EP2576875 - NOZZLE PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Innovation GmbH Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 20 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2013/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEINEMANN, Maren Im neuen Feld 3 51467 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 02 /
BRAUN, Arne Schlebuscher Heide 35 51375 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
KÖNIG, Thomas Haydnstr. 15 51375 Leverkusen / DE | 04 /
BOOS, Karl-Robert Kölner Str. 23 51399 Burscheid / DE | 05 /
LACHMANN, Lars Walkenrieder Str. 19 12347 Berlin / DE | [2013/15] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 11727655.0 | 24.05.2011 | WO2011EP58504 | Priority number, date | DE20101021636 | 26.05.2010 Original published format: DE102010021636 | [2013/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011147848 | Date: | 01.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2576875 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | D01D4/02, D01F9/08, B29C47/30, C03B37/01 | [2013/15] | CPC: |
B29C48/05 (EP,US);
B29C48/022 (EP,US);
B29C48/345 (EP,US);
C03B37/011 (EP,US);
C03B37/083 (EP,US);
D01D4/02 (EP,US);
D01D4/027 (EP,US);
D01D5/06 (US);
D01F9/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Title | German: | DÜSENPLATTE | [2013/15] | English: | NOZZLE PLATE | [2013/15] | French: | FILIÈRE | [2013/15] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 12.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/20] | 11.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4724109 (YAMASHITA MITSUO [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,8 * abstract * * column 4, lines 11-14 * [I] 7; | [XI]JPH01153552 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [X] 1-6,8 * abstract *[I] 7; | [XI]EP0392466 (NITTO BOSEKI CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-6,8 * abstract * * page 4, lines 6-8 * [I] 7 | Examination | GB1126609 | DE2324599 | WO03104535 | by applicant | DE19609551 | DE102004063599 |