EP2575907 - A SURGICAL GEL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hemcon Medical Technologies (IP) Limited 10 Church Place Sallynoggin Dublin / IE | [2013/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DVORÁK, Radim c/o Hemcon Medical Technologies (IP) Limited 10 Church Place Sallynoggin Dublin / IE | 02 /
BARTOSOVSKÁ, Radka c/o Hemcon Medical Technologies (IP) Limited 10 Church Place Sallynoggin Dublin / IE | 03 /
VANKOVÁ, Jitka c/o Hemcon Medical Technologies (IP) Limited 10 Church Place Sallynoggin Dublin / IE | 04 /
KUHN, Sam c/o Hemcon Medical Technologies (IP) Limited 10 Church Place Sallynoggin Dublin / IE | 05 /
REAL, Keith c/o Hemcon Medical Technologies (IP) Limited 10 Church Place Sallynoggin Dublin / IE | 06 /
GENCO, Jennifer, M. c/o Hemcon Medical Technologies (IP) Limited 10 Church Place Sallynoggin Dublin / IE | 07 /
ADAMS, Jennifer c/o Hemcon Medical Technologies (IP) Limited 10 Church Place Sallynoggin Dublin / IE | [2013/15] | Representative(s) | O'Brien, John Augustine, et al John A. O'Brien & Associates Unit 4, The Courtyard Business Centre Orchard Lane Blackrock, County Dublin, A94 NV07 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | O'Brien, John Augustine, et al John A. O'Brien & Associates, Third Floor, Duncairn House, 14 Carysfort Avenue Blackrock, County Dublin / IE | Application number, filing date | 11728064.4 | 01.06.2011 | WO2011IE00029 | Priority number, date | US20100344167P | 03.06.2010 Original published format: US 344167 P | [2013/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011151810 | Date: | 08.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2575907 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2575907 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61L24/00, A61L24/04, A61L24/08 | [2015/12] | CPC: |
A61L26/0052 (EP,US);
A61L24/0026 (EP,US);
A61L24/043 (EP,US);
A61L24/08 (EP,US);
A61L26/0023 (EP,US);
A61L26/0047 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61L24/043, C08L5/06 (US,EP);
A61L26/0023, C08L5/06 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2013/15] | A61L26/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHES GELSYSTEM | [2013/15] | English: | A SURGICAL GEL SYSTEM | [2013/15] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GEL CHIRURGICAL | [2013/15] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 18.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.06.2011 | AL | 29.07.2015 | AT | 29.07.2015 | BE | 29.07.2015 | BG | 29.07.2015 | CY | 29.07.2015 | CZ | 29.07.2015 | DK | 29.07.2015 | EE | 29.07.2015 | ES | 29.07.2015 | FI | 29.07.2015 | HR | 29.07.2015 | IT | 29.07.2015 | LT | 29.07.2015 | LV | 29.07.2015 | MC | 29.07.2015 | MK | 29.07.2015 | NL | 29.07.2015 | PL | 29.07.2015 | RO | 29.07.2015 | RS | 29.07.2015 | SE | 29.07.2015 | SI | 29.07.2015 | SK | 29.07.2015 | SM | 29.07.2015 | TR | 29.07.2015 | NO | 29.10.2015 | GR | 30.10.2015 | IS | 29.11.2015 | PT | 30.11.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 01.06.2011 | |
AT | 29.07.2015 | ||
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
BG | 29.07.2015 | ||
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
TR | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 01.06.2011 | |
AT | 29.07.2015 | ||
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
TR | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 01.06.2011 | |
AT | 29.07.2015 | ||
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
TR | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 01.06.2011 | |
AT | 29.07.2015 | ||
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
MK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MC | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
BE | 29.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RO | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
SK | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
CZ | 29.07.2015 | ||
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
DK | 29.07.2015 | ||
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NL | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 29.07.2015 | |
ES | 29.07.2015 | ||
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 29.07.2015 | |
FI | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
PL | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SE | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
PT | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 29.07.2015 | |
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 29.07.2015 | |
NO | 29.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 29.07.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004106730 (SANTAR IVAN [CZ], et al) [A] 1-30 * page 1, paragraph 6 * * page 2, paragraphs 31-39 * * page 3, paragraphs 44-47 *; | [A]GB2399289 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON MEDICAL LTD [GB]) [A] 1-30 * page 4, lines 11-31 * * page 8, lines 1-32 ** claim - *; | [I]US2006008505 (BRANDON GERARD J [IE]) [I] 1-30 * page 1, paragraphs 21-24 * * claim - * | by applicant | WO2007026341 | - VALENTINE, R., P.J. WORMALD, R. SINDWANI, "Advances in absorbable biomaterials and nasal packing", OTOLARYNGOL CLIN NORTH AM, (2009), vol. 42, no. 5, pages 813 - 28,IX | - VIRGIN, F.W., B.S. BLEIER, B.A. WOODWORTH, "Evolving materials and techniques for endoscopic sinus surgery", OTOLARYNGOL CLIN NORTH AM, (2010), vol. 43, no. 3, pages 653 - 72,XI | - BUGTEN, V. ET AL., "Effects of nonabsorbable packing in middle meatus after sinus surgery", LARYNGOSCOPE, (2006), vol. 116, no. 1, pages 83 - 8 | - CHANDRA, R.K., R.C. KERN, "Advantages and disadvantages of topical packing in endoscopic sinus surgery", CURR OPIN OTOLARYNGOL HEAD NECK SURG, (2004), vol. 12, no. 1, pages 21 - 6 | - HUGGINS, S., "Control of hemorrhage in otorhinolaryngologic surgery with oxidized regenerated cellulose", EYE EAR NOSE THROAT MON, (1969), vol. 48, no. 7, pages 420 - 3 | - SHAW, C.L. ET AL., "Effect of packing on nasal mucosa of sheep", J LARYNGOL OTOL, (2000), vol. 114, no. 7, pages 506 - 9 | - VON SCHOENBERG, M., P. ROBINSON, R. RYAN, "Nasal packing after routine nasal surgery--is it justified?", J LARYNGOL OTOL, (1993), vol. 107, no. 10, pages 902 - 5 | - CHANDRA, R.K. ET AL., "Long-term effects of FloSeal packing after endoscopic sinus surgery", AM J RHINOL, (2005), vol. 19, no. 3, pages 240 - 3 | - CHANDRA, R.K., D.B. CONLEY, R.C. KERN, "The effect of FloSeal on mucosal healing after endoscopic sinus surgery: a comparison with thrombin-soaked gelatin foam", AM J RHINOL, (2003), vol. 17, no. 1, pages 51 - 5 | - FRENKIEL, S., M.Y. DESROSIERS, D. NACHTIGAL, "Use of hylan B gel as a wound dressing after endoscopic sinus surgery", J OTOLARYNGOL, (2002), vol. 31, no. 1, pages 41 - 4 | - KARKOS, P.D. ET AL., "Day-case endoscopic sinus surgery using dissolvable haemostatic nasal packs: a pilot study", EUR ARCH OTORHINOLARYNGOL, (2007), vol. 264, no. 10, doi:doi:10.1007/s00405-007-0338-5, pages 1171 - 4, XP019541772 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00405-007-0338-5 | - MACCABEE, M.S., D.R. TRUNE, P.H. HWANG, "Effects of topically applied biomaterials on paranasal sinus mucosal healing", AM J RHINOL, (2003), vol. 17, no. 4, pages 203 - 7 | - POMERANTZ, J., J.M. DUTTON, "Platelet gel for endoscopic sinus surgery", ANN OTOL RHINOL LARYNGOL, (2005), vol. 114, no. 9, pages 699 - 704 | - WOODWORTH, B.A. ET AL., "A gelatin-thrombin matrix for hemostasis after endoscopic sinus surgery", AM J OTOLARYNGOL, (2009), vol. 30, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/j.amjoto.2007.11.008, pages 49 - 53, XP026068351 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.amjoto.2007.11.008 | - WORMALD, P.J. ET AL., "A prospective single-blind randomized controlled study of use of hyaluronic acid nasal packs in patients after endoscopic sinus surgery", AM J RHINOL, (2006), vol. 20, no. 1, pages 7 - 10 | - LEVI, M., T. VAN DER POLL, "Two-way interactions between inflammation and coagulation", TRENDS CARDIOVASC MED, (2005), vol. 15, no. 7, doi:doi:10.1016/j.tcm.2005.07.004, pages 254 - 9, XP005113606 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tcm.2005.07.004 | - LEVI, M., T. VAN DER POLL, H.R. BULLER, "Bidirectional relation between inflammation and coagulation", CIRCULATION, (2004), vol. 109, no. 22, pages 2698 - 704 | - HIRSCH, N., D. HAILEY, "The evolution of laparoscopic surgery in routine health care", INT J TECHNOL ASSESS HEALTH CARE, (1995), vol. 11, no. 4, pages 779 - 85 | - VARELA, J.E. ET AL., "Outcomes of laparoscopic and open colectomy at academic centers", AM J SURG, (2008), vol. 196, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/j.amjsurg.2007.11.030, pages 403 - 6, XP023976776 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.amjsurg.2007.11.030 | - SINGER AJ, MCCLAIN SA, KATZ A, "A porcine epistaxis model: hemostatic effects of octylcyanoarylate", OTOLARYNGOL HEAD NECK SURG, (2004), vol. 130, no. 5, pages 553 - 557 |