EP2588094 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS FOR SUBLINGUAL DELIVERY OF OPIOIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2019 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LondonPharma Ltd. Innovation Centre Norwich Research Park Colney Lane Norwich NR4 7UH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/19] | For all designated states Londonpharma Ltd. Innovation Centre Norwich Research Park Colney Lane Norwich NR4 7UH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAMS, Martin James c/o LondonPharma Limited Innovation Centre Norwich Research Park Colney Lane Norwich NR4 7UH / GB | 02 /
HIGH, Juliet Victoria c/o LondonPharma Limited Innovation Centre Norwich Research Park Colney Lane Norwich NR4 7UH / GB | 03 /
JAMIESON, Paul Andrew c/o LondonPharma Limited Innovation Centre Norwich Research Park Colney Lane Norwich NR4 7UH / GB | 04 /
ROSS, Calvin John - deceased / GB | [2013/19] | Representative(s) | Harris, Oliver John Richard, et al Novagraaf UK Centrum Norwich Research Park Colney Lane Norwich NR4 7UG / GB | [2014/33] |
Former [2013/19] | Harris, Oliver John Richard Novagraaf UK 12 Meridian Way Meridian Business Park Norwich NR7 0TA / GB | Application number, filing date | 11729456.1 | 29.06.2011 | WO2011GB51230 | Priority number, date | GB20100011028 | 30.06.2010 Original published format: GB 201011028 | [2013/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012001411 | Date: | 05.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2588094 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/137, A61K9/00, A61K9/12, A61P25/36, A61P25/04, A61K31/135 | [2013/19] | CPC: |
A61K9/006 (EP,GB,US);
A61K47/10 (EP,GB,KR,US);
A61J7/0053 (GB);
A61K31/045 (EP,US);
A61K31/135 (EP,GB,KR,US);
A61K31/137 (EP,GB,KR,US);
A61K31/4468 (EP,GB,US);
A61K31/485 (KR);
A61K47/14 (GB);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P11/14 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P25/36 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/045, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/135, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/137, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/19] | Extension states | BA | 12.12.2012 | ME | 12.12.2012 | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR SUBLINGUALEN FREISETZUNG VON OPIOIDEN | [2013/19] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS FOR SUBLINGUAL DELIVERY OF OPIOIDS | [2013/19] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES POUR ADMINISTRATION PAR VOIE SUBLINGUALE D'OPIOÏDES | [2013/19] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/19] | 15.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/36] | 26.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/36] | Divisional application(s) | EP13176687.5 / EP2653152 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.07.2016 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.03.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 16.03.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.03.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   26.10.2015 | 30.06.2019 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2151136 (ROTTA RESEARCH LAB); | [Y]WO9749402 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al); | [X]US2003035831 (MODI PANKAJ [CA]); | [X]WO2004016243 (GENEREX PHARM INC [CA]); | [X]WO2006105205 (UNIV KENTUCKY RES FOUND [US], et al); | [XY]WO2007087431 (INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al); | [Y]WO2009017837 (INSYS THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al); | [Y]WO2009070829 (KRIUS PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [X]US2009270438 (BOOLES CLIVE [GB], et al); | [Y]WO2009152949 (POHL BOSKAMP G GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al); | [YP]WO2010122276 (LONDONPHARMA LTD [GB], et al); |