EP2593443 - PROCESS AND ASSEMBLY FOR PRODUCING ALKYLENE OXIDES AND GLYCOL ETHERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2013/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARROWOOD, Tina, L. 2080 N. Lewis Road Coleman Michigan 48618 / US | 02 /
FLICK, Derrick, W. 2637 N. Waskevich Lane Midland Michigan 48642 / US | 03 /
ACKFORD, John, F. 6005 Schade Dr. Midland Michigan 48640 / US | [2013/21] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | ||
Former [2013/21] | Raynor, John Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 11730822.1 | 28.06.2011 | [2016/50] | WO2011US42107 | Priority number, date | US20100364231P | 14.07.2010 Original published format: US 364231 P | [2013/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012009155 | Date: | 19.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2593443 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2593443 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D301/32, A61K31/336 | [2013/21] | CPC: |
C07D301/32 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/336 (KR);
B01J19/245 (US);
C07D301/12 (EP,US);
C07D301/36 (EP,US);
B01J2219/24 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON ALKYLENOXIDEN UND GLYKOLETHERN | [2013/21] | English: | PROCESS AND ASSEMBLY FOR PRODUCING ALKYLENE OXIDES AND GLYCOL ETHERS | [2013/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET ENSEMBLE POUR LA PRODUCTION D'OXYDES D'ALKYLÈNE ET D'ÉTHERS DE GLYCOL | [2013/21] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/21] | 22.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.11.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 08.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.06.2011 | AL | 14.12.2016 | AT | 14.12.2016 | CY | 14.12.2016 | CZ | 14.12.2016 | DK | 14.12.2016 | EE | 14.12.2016 | FI | 14.12.2016 | HR | 14.12.2016 | IT | 14.12.2016 | LT | 14.12.2016 | LV | 14.12.2016 | MC | 14.12.2016 | MK | 14.12.2016 | PL | 14.12.2016 | RO | 14.12.2016 | RS | 14.12.2016 | SE | 14.12.2016 | SI | 14.12.2016 | SK | 14.12.2016 | SM | 14.12.2016 | TR | 14.12.2016 | BG | 14.03.2017 | NO | 14.03.2017 | GR | 15.03.2017 | IS | 14.04.2017 | PT | 14.04.2017 | GB | 28.06.2017 | IE | 28.06.2017 | LU | 28.06.2017 | MT | 28.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 28.06.2011 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MK | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
TR | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
GB | 28.06.2017 | ||
IE | 28.06.2017 | ||
LU | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 28.06.2011 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MK | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
GB | 28.06.2017 | ||
IE | 28.06.2017 | ||
LU | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 28.06.2011 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
GB | 28.06.2017 | ||
IE | 28.06.2017 | ||
LU | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 28.06.2011 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
GB | 28.06.2017 | ||
IE | 28.06.2017 | ||
LU | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
GB | 28.06.2017 | ||
IE | 28.06.2017 | ||
LU | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
GB | 28.06.2017 | ||
IE | 28.06.2017 | ||
LU | 28.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
GB | 28.06.2017 | ||
LU | 28.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 14.12.2016 | |
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 14.12.2016 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9911639 (ARCO CHEM TECH [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * page 3, line 4 - line 14 * * page 3, line 5 - page 6, line 16 * * examples 1, 2 * * claims 1, 12 *; | [Y]WO2004083196 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * page 3, line 9 - line 31 * * page 11, line 13 - page 16, line 29 * * example 1 * * claims 1, 16, 17 *; | [Y]US2003166975 (TELES JOAQUIM HENRIQUE [DE]) [Y] 1-20 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0058] * * examples 4a, 4b, 9 * * claim 1 * | by applicant | US4360698 | US2807651 | - K. TANABE, M. MISONO, Y. ONO, H. HATTORI, "Studied in Surface Science and Catalysis", NEW SOLID ACIDS AND BASES: THEIR CATALYTIC PROPERTIES, (1989), vol. 51, pages 1 - 3 | - H. HATTORI, "Heterogeneous Basic Catalysts", CHEM. REV., (1995), vol. 95, pages 537 - 558 | - BALEIZO, CHEMICAL REVIEWS, (2006), vol. 106, no. 9, pages 3987 - 4043 | - OREJ6N ET AL., INDUSTRIAL AND ENGINEERING CHEMICAL RESEARCH, (2008), vol. 47, no. 21, pages 8032 - 8036 | - YANG ET AL., JOURNAL OF CATALYSIS, (2007), vol. 248, pages 204 - 212 | - KIM, CATALYSIS TODAY, (2000), vol. 63, pages 537 - 547 | - HU ET AL., JOURNAL OF APPLIED POLYMER SCIENCE, (2006), vol. 101, pages 2431 - 2436 | - SONG ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2003), vol. 44, pages 7081 - 7085 | - KWON ET AL., CATALYSIS TODAY, (2003), vol. 87, pages 145 - 151 | - GILL ET AL., CHEMISTRY - A EUROPEAN JOURNAL, (2008), vol. 14, pages 7306 - 7313 | - ZHENG ET AL., CHEMISTRY - A EUROPEAN JOURNAL, (2006), vol. 12, pages 576 - 583 | - ZHENG ET AL., ADVANCED SYNTHESIS AND CATALYSIS, (2008), vol. 350, pages 255 - 261 |