EP2575893 - CONJUGATES FOR THE PREVENTION OR TREATMENT OF NICOTINE ADDICTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Vaccines LLC 235 East, 42nd Street New York NY 10017-5755 / US | [2013/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANASTASIOU, Nickolas Pfizer Global Research and Development 700 Chesterfield Parkway West Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US | 02 /
BHATTACHARYA, Keshab Pfizer Global Research and Development 700 Chesterfield Parkway West Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US | 03 /
BROWN, Alan, Daniel Pfizer Global Research and Development Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | 04 /
DAVIS, Heather, Lynn Pfizer Vaccines Research Ottawa Laboratories 340 Terry Fox Drive Suite 200 Ottawa, Ontario K2K 3A2 / CA | 05 /
FINNEMAN, Jari, Ilmari Pfizer Global Research and Development 700 Chesterfield Parkway West Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US | 06 /
GERVAIS, David, P. Jarcens Gomeldon Salisbury Wiltshire SP4 6JZ / GB | 07 /
JONES, Lyn, Howard Pfizer Global Research and Development Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | 08 /
KOLHE, Parag, Ashok Pfizer Global Research and Development 700 Chesterfield Parkway West Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US | 09 /
MCCLUSKIE, Michael, John Pfizer Vaccines Research Ottawa Laboratories 340 Terry Fox Drive Suite 200 Ottawa, Ontario K2K 3A2 / CA | 10 /
MEHELIC, Paul, Robert Pfizer Global Research and Development 700 Chesterfield Parkway West Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US | 11 /
MERSON, James, Richard Pfizer Global Research and Development 10777 Science Center Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 12 /
PARSONS, Erin, Kristen Pfizer Global Research and Development 700 Chesterfield Parkway West Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US | 13 /
PRYDE, David, Cameron Pfizer Global Research and Development Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | 14 /
STEAD, David, Robert Pfizer Global Research and Development 10777 Science Center Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 15 /
THORN, Jennifer, Marie Pfizer Global Research and Development 700 Chesterfield Parkway West Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US | [2013/15] | Representative(s) | Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [2013/15] | Application number, filing date | 11728679.9 | 03.06.2011 | WO2011IB52446 | Priority number, date | US20100351342P | 04.06.2010 Original published format: US 351342 P | [2013/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011151807 | Date: | 08.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2575893 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/64, A61P25/30, A61K31/465, C07D213/82, A61P25/34 | [2017/17] | CPC: |
A61K31/465 (EP,KR,US);
C07D213/82 (KR);
C07D401/04 (EP,CN,US);
A61K39/385 (US);
A61K39/39 (US);
A61K47/50 (KR);
A61K47/6415 (EP,US);
A61K47/646 (EP,US);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P25/34 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C07K14/34 (US);
A61K2039/55505 (US);
A61K2039/55561 (US);
A61K2039/6012 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/16] | A61K47/50, A61P25/30, A61K31/465, C07D213/82, A61P25/34 | ||
Former IPC [2013/15] | A61K47/48, A61P25/30, A61K31/465, C07D213/82 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Title | German: | KONJUGATE ZUR PRÄVENTION ODER BEHANDLUNG VON NIKOTINABHÄNGIGKEIT | [2013/15] | English: | CONJUGATES FOR THE PREVENTION OR TREATMENT OF NICOTINE ADDICTION | [2013/15] | French: | CONJUGUÉS POUR LA PRÉVENTION OU LE TRAITEMENT DE LA DÉPENDANCE À LA NICOTINE | [2013/15] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 01.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 31.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/15] | 17.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.04.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [ID]WO9961054 (INDEPENDENT PHARMACEUTICA AB [SE], et al) [ID] 1-32 * page 1, line 1 - page 5, line 25 *; | [ID]WO0170730 (INDEPENDENT PHARMACEUTICA AB [SE], et al) [ID] 1-32 * page 1, line 1 - page 5, line 8 *; | [ID]WO0249667 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al) [ID] 1-32* claims 1-10 *; | [ID]WO03082329 (UNIV NEBRASKA [US], et al) [ID] 1-32 * page 5, line 27 - page 7, line 33 * * scheme 1; page 34, line 6 - page 35, line 11 * | Examination | - DE VILLIERS S H L ET AL, "Nicotine hapten structure, antibody selectivity and effect relationships: Results from a nicotine vaccine screening procedure", VACCINE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 28, no. 10, doi:10.1016/J.VACCINE.2009.12.051, ISSN 0264-410X, (20100302), pages 2161 - 2168, (20100107), XP026924750 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2009.12.051 | by applicant | US3964482 | US4469863 | EP0421762 | US5023243 | WO9961054 | WO0032239 | WO0170730 | WO0180844 | US6334856 | WO0249667 | US2002082543 | WO02058635 | US2002193754 | US6503231 | US6611707 | WO03082329 | US6745211 | US2004106904 | US2004186419 | WO2005040338 | US2005119480 | US2005197308 | US6945952 | US2005209565 | US2006111271 | WO2006138719 | EP1849780 | US2008269685 | US7611481 | US2010196445 | - J.C. AGUILAR, E.G. RODRIGUEZ, "Review: Vaccine Adjuvants Revisited", VACCINE, (2007), vol. 25, doi:doi:10.1016/j.vaccine.2007.01.111, pages 3752 - 3762, XP022033910 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2007.01.111 | - UHLMANN E ET AL., CHEM. REV., (1990), vol. 90, page 543 | - CROOKE, S.T. ET AL., ANNU. REV. PHARMACOL. TOXICOL., (1996), vol. 36, pages 107 - 129 | - HUNZIKER J. ET AL., MOD. SYNTH. METHODS, (1995), vol. 7, pages 331 - 417 | - BEAUCAGE, S. L., CARUTHERS, M. H., TET. LET., (1981), vol. 22, page 1859 | - GAREGG ET AL., TET. LET., (1986), vol. 27, pages 4051 - 4054 | - FROEHLER ET AL., NUCL. ACID RES., (1986), vol. 14, pages 5399 - 5407 | - GAREGG, (1986), vol. 27, pages 4055 - 4058 | - GAFFNEY ET AL., TET. LET., (1988), vol. 29, pages 2619 - 2622 | - UHLMANN, E., PEYMAN, A., CHEM. REV., (1990), vol. 90, page 544 | - GOODCHILD, J., BIOCONJUGATE CHEM., (1990), vol. 1, page 165 | - PRAUSNITZ, ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, (2004), vol. 56, pages 581 - 587 | - ZAHN ET AL., BIOMED. MICRODEVICES, (2004), vol. 6, pages 183 - 190 | - SHIRKHANDEH, J. MATERIALS SCI., (2005), vol. 16, pages 37 - 45 | - PARK, J. CONTROLLED RELEASE, (2005), vol. 104, pages 51 - 66 | - DAVIS ET AL., J. BIOMECH., (2004), vol. 37, pages 1155 - 1163 | - MARTANTO ET AL., PHARM. RES., (2004), vol. 21 | - MCALLISTER ET AL., PNAS, (2003), vol. 100, pages 13755 - 13760 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2007), vol. 50, pages 15434 - 15435 | - EUR. J. ORG. CHEM., (2006), pages 3562 - 3565 | - ANGEW. CHEMIE INT. ED., (2006), vol. 45, no. 30, pages 4936 - 4940 |