EP2576522 - ZN (II) BASED COLORIMETRIC SENSOR AND PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/15] | ZN (II) BASED COLORIMETRIC SENSOR AND PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF | ||
[2014/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Council of Scientific & Industrial Research Anusandhan Bhawan Rafi Marg New Delhi 110 001 / IN | [2013/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAHATO, Prasenjit Central Salt&Marine Chemicals Research Institute Gijubhai Badheka Marg Bhavnagar 364 002 Gujarat / IN | 02 /
GHOSH, Amrita Central Salt&Marine Chemicals Research Institute Gijubhai Badheka Marg Bhavnagar 364 002 Gujarat / IN | 03 /
MISHRA, Sanjiv, Kumar Central Salt&Marine Chemicals Research Institute Gijubhai Badheka Marg Bhavnagar 364 002 Gujarat / IN | 04 /
SHRIVASTAVA, Anupama Central Salt&Marine Chemicals Research Institute Gijubhai Badheka Marg Bhavnagar 364 002 Gujarat / IN | 05 /
MISHRA, Sandhya Central Salt&Marine Chemicals Research Institute Gijubhai Badheka Marg Bhavnagar 364 002 Gujarat / IN | 06 /
DAS, Amitava Central Salt&Marine Chemicals Research Institute Gijubhai Badheka Marg Bhavnagar 364 002 Gujarat / IN | [2013/15] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/15] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11730409.7 | 21.03.2011 | WO2011IB00585 | Priority number, date | IN2010DEL1242 | 31.05.2010 Original published format: IN DE12422010 | [2013/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011151683 | Date: | 08.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2576522 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2576522 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D257/02 | [2013/15] | CPC: |
C07D257/02 (EP,BR,US);
C07F3/06 (KR);
G01N1/30 (BR,US);
C12Q1/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOLORIMETRISCHER SENSOR AUF ZN (II)-BASIS UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2014/45] | English: | ZN (II) BASED COLORIMETRIC SENSOR AND PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF | [2014/45] | French: | CAPTEUR COLORIMÉTRIQUE À BASE DE ZN(II) ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | [2014/45] |
Former [2013/15] | KOLORIMETRISCHER SENSOR AUF ZN (II)-BASIS UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2013/15] | ZN (II) BASED COLORIMETRIC SENSOR AND PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF | ||
Former [2013/15] | CAPTEUR COLORIMÉTRIQUE À BASE DE ZN(II) ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2012 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 12.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.03.2011 | AL | 05.11.2014 | AT | 05.11.2014 | BE | 05.11.2014 | BG | 05.11.2014 | CY | 05.11.2014 | CZ | 05.11.2014 | DK | 05.11.2014 | EE | 05.11.2014 | ES | 05.11.2014 | FI | 05.11.2014 | HR | 05.11.2014 | IT | 05.11.2014 | LT | 05.11.2014 | LV | 05.11.2014 | MC | 05.11.2014 | MK | 05.11.2014 | MT | 05.11.2014 | NL | 05.11.2014 | PL | 05.11.2014 | RO | 05.11.2014 | RS | 05.11.2014 | SE | 05.11.2014 | SI | 05.11.2014 | SK | 05.11.2014 | SM | 05.11.2014 | TR | 05.11.2014 | NO | 05.02.2015 | GR | 06.02.2015 | IS | 05.03.2015 | PT | 05.03.2015 | IE | 21.03.2015 | LU | 21.03.2015 | CH | 31.03.2015 | LI | 31.03.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 21.03.2011 | |
AT | 05.11.2014 | ||
BE | 05.11.2014 | ||
BG | 05.11.2014 | ||
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
MK | 05.11.2014 | ||
MT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
SM | 05.11.2014 | ||
TR | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
IE | 21.03.2015 | ||
LU | 21.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/46] | HU | 21.03.2011 | |
AT | 05.11.2014 | ||
BE | 05.11.2014 | ||
BG | 05.11.2014 | ||
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
MT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
SM | 05.11.2014 | ||
TR | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
IE | 21.03.2015 | ||
LU | 21.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 21.03.2011 | |
AT | 05.11.2014 | ||
BG | 05.11.2014 | ||
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
MT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
SM | 05.11.2014 | ||
TR | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
IE | 21.03.2015 | ||
LU | 21.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
MT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
IE | 21.03.2015 | ||
LU | 21.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
IE | 21.03.2015 | ||
LU | 21.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
IE | 21.03.2015 | ||
LU | 21.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
IE | 21.03.2015 | ||
LU | 21.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
LU | 21.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
LU | 21.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
LU | 21.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 05.11.2014 | |
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
HR | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LV | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RS | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 05.11.2014 | |
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 05.11.2014 | |
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 05.11.2014 | |
NO | 05.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 05.11.2014 | Cited in | International search | [AD] - JOSE D AMILAN ET AL, "Colorimetric sensor for ATP in aqueous solution.", ORGANIC LETTERS 10 MAY 2007 LNKD- PUBMED:17429979, (20070510), vol. 9, no. 10, ISSN 1523-7060, pages 1979 - 1982, XP002656705 [AD] 1-23 * page 1980; compound 1.Zn * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/OL0705797 | [A] - O'NEIL LAUREN L ET AL, "A selective, noncovalent assay for base flipping in DNA", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (200512), vol. 127, no. 48, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 16800 - 16801, XP002656706 [A] 1-23 * page 16800; compound 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JA056274+ | by applicant | - VAZQUEZ, M., FABBRIZZI, L., TAGLIETTI A., PEDRIDO, R. M., GONZÁLEZ-NOYA, A. M., BERMEJO, M. R., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (2004), vol. 43, page 1962 | - LIN, Z., OU, S., DUAN, C., ZHANG, B., BAI, Z., CHEM. COMMUN., (2006), page 624 | - MIYAJI, H., SESSLER J. L., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED, (2001), vol. 40, page 154 | - LIBRA, E. R., SCOTT, M., J. CHEM. COMMUN., (2006), page 1485 | - ZHANG, D., ZHANG, M., LIU Z., YU, M., LI, F., YI, T., HUANG, C., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (2006), vol. 47, page 7093 | - HAN, M. S., KIM, D.H., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (2002), vol. 41, page 3809 | - JOSE, D. A., KAR, P., KOLEY, D., GANGULY, B., THIEL, W., GHOSH; H.N., DAS, A., INORG. CHEM., (2007), vol. 46, page 5576 | - JOSE, D. A., KUMAR, D. K., KAR, P., VERMA, S., GHOSH, A., GANGULY, B., GHOSH, H. N., DAS, A., TETRAHEDRON, (2007), vol. 63, page 12007 | - JOSE, D. A., KUMAR, D. K., GANGULY, B., DAS, A., ORG. LETT., (2004), vol. 6, page 3445 | - JOSE, D. A., KUMAR, D. K., GANGULY, B., DAS, A., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (2005), vol. 46, page 5343 | - JOSE,D. A., SINGH, A., GANGULY, B., DAS, A., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (2007), vol. 48, page 3695 | - HU, S., GUO, Y., XU, J., SHAO, S., ORG. BIOMOL. CHEM., (2008), vol. 6, page 2071 | - HU, S., GUO, Y., XUA; J., SHAO, S, ORG. BIOMOL. CHEM., (2008), vol. 6, page 2071 | - ZEIDER, F. H., INORG. CHEM., (2008), vol. 47, page 1264 | - KHAKH, B. S., NORTH, R.A., NATURE, (2006), vol. 442, page 527 | - GHOSH, A., SHRIVASTAV, A., JOSE, D. A., MISHRA, S: K., MISHRA, S., DAS, A., ANAL. CHEM., (2008), vol. 80, page 5312 | - JOSE, D. A., MISHRA. S., GHOSH, A., SHRIVASTAV, A., MISHRA, S. K., DAS, A., ORG. LETT., (2007), vol. 9, page 1979 | - IVANOVA, E. P., ALEXEEVA, Y. V., PHAM, D. K., WRIGHT, J. P., NICOLAU, D. V., INTO MICROBIOL., (2006), vol. 9, page 37 | - LEEVY, W. M., JOHNSON, J. R., LAKSHMI, C., MORRIS, J., MARQUEZ, M., SMITH, B. D., CHEM. COMMUN., (2006), page 1595 | - GORDON, J. L., BIOCHEM. J., (1986), vol. 233, page 309 | - CAHILL, G., WALSH, P.K., DONNELLY, D., J. AM. SOC. BREW. CHEM., (1999), vol. 57, page 72 | - ZHANG, T., FANG, H. H. P., BIOTECHNOL. LETT., (2004), vol. 26, page 989 | - BISWAS, K., RIEGER, K., MORSCHHA"USER; J. GENE, (2003), vol. 307, page 151 | - DAN, N. P., VISVANATHAN, C., BASU, B., BIORESOUR. TECHNOL., (2003), vol. 87, page 51 | - MILLSAP, K.W., M. VAN DER, H. C., BOS, R., BUSSCHER, H., J. FEMS, MICROBIOL. REV., (1998), vol. 21, page 321 | - NARVHUS, J. A., GADAGA, T. H., INT. J. FOOD MICROBIOL., (2003), vol. 86, page 5LS | - BASKIN, D.S., NGO, H., DIDENKO, V.V., TOXICOL. SCI., (2003), vol. 74, page 361 | - SHAWN C. MCCLESKEY ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2003), vol. 125, page 1114 | - CHUN LI ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (2005), vol. 44, page 6371 | - SHENLIANG WANG ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2006), vol. 128, page 10380 | - OKOH ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (2006), vol. 45, page 14764 | - AKIO OJIDA ET AL., CHEM. ASIAN J., (2006), vol. 1, page 555 | - AKIO OJIDA ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (2006), vol. 45, page 5518 | - ZDENEK KEJIK ET AL., CHEM. COMMUN., (2006), page 1533 | - YASUYUKI TSUBOI ET AL., APPLIED SURFACE SCIENCE, (2007), vol. 253, page 8422 | - DAS ET AL., ORG. LETT., (2007), vol. 9, page 1979 | - ANAL. CHEM., (2008), vol. 80, page 5312 | - PENG JIANG ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (2007), vol. 46, page 12979 | - HAO WANG ET AL., ORG. BIOMOL. CHEM., (2008), vol. 6, page 162 | - TAE-HYUK KWON, CHEM. EUR. J., (2008), vol. 14, page 9613 | - AKIHIKO ISHIDA ET AL., ANAL BIOANAL CHEM, (2008), vol. 392, page 987 | - YIMIN SUN ET AL., ORG. BIOMOL. CHEM., (2008), vol. 6, page 3044 | - ITARU HAMACHI ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2008), vol. 130, page 12095 | - HONGMEI WU ET AL., INORG. CHEM., (2009), vol. 48, page 408 | - AIKO NONAKA ET AL., ORG. BIOMOL. CHEM., (2008), vol. 6, page 3621 | - ORGANIC LETTERS, (2007), vol. 9, no. 10, pages 1979 - 1982 | - ANAL. CHEM., (2008), vol. 80, pages 5312 - 5319 | - WEXLER, H. M., CLINICAL INFECTIOUS DISEASES, (1997), vol. 25, page S284 | - IVANOVA, E. P., ALEXEEVA, Y. V., PHAM, D. K., NICOLAU, W. D., INTERNATIONALMICROBIOLOGY, (2006), vol. 9, page 37 | - WERNER, T. P., AMRHEIN, N., FREIMOSER, F. M., BMC PLANT BIOLOGY, (2007), vol. 7, page 51 | - SHUKLA, A. D., BAJAJ, H. C., DAS, A., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (2001), vol. 40, page 446 | - SHUKLA, A. D., BAJAJ, H. C., DAS, A., NAT. ACAD. SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 114, page 431 | - BEER, A.J., MACARTNEY, D. H., INORG. CHEM., (2000), vol. 39, page 1410 | - MACARTNEY, D.H., WADDLING, C. A., INORG. CHEM., (1994), vol. 33, page 5912 | - PHILIP, D., STODDART, J.F., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (1996), vol. 35, page 1154 | - OJIDA, A., PARK, S. K., MITO-OKA, Y., HAMACHI, 1., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (2002), vol. 43, page 6193 | - LINDLOY, L. F., BUSCH, D. H., INORG. CHEM., (1974), vol. 13, page 2494 | - WESTER, D., PALENIK, G. J., J AM. CHEM. SOC., (1974), vol. 95, page 6505 | - KWON, J. Y., JANG. Y. J., LEE, Y. J., KIM, K. M., SEO M. S., NAM, W., YOON, J., J AM. CHEM. SOC., (2005), vol. 127, page 10107 |