EP2588469 - HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE AS INHIBITORS OF PI3K ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.06.2015 [2015/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, California 91320-1799 / US | [2013/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUQUETTE, Jason A. 460 Bayview Avenue Millbrae, California 94030 / US | 02 /
LUCAS, Brian 133 10th Avenue San Francisco, California 94118 / US | [2013/19] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/19] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11730846.0 | 30.06.2011 | WO2011US42519 | Priority number, date | US20100361014P | 02.07.2010 Original published format: US 361014 P | [2013/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012003271 | Date: | 05.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2588469 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/12, C07D487/04, A61P29/00, A61P35/00, A61K31/4709 | [2013/19] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D473/34 (US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/19] | Extension states | BA | 16.01.2013 | ME | 16.01.2013 | Title | German: | HETEROZYKLISCHE VERBINDUNGEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS HEMMER DER PI3K-AKTIVITÄT | [2013/19] | English: | HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE AS INHIBITORS OF PI3K ACTIVITY | [2013/19] | French: | COMPOSÉS HÉTÉROCYCLIQUES ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME INHIBITEURS DE L'ACTIVITÉ PI3K | [2013/19] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/19] | 05.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/26] | 09.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.09.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2008118468 (AMGEN INC [US]) [X] 1-4 * page 9, line 25 - page 10, line 10 * * example 30 * * claims 1,9 * [I] 1-4; | [A]WO2009081105 (UCB PHARMA SA [BE], et al) [A] 1-4 * page 2, line 27 - line 30 ** claim 1 *; | [I]WO2010036380 (INTELLIKINE INC [US], et al) [I] 1-4 * claims 1,23 *; | [XPI]WO2010092340 (UCB PHARMA SA [BE], et al) [XP] 1-4 * page 2, paragraph second last * * examples 1-3,5-7,11,13,16,35-37,69-71,92,95,97 * * claim 1 * [I] 1-4; | [XPI]WO2011058113 (UCB PHARMA SA [BE], et al) [XP] 1-4 * page 22, line 18 - line 19 * * example 6 * * claims 1,13-14 * [I] 1-4; | [AP]WO2011058111 (UCB PHARMA SA [BE], et al) [AP] 1-4 * page 22, line 19 - line 20 * * claims 1,15-16 *; | [XPI]WO2011075628 (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-4 * page 10, line 1 - line 14 * * claims 1,3 * [I] 1-4 | by applicant | EP0039051 | WO9625488 | WO9746688 | US5822910 | US5858753 | US5985589 | WO2008118468 | - RAMEH ET AL., J. BIOL CHEM, (1999), vol. 274, pages 8347 - 8350 | - PANAYOTOU, TRENDS CELL BIOL, (1992), vol. 2, pages 358 - 60 | - CANTLEY, SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 296, pages 1655 - 1657 | - VANHAESEBROECK ET AL., ANNU.REV.BIOCHEM, (2001), vol. 70, pages 535 - 602 | - PARKER ET AL., CURRENT BIOLOGY, (1995), vol. 5, pages 577 - 99 | - YAO ET AL., SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 267, pages 2003 - 05 | - STERNMARK ET AL., J CELL SCI, (1999), vol. 112, pages 4175 - 83 | - LEMMON ET AL., TRENDS CELL BIOL, (1997), vol. 7, pages 237 - 42 | - SCHAEFFER, SCHWARTZBERG, CURR.OPIN.IMMUNO, (2000), vol. 12, pages 282 - 288 | - DEANE, FRUMAN, ANNU.REV.IMMUNOL., (2004), vol. 22, pages 563 - 598 | - BURGERING ET AL., NATURE, (1995), vol. 376, pages 599 - 602 | - OTSU ET AL., CELL, (1991), vol. 65, pages 91 - 104 | - HILES ET AL., CELL, (1992), vol. 70, pages 419 - 29 | - HU ET AL., MOL CELL BIOL, (1993), vol. 13, pages 7677 - 88 | - CHANTRY ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (1997), vol. 272, pages 19236 - 41 | - AL-ALWAN, JI, (2007), vol. 178, pages 2328 - 2335 | - OKKENHAUG ET AL., JI, (2006), vol. 177, pages 5122 - 5128 | - LEE ET AL., PNAS, (2006), vol. 103, pages 1289 - 1294 | - VOGT ET AL., VIROLOGY, (2006), vol. 344, pages 131 - 138 | - SAWYER, CANCER RES., (2003), vol. 63, pages 1667 - 1675 | - VANHAESEBROECK ET AL., PROC NAT. ACAD SCI USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 4330 - 5 | - RAMEH ET AL., CELL, (1995), vol. 83, pages 821 - 30 | - VOLINIA ET AL., ONCOGENE, (1992), vol. 7, pages 789 - 93 | - STOYANOV ET AL., SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 269, pages 690 - 93 | - KRUGMANN ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (1999), vol. 274, pages 17152 - 8 | - VOIGT ET AL., JBC, (2006), vol. 281, pages 9977 - 9986 | - SUIRE ET AL., CURR.BIOL., (2005), vol. 15, pages 566 - 570 | - KLIPPEL ET AL., MOL CELL BIOL, (1994), vol. 14, pages 2675 - 85 | - HUNTER, CELL, (1995), vol. 83, pages 1 - 4 | - PAGES ET AL., NATURE, (1994), vol. 369, pages 327 - 29 | - RUDD, IMMUNITY, (1996), vol. 4, pages 527 - 34 | - FRASER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 251, pages 313 - 16 | - FRUMAN ET AL., ANN REV BIOCHEM, (1998), vol. 67, pages 481 - 507 | - THELEN ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 4960 - 64 | - BI ET AL., MAMM.GENOME, (2002), vol. 13, pages 169 - 172 | - BI ET AL., J.BIOL.CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, pages 10963 - 10968 | - FOUKAS ET AL., NATURE, (2006), vol. 441, pages 366 - 370 | - LI ET AL., SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 287, pages 1046 - 1049 | - SASAKI ET AL., SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 287, pages 1040 - 1046 | - PATRUCCO ET AL., CELL, (2004), vol. 118, pages 375 - 387 | - CLAYTON ET AL., J.EXP.MED., (2002), vol. 196, pages 753 - 763 | - OKKENHAUG ET AL., SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 297, pages 1031 - 1034 | - OKKENHAUG ET AL., J.IMMUNOL., (2006), vol. 177, pages 5122 - 5128 | - JOU ET AL., INT.J.IMMUNOGENET, (2006), vol. 33, pages 361 - 369 | - ITO ET AL., J. PHARM. EXP. THERAPEUT., (2007), vol. 321, pages 1 - 8 | - HENNESSY ET AL., NATURE REVIEWS, (2005), vol. 4, pages 988 - 1004 | - ITO ET AL., J.PHARM.EXP.THERAPEUT., (2007), vol. 321, pages 1 - 8 | - JACKSON ET AL., NATURE MED., (2005), vol. 11, pages 507 - 514 | - RUECKLE ET AL., NATURE REVIEWS, (2006), vol. 5, pages 903 - 918 | - CAMPS ET AL., NATURE MEDICINE, (2005), vol. 11, pages 936 - 943 | - BARBER ET AL., NATURE MEDICINE, vol. 11, pages 933 - 935 | - KNIGHT ET AL., CELL, (2006), vol. 125, pages 733 - 747 | - CONDLIFFE ET AL., BLOOD, (2005), vol. 106, pages 1432 - 1440 | - ALI ET AL., NATURE, (2002), vol. 431, pages 1007 - 1011 | - LEE ET AL., FASEB, (2006), vol. 20, pages 455 - 465 | - NASHED ET AL., EUR.J.IMMUNOL., (2007), vol. 37, pages 416 - 424 | - BERGE ET AL., J. PHARM. SCI, (1977), vol. 66, page 1 | - SVENSSON, TUNEK, DRUG METABOLISM REVIEWS, (1988), vol. 165 | - BUNGAARD, J. MED. CHEM., (1989), page 2503 | - SVENSSON, TUNEK, Drug Metabolism Reviews, (1988), vol. 165 | US20140613610 |