EP2588311 - A panel comprising a polymeric composite layer and a reinforcement layer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/19] | A PANEL COMPRISING A POLYMERIC COMPOSITE LAYER AND A REINFORCEMENT LAYER | ||
[2017/01] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 21.02.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.12.2016 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unilin, BVBA Ooigemstraat 3 8710 Wielsbeke / BE | [2020/13] |
Former [2017/29] | For all designated states Unilin, BVBA Ooigemstraat 3 8710 Wielsbeke / BE | ||
Former [2013/19] | For all designated states Spanolux N.V. - Div. Balterio Wakkensteenweg 37B 8710 Sint-Baafs-Vijve / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERMEULEN, Bruno Paul Louis Grinaraweg 14 B-3680 Aldeneik-Maaseik / BE | [2013/19] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Göteborg / SE | [2020/13] |
Former [2013/19] | De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 11728282.2 | 30.06.2011 | [2017/18] | WO2011EP60991 | Priority number, date | EP20100167985 | 30.06.2010 Original published format: EP 10167985 | [2013/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012001091 | Date: | 05.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2588311 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2588311 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2588311 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | [2017/32] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2588311 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B32B21/10, E04C2/18, E04C2/22, E04F13/16, E04F15/02, E04F15/10 | [2013/19] | CPC: |
E04C2/22 (EP,RU,US);
B32B21/02 (EP,US);
B32B21/08 (EP,US);
B32B21/10 (EP,US);
B32B5/028 (EP,US);
B32B5/12 (EP,US);
B32B5/30 (EP,US);
E04C2/246 (EP,US);
E04F13/0878 (EP,US);
E04F13/16 (RU);
E04F15/10 (RU);
E04F15/102 (EP);
E04F15/107 (EP);
E04F15/181 (EP,US);
B32B2260/023 (EP,US);
B32B2260/028 (EP,US);
B32B2307/734 (EP,US);
B32B2471/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/19] | Title | German: | Paneel mit einer Polymerverbundstoffschicht und einer Verstärkungsschicht | [2019/24] | English: | A panel comprising a polymeric composite layer and a reinforcement layer | [2019/24] | French: | Panneau comprenant une couche composée polymère et une couche de renfort | [2019/24] |
Former [2013/19] | PANEEL MIT EINER POLYMERVERBUNDSTOFFSCHICHT UND VERSTÄRKUNGSSCHICHT | ||
Former [2013/19] | A PANEL COMPRISING A POLYMERIC COMPOSITE LAYER AND A REINFORCEMENT LAYER | ||
Former [2013/19] | PANNEAU COMPRENANT UNE COUCHE COMPOSITE POLYMÈRE ET UNE COUCHE DE RENFORCEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/19] | 02.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17168881.5 / EP3243653 | EP19180845.0 / EP3564031 | EP19180846.8 / EP3575080 | EP19180847.6 / EP3564032 | EP19180849.2 / EP3564033 | EP19180851.8 / EP3575081 | EP19180853.4 / EP3575082 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.02.2018
07.02.2018
ADMISSIBLE Windmöller GmbH Nord-West-Ring 21 32832 Augustdorf / DE Opponent's representative Wagner Albiger & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Siegfried-Leopold-Straße 27 53225 Bonn / DE | [2018/28] |
Former [2018/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.02.2018
07.02.2018
ADMISSIBLE Windmöller GmbH Nord-West-Ring 21 32832 Augustdorf / DE Opponent's representative Wagner Albiger & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Siegfried-Leopold-Straße 27 53225 Bonn / DE | 14.02.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.06.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.05.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.06.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.06.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 28.10.2019 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 17.02.2020 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 18.06.2019 | Appeal received No. T1831/19 | 24.10.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.10.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.12.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2011 | AL | 03.05.2017 | AT | 03.05.2017 | CY | 03.05.2017 | CZ | 03.05.2017 | DK | 03.05.2017 | EE | 03.05.2017 | FI | 03.05.2017 | HR | 03.05.2017 | IT | 03.05.2017 | LT | 03.05.2017 | LV | 03.05.2017 | MC | 03.05.2017 | MK | 03.05.2017 | NL | 03.05.2017 | PT | 03.05.2017 | RS | 03.05.2017 | SE | 03.05.2017 | SI | 03.05.2017 | SK | 03.05.2017 | SM | 03.05.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | IE | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | LU | 30.06.2017 | MT | 30.06.2017 | BG | 03.08.2017 | NO | 03.08.2017 | GR | 04.08.2017 | IS | 03.09.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 30.06.2011 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MK | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PT | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
IE | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
LU | 30.06.2017 | ||
MT | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 30.06.2011 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MK | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
IE | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
LU | 30.06.2017 | ||
MT | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 30.06.2011 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
IE | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
LU | 30.06.2017 | ||
MT | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 30.06.2011 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
IE | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
LU | 30.06.2017 | ||
MT | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
IE | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
LU | 30.06.2017 | ||
MT | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
IE | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
LU | 30.06.2017 | ||
MT | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
IE | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
LU | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
IE | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
LU | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
LU | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
IT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4514258 (HAMMARBERG LARS [CH]) [X] 1,4,6-12 * column 1, line 24 - line 49; claims 1-5, 7, 9 * * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 5 * [Y] 2,3,5,13; | [Y]US2004242095 (PRAKASH AMIT [US]) [Y] 2-9,13 * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] - [00 8] , [0 11] - [0013]; claims 1-14 *; | [XY]WO2007086632 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1,10-13 * page 1, line 7 - line 17; figures 2,4,5; claims 1,2 * * page 4, line 5 - line 16 * [Y] 2-9; | [X]EP1847385 (KRONOTEC AG [CH]) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0007] - [0014] - [0017] , [0019] - [0023] *; | [XDA]WO2008122668 (SPANOLUX N V DIV BALTERIO [BE], et al) [XD] 1-6,9-13 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 19; figures 1,2; claims 14-20 * * page 9, line 18 - line 28 * [A] 7,8; | [XPA]EP2269814 (JOHNS MANVILLE EUROPE GMBH [DE]) [XP] 1,2,6,10-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0014] , [0 17] - [0019] - [0 24] , [0 25] *[A] 3-5,7-9,13; | [A] - TEISCHINGER, ALFRED, "Holz-Kunststoff-Verbundwerkstoffe (WPC) - Möglichkeiten und Grenzen einer neuen Werkstoffgeneration", SCHWEIZ. Z. FORSTWES., (2005), vol. 156, no. 11, pages 416 - 419, XP002606106 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | [A] - Klysov, A.A., Wood-Plastic composites, New York (US), Wiley-Interscience, (2007), pages 26 - 28, ISBN 978-0-470-14891-4, XP002606107 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | Opposition | US4514258 | WO9932285 | US2004242095 | WO2007052885 | WO2007086632 | EP1847385 | WO2008122668 | WO2010023042 | JP2010059611 | EP2269814 | EP2339092 | DE1653161 | WO9926773 | WO0100406 | WO0181056 | DE102004039505 | WO2005072957 | WO2005123380 | DE102004035011 | EP1792698 | DE102006048471 | EP1938963 | US2009029097 | WO2011141849 | - International Standard ISO 4918 | - Eidesstattliche Versicherung Ulrich Windmöller mit Anlagen | - Eidesstattliche Versicherung Bernhard Voith mit Anlagen |