EP2585440 - 3-AMINO-5,6-DIHYDRO-1H-PYRAZIN-2-ONE DERIVATIVES USEFUL FOR THE TREATEMENT OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE AND OTHER FORMS OF DEMENTIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceutica, N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [2013/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRABANCO-SUÁREZ, Andrés Avelino c/o Janssen-Cilag S.A. Calle Jarama 75 Poligono Industrial E-45007 Toledo / ES | 02 /
DELGADO-JIMÉNEZ, Francisca c/o Janssen-Cilag S.A. Calle Jarama 75 Poligono Industrial E-45007 Toledo / ES | 03 /
TRESADERN, Gary, John c/o Janssen-Cilag S.A. Calle Jarama 75 Poligono Industrial E-45007 Toledo / ES | [2013/18] | Representative(s) | Quaghebeur, Luc Johnson & Johnson Patent Law Department Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | Quaghebeur, Luc Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V. Patent Department, Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | Application number, filing date | 11729962.8 | 27.06.2011 | WO2011EP60712 | Priority number, date | EP20100167542 | 28.06.2010 Original published format: EP 10167542 | [2013/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012000933 | Date: | 05.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2585440 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D241/08, C07D401/10, C07D401/12, C07D403/10, A61K31/495, A61P25/28 | [2013/18] | CPC: |
C07D241/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/495 (EP,KR,US);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/18] | Extension states | BA | 28.01.2013 | ME | 28.01.2013 | Title | German: | 3-AMINO-5,6-DIHYDRO-1H-PYRAZIN-2-ON-DERIVATE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON MORBUS ALZHEIMER UND ANDEREN FORMEN VON DEMENZ | [2013/18] | English: | 3-AMINO-5,6-DIHYDRO-1H-PYRAZIN-2-ONE DERIVATIVES USEFUL FOR THE TREATEMENT OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE AND OTHER FORMS OF DEMENTIA | [2013/18] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE 3-AMINO-5,6-DIHYDRO-1H-PYRAZIN-2-ONE UTILES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA MALADIE D'ALZHEIMER ET D'AUTRES FORMES DE DÉMENCE | [2013/18] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/18] | 25.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/17] | 16.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2009097278 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2; compound (I) * * example - ** claim 22 *; | [E]WO2011080176 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [E] 1-9 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2; compound (I) * * page 34, line 21 * * example - * | by applicant | WO2005037832 | - KOIKE H ET AL., J BIOCHEM., (1999), vol. 126, pages 235 - 42 |