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15193270.4 / EP3020267 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.07.2016
21.07.2016
ADMISSIBLE CNH Industrial Belgium nv Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE Opponent's representative Wächter, Jochen Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | [2017/21] |
Former [2016/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.07.2016
21.07.2016
ADMISSIBLE CNH Industrial Belgium nv Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE Opponent's representative CNH Industrial IP Department Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | 19.09.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.10.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.11.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 21.12.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 05.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 18.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 02.07.2018 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.11.2018 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 06.03.2019 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 12.09.2018 | Appeal received No. T2281/18 | 08.11.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Request for further processing for: | 31.10.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 31.10.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.11.2013 | Decision despatched | 31.10.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 31.10.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.11.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.06.2011 | AL | 11.11.2015 | AT | 11.11.2015 | BE | 11.11.2015 | BG | 11.11.2015 | CY | 11.11.2015 | CZ | 11.11.2015 | DK | 11.11.2015 | EE | 11.11.2015 | ES | 11.11.2015 | FI | 11.11.2015 | HR | 11.11.2015 | IT | 11.11.2015 | LT | 11.11.2015 | LV | 11.11.2015 | MC | 11.11.2015 | MK | 11.11.2015 | NL | 11.11.2015 | RO | 11.11.2015 | RS | 11.11.2015 | SE | 11.11.2015 | SI | 11.11.2015 | SK | 11.11.2015 | SM | 11.11.2015 | TR | 11.11.2015 | NO | 11.02.2016 | GR | 12.02.2016 | IS | 11.03.2016 | PT | 11.03.2016 | IE | 15.06.2016 | LU | 15.06.2016 | CH | 30.06.2016 | LI | 30.06.2016 | MT | 30.06.2016 | [2023/29] |
Former [2020/39] | HU | 15.06.2011 | |
AL | 11.11.2015 | ||
AT | 11.11.2015 | ||
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
BG | 11.11.2015 | ||
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
MK | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
TR | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
IE | 15.06.2016 | ||
LU | 15.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2019/44] | HU | 15.06.2011 | |
AL | 11.11.2015 | ||
AT | 11.11.2015 | ||
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
BG | 11.11.2015 | ||
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
MK | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
TR | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
IE | 15.06.2016 | ||
LU | 15.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | HU | 15.06.2011 | |
AL | 11.11.2015 | ||
AT | 11.11.2015 | ||
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
BG | 11.11.2015 | ||
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
MK | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
TR | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
IE | 15.06.2016 | ||
LU | 15.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 15.06.2011 | |
AT | 11.11.2015 | ||
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
BG | 11.11.2015 | ||
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
MK | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
TR | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
IE | 15.06.2016 | ||
LU | 15.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 15.06.2011 | |
AT | 11.11.2015 | ||
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
MK | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
TR | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
IE | 15.06.2016 | ||
LU | 15.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 15.06.2011 | |
AT | 11.11.2015 | ||
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
MK | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
TR | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
IE | 15.06.2016 | ||
LU | 15.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 15.06.2011 | |
AT | 11.11.2015 | ||
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
MK | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
IE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/25] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
IE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
ES | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 11.11.2015 | |
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
RS | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 11.11.2015 | |
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 11.11.2015 | |
IT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 11.11.2015 | |
LT | 11.11.2015 | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR1185953 (RECH EXPL INVENT GUILLOTIN) [Y] 15* page 1; figures 1-3 *; | [XY]US4644862 (YOUNG ROBERT G [US]) [X] 1-3,10,14,15 * column 1, lines 6-16; figure 1 * * column 3, lines 1-43 * [Y] 15; | [XY]EP1769674 (CLAAS FRANCE SAS [FR]) [X] 1-3,10,14,15 * paragraph [0030]; figures 2-4 * [Y] 15 | Examination | US4825760 | US2003172640 | WO2011053122 | by applicant | US4644826 | US4825760 | DE3638792 | EP0870425 | WO02074065 | US2003172640 | US6647706 | EP1284594 | EP1769674 | WO2011053122 | Opposition | FR1185953 | US4644862 | GB2219967 | EP1769674 | DD287866 | EP1284594 |