EP2588038 - INSTRUMENT FOR USE IN MANIPULATING AN IMPLANT COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Finsbury (Development) Limited Unit 13, Mole Business Park Randalls Road Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 7BA / GB | [2013/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STACEY, Thomas C/O DePuy International Limited St Anthony's Road Beeston Leeds West Yorkshire LS11 8DT / GB | [2013/19] | Representative(s) | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/12] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2013/19] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 11728043.8 | 14.06.2011 | WO2011GB51110 | Priority number, date | GB20100017041 | 11.10.2010 Original published format: GB 201017041 | GB20100011097 | 01.07.2010 Original published format: GB 201011097 | [2013/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012001385 | Date: | 05.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2588038 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2588038 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/46 | [2013/19] | CPC: |
A61F2/461 (EP,US);
A61F2/4603 (EP,US);
A61F2/3859 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30537 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4625 (US);
A61F2002/4681 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INSTRUMENT ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER MANIPULATION EINER IMPLANTATKOMPONENTE | [2013/19] | English: | INSTRUMENT FOR USE IN MANIPULATING AN IMPLANT COMPONENT | [2013/19] | French: | INSTRUMENT DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ DANS LA MANIPULATION D'UN COMPOSANT D'IMPLANT | [2013/19] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/19] | 12.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.06.2011 | AL | 19.03.2014 | AT | 19.03.2014 | BE | 19.03.2014 | CY | 19.03.2014 | CZ | 19.03.2014 | DK | 19.03.2014 | EE | 19.03.2014 | ES | 19.03.2014 | FI | 19.03.2014 | HR | 19.03.2014 | IT | 19.03.2014 | LT | 19.03.2014 | LV | 19.03.2014 | MK | 19.03.2014 | NL | 19.03.2014 | PL | 19.03.2014 | RO | 19.03.2014 | RS | 19.03.2014 | SE | 19.03.2014 | SI | 19.03.2014 | SK | 19.03.2014 | SM | 19.03.2014 | TR | 19.03.2014 | BG | 19.06.2014 | NO | 19.06.2014 | GR | 20.06.2014 | IS | 19.07.2014 | PT | 21.07.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 14.06.2011 | |
AT | 19.03.2014 | ||
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MK | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
SM | 19.03.2014 | ||
TR | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 14.06.2011 | |
AT | 19.03.2014 | ||
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
SM | 19.03.2014 | ||
TR | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 14.06.2011 | |
AT | 19.03.2014 | ||
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
SM | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
SM | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
SM | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | BE | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | BE | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BE | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | BE | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
HR | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
RS | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
NO | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 19.03.2014 | |
NO | 19.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5059196 (COATES BRADLEY J [US]) [A] 1 * abstract ** figure 1 *; | [A]US5417693 (SOWDEN BJORN K [GB], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 7, line 25 - line 37 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5928287 (KELLER ARNOLD [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 56 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2008016312 (ENZTEC LTD [NZ], et al) [A] 1 * page 4, line 29 - page 5, line 36 * * page 6, line 14 - page 7, line 9 * * figures 1-4 * | by applicant | US5732992 |