EP2588451 - PIPERIDINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE FOR THE TREATMENT OF METABOLIC DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim / DE | [2013/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROTH, Gerald Juergen Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Corporate Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | 02 /
FLECK, Martin Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Corporate Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | 03 /
LEHMANN-LINTZ, Thorsten Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Corporate Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | 04 /
NEUBAUER, Heike Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Corporate Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | 05 /
NOSSE, Bernd Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Corporate Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2016/01] |
Former [2013/19] | 01 /
ROTH, Gerald Juergen Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Corporate Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | ||
02 /
FLECK, Martin Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Corporate Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | |||
03 /
LEHMANN-LINTZ, Thorsten Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Corporate Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | |||
04 /
NEUBAUER, Heike Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Corporate Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | |||
05 /
NOSSE, Bernd Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Corporate Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Representative(s) | Simon, Elke Anna Maria Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2016/01] |
Former [2013/19] | Simon, Elke Anna Maria Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Corporate Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 11730270.3 | 30.06.2011 | [2016/01] | WO2011EP61012 | Priority number, date | EP20100168113 | 01.07.2010 Original published format: EP 10168113 | [2013/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012001107 | Date: | 05.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2588451 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2588451 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D211/34, C07D401/04, C07D401/12, C07D401/14, C07D405/04, C07D405/14, C07D409/04, C07D411/04, C07D411/14, C07D413/04, C07D413/14, C07D417/14, C07D487/04, C07D495/04, C07D498/04 | [2013/19] | CPC: |
C07D211/34 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4465 (KR);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D405/04 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (KR);
C07D405/14 (EP,US);
C07D409/04 (EP,US);
C07D411/04 (EP,US);
C07D411/14 (EP,US);
C07D413/04 (EP,US);
C07D413/14 (EP,US);
C07D417/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PIPERIDINDERIVATE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON STOFFWECHSELERKRANKUNGEN | [2013/19] | English: | PIPERIDINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE FOR THE TREATMENT OF METABOLIC DISORDERS | [2013/19] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE PIPÉRIDINE ET LEUR UTILISATION POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES MÉTABOLIQUES | [2013/19] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/19] | 30.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2011 | AL | 30.12.2015 | AT | 30.12.2015 | BE | 30.12.2015 | BG | 30.12.2015 | CY | 30.12.2015 | CZ | 30.12.2015 | DK | 30.12.2015 | EE | 30.12.2015 | ES | 30.12.2015 | FI | 30.12.2015 | HR | 30.12.2015 | IT | 30.12.2015 | LT | 30.12.2015 | LV | 30.12.2015 | MC | 30.12.2015 | MK | 30.12.2015 | NL | 30.12.2015 | PL | 30.12.2015 | RO | 30.12.2015 | RS | 30.12.2015 | SE | 30.12.2015 | SI | 30.12.2015 | SK | 30.12.2015 | SM | 30.12.2015 | TR | 30.12.2015 | NO | 30.03.2016 | GR | 31.03.2016 | IS | 30.04.2016 | PT | 02.05.2016 | CH | 30.06.2016 | IE | 30.06.2016 | LI | 30.06.2016 | LU | 30.06.2016 | MT | 30.06.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 30.06.2011 | |
AT | 30.12.2015 | ||
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
BG | 30.12.2015 | ||
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
TR | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
IE | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
LU | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 30.06.2011 | |
AT | 30.12.2015 | ||
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
TR | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
IE | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
LU | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 30.06.2011 | |
AT | 30.12.2015 | ||
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
TR | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
IE | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
LU | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 30.06.2011 | |
AT | 30.12.2015 | ||
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CY | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
IE | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/25] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
IE | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
BE | 30.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
PT | 02.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 30.12.2015 | |
CZ | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
IT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
PL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
ES | 30.12.2015 | ||
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 30.12.2015 | |
FI | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | FI | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
NL | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 30.12.2015 | |
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SE | 30.12.2015 | ||
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 30.12.2015 | |
NO | 30.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 30.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004037809 (PFIZER LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-6,9,10,12 * Preparations 61-64; page 55 - page 57 *; | [X]OA13029 (PFIZER [US]) [X] 1-6,9,10,12 * Preparation 62; page 76 *; | [X]WO2008110611 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-6,9,10,12 * page 48; compound 126 * * claim 1 *; | [A]WO2009144555 (PFIZER [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A] - HAQUE T S ET AL, "Potent biphenyl- and 3-phenyl pyridine-based inhibitors of acetyl-CoA carboxylase", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, GB, vol. 19, no. 20, doi:10.1016/J.BMCL.2009.08.077, ISSN 0960-894X, (20091015), pages 5872 - 5876, (20090826), XP026640590 [A] 1-15 * page 5873; figure 1 * * tables 1, 2, 3; compounds 3a-10m * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2009.08.077 | [A] - GU YU GUI ET AL, "N-{3-[2-(4-Alkoxyphenoxy)thiazol-5-yl]-1-methylprop-2-ynyl}carboxy Derivatives as Acetyl-CoA Carboxylase Inhibitors-Improvement of Cardiovascular and Neurological Liabilities via Structural Modifications", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20070101), vol. 50, no. 5, doi:10.1021/JM070035A, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 1078 - 1082, XP002448589 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm070035a | by applicant | - G. WOLF, NUTRITION REVIEWS, vol. 66, no. 10, pages 597 - 600 | - DB SAVAGE, KF PETERSEN, GI SHULMAN, PHYSIOL REV., (2007), vol. 87, pages 507 - 520 | - D SAGGERSON, ANNU REV NUTR., (2008), vol. 28, pages 253 - 72 | - GD LOPASCHUK, JR USSHER, JS JASWAL, PHARMACOL REV., (2010), vol. 62, pages 237 - 64 | - LA ABU-ELHEIGA, J. LIPID RES., (2009), vol. 50, pages S138 - S143 | - L. TONG, HJ HARWOOD JR., JOURNAL OF CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY, (2006), vol. 99, pages 1476 - 1488 | - JW CORBETT, J H J R.HARWOOD, RECENT PAT CARDIOVASC DRUG DISCOV., (200711), vol. 2, no. 3, pages 162 - 80 | - M MUREA, BI FREEDMANN, JS PARKS, PA ANTINOZZI, SC ELBEIN, LM MA, CLIN J AM SOC NEPHROL., (2010), vol. 5, pages 2373 - 9 | - IE SCHAUER, JK SNELL-BERGEON, BC BERGMAN, DM MAAHS, A KRETOWSKI, RH ECKEL, M REWERS, DIABETES, (2011), vol. 60, pages 306 - 14 | - P EBELING, B ESS6N-GUSTAVSSON, JA TUOMINEN, VA KOIVISTO, DIABETOLOGIA, vol. 41, pages 111 - 115 | - KJ NADEAU, JG REGENSTEINER, TA BAUER, MS BROWN, JL DOROSZ, A HULL, P ZEITLER, B DRAZNIN, JEB. REUSCH, J CLIN ENDOCRINOL METAB, (2010), vol. 95, pages 513 - 521 | - C WANG, S RAJPUT, K WATABE, DF LIAO, D CAO, FRONT BIOSCI, (2010), vol. 2, pages 515 - 26 | - OGAWA M, FUKUYAMA H, OUCHI Y, YAMAUCHI H, KIMURA J, J NEUROL SCI., (1996), vol. 139, no. 1, pages 78 - 82 | - ST HENDERSON, NEUROTHERAPEUTICS, (2008), vol. 5, pages 470 - 480 | - LC COSTANTINI, LJ BARR, JL VOGEL, ST HENDERSON, BMC NEUROSCI., (2008), vol. 9, no. 2, page S16 | - KW BARANANO, AL HARTMAN, CURR TREAT OPTIONS NEUROL., (2008), vol. 10, pages 410 - 9 | - MA REGER, ST HENDERSON, C HALE, B CHOLERTON, LD BAKER, GS WATSON, K HYDEA, D CHAPMANA, S CRAFT, NEUROBIOLOGY OF AGING, (2004), vol. 25, pages 311 - 314 | - MUNGER J, BD BENNETT, A PARIKH, XJ FENG, J MCARDLE, HA RABITZ, T SHENK, JD RABINOWITZ., NAT BIOTECHNOL., (2008), vol. 26, pages 1179 - 86 | - ORG. LETT., (1999), vol. 1, pages 1261 - 1262 | - J. ORGANOMET. CHEM., (2003), vol. 677, page 57 |