EP2606177 - METHOD FOR FILTERING SUSPENSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2014 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 25.06.2014 [2014/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Str. 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89520 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARLSEN, Eirik, Kultom Betzy Kjelsbergsvei 7 N-0486 Oslo / NO | [2013/26] | Application number, filing date | 11728271.5 | 29.06.2011 | WO2011EP60889 | Priority number, date | DE20101039506 | 19.08.2010 Original published format: DE102010039506 | [2013/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012022528 | Date: | 23.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2606177 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | D21D5/04, B01D33/21 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
B01D37/045 (EP);
B01D33/21 (EP);
B01D33/39 (EP);
D21D5/046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FILTERUNG VON SUSPENSIONEN | [2013/26] | English: | METHOD FOR FILTERING SUSPENSIONS | [2013/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FILTRAGE DE SUSPENSIONS | [2013/26] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/26] | 15.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/25] | 16.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/26] | 21.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2014/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2932402 (LOGNE LELAND H, et al) [A] 1,9 * column 2, line 70 - column 3, line 72; figures 1-3 * * column 5, line 47 - line 72; figure 15 *; | [A]DE3235003 (KUFFERATH ANDREAS KG [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document * |