EP2582930 - CONTROL APPARATUS AND CONTROL METHOD FOR VARIABLE MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.07.2014 [2014/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Shunsuke c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
NAKAGAWA, Takashi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
HABARA, Shunsuke c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | [2014/27] |
Former [2013/17] | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Shunsuke c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | ||
02 /
NAKAGAWA, Takashi c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | |||
03 /
HABARA, Shunsuke c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 11729685.5 | 13.05.2011 | WO2011IB01031 | Priority number, date | JP20100137355 | 16.06.2010 Original published format: JP 2010137355 | [2013/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011158074 | Date: | 22.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2582930 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F01L13/00, F02D13/02, F02D41/24 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
F01L13/0015 (EP,US);
F01L13/00 (US);
F01L13/0021 (EP,US);
F01L13/0063 (EP,US);
F02D13/02 (EP,US);
F02D41/221 (EP,US);
F02D41/2438 (US);
F02D41/2464 (EP,US);
F01L2800/14 (EP,US);
F01L2820/032 (EP,US);
F02D2041/001 (EP,US);
F02D2041/228 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Title | German: | STEUERGERÄT UND STEUERVERFAHREN FÜR VERÄNDERLICHEN MECHANISMUS | [2013/17] | English: | CONTROL APPARATUS AND CONTROL METHOD FOR VARIABLE MECHANISM | [2013/17] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMMANDE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE POUR MÉCANISME VARIABLE | [2013/17] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 04.06.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2002349215 (UNISIA JECS CORP) [A] 1,16* the whole document *; | [A]EP1387047 (HYDRAULIK RING GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,16 * paragraph [0015]; figure 1 *; | [YA]US2005155574 (HEDRICK JEFFREY R [US], et al) [Y] 1,15,16 * the whole document * [A] 2-14,17-19; | [YA]WO2008142516 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1,15,16 * the whole document * [A] 2-14,17-19; | [A]WO2008142554 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,16 * the whole document *; | [AD]JP2009216052 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [AD] 1-19 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2009216052 |