EP2588992 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MEASURING OPTICAL PROPERTIES OF AN OPTICALLY VARIABLE MARKING APPLIED TO AN OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SICPA HOLDING SA Avenue de Florissant 41 1008 Prilly / CH | [2017/06] |
Former [2013/19] | For all designated states SICPA HOLDING SA Avenue de Florissant 41 1008 Prilly / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DECOUX, Eric Impasse Pra d'Amont 5 CH-1753 Matran / CH | 02 /
SCHWAB, Xavier Chemin de Fontadel 5 CH-1008 Prilly / CH | [2013/19] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2017/06] |
Former [2013/19] | Neugebauer, Jürgen, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71-73 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11728014.9 | 29.06.2011 | [2017/06] | WO2011EP60955 | Priority number, date | US20100370228P | 03.08.2010 Original published format: US 370228 P | EP20100171741 | 03.08.2010 Original published format: EP 10171741 | US20100359654P | 29.06.2010 Original published format: US 359654 P | EP20100167697 | 29.06.2010 Original published format: EP 10167697 | [2013/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012001077 | Date: | 05.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2588992 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2588992 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/10, G07D7/12 | [2013/19] | CPC: |
G07D7/121 (EP,US);
G06K7/10722 (EP,US);
G06K7/10792 (EP,US);
G06K7/10831 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM MESSEN DER OPTISCHEN EIGENSCHAFTEN EINER OPTISCH VARIABLEN MARKIERUNG, DIE AUF EIN OBJEKT ANGEWANDT WURDE | [2013/19] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MEASURING OPTICAL PROPERTIES OF AN OPTICALLY VARIABLE MARKING APPLIED TO AN OBJECT | [2013/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE MESURER LES PROPRIÉTÉS OPTIQUES D'UN MARQUAGE OPTIQUEMENT VARIABLE APPLIQUÉ SUR UN OBJET | [2013/19] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/19] | 23.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.06.2011 | AL | 08.02.2017 | AT | 08.02.2017 | CY | 08.02.2017 | CZ | 08.02.2017 | DK | 08.02.2017 | EE | 08.02.2017 | ES | 08.02.2017 | FI | 08.02.2017 | HR | 08.02.2017 | IT | 08.02.2017 | LT | 08.02.2017 | LV | 08.02.2017 | MC | 08.02.2017 | MK | 08.02.2017 | NL | 08.02.2017 | PL | 08.02.2017 | RO | 08.02.2017 | RS | 08.02.2017 | SE | 08.02.2017 | SI | 08.02.2017 | SK | 08.02.2017 | SM | 08.02.2017 | TR | 08.02.2017 | BG | 08.05.2017 | NO | 08.05.2017 | GR | 09.05.2017 | IS | 08.06.2017 | PT | 08.06.2017 | GB | 29.06.2017 | IE | 29.06.2017 | LU | 29.06.2017 | MT | 29.06.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | FR | 30.06.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 29.06.2011 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CY | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
MK | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
TR | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
GB | 29.06.2017 | ||
IE | 29.06.2017 | ||
LU | 29.06.2017 | ||
MT | 29.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 29.06.2011 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CY | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
MK | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
GB | 29.06.2017 | ||
IE | 29.06.2017 | ||
LU | 29.06.2017 | ||
MT | 29.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 29.06.2011 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CY | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
GB | 29.06.2017 | ||
IE | 29.06.2017 | ||
LU | 29.06.2017 | ||
MT | 29.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 29.06.2011 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
GB | 29.06.2017 | ||
IE | 29.06.2017 | ||
LU | 29.06.2017 | ||
MT | 29.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
GB | 29.06.2017 | ||
IE | 29.06.2017 | ||
LU | 29.06.2017 | ||
MT | 29.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
GB | 29.06.2017 | ||
IE | 29.06.2017 | ||
LU | 29.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
GB | 29.06.2017 | ||
IE | 29.06.2017 | ||
LU | 29.06.2017 | ||
FR | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
GB | 29.06.2017 | ||
IE | 29.06.2017 | ||
LU | 29.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
GB | 29.06.2017 | ||
LU | 29.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2008128714 (SICPA HOLDING SA [CH], et al) [A] 1,6,11* page 57, line 5 - page 58, line 23 * |