EP2566381 - CORNEAL TOPOGRAPHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akkolens International B.V. Overaseweg 9 4836 BA Breda / NL | [2013/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMONOV, Aleksey, Nikolaevich Arthur van Schendelplein 137 NL-2624 CV Delft / NL | 02 /
ROMBACH, Michiel Christiaan Overaseweg 9 NL-4836 BA Breda / NL | [2013/11] | Representative(s) | Eveleens Maarse, Pieter Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/11] | Eveleens Maarse, Pieter Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | Application number, filing date | 11731141.5 | 02.05.2011 | WO2011NL50297 | Priority number, date | NL20102004659 | 04.05.2010 Original published format: NL 2004659 | [2013/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011139148 | Date: | 10.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2566381 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2566381 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/107 | [2013/11] | CPC: |
A61B3/107 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HORNHAUTTOPOGRAPH | [2013/11] | English: | CORNEAL TOPOGRAPHER | [2013/11] | French: | APPAREIL DE TOPOGRAPHIE CORNÉENNE | [2013/11] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/11] | 18.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.05.2011 | AL | 02.04.2014 | AT | 02.04.2014 | BE | 02.04.2014 | CY | 02.04.2014 | CZ | 02.04.2014 | DK | 02.04.2014 | EE | 02.04.2014 | ES | 02.04.2014 | FI | 02.04.2014 | HR | 02.04.2014 | IT | 02.04.2014 | LT | 02.04.2014 | LV | 02.04.2014 | MC | 02.04.2014 | MK | 02.04.2014 | MT | 02.04.2014 | NL | 02.04.2014 | PL | 02.04.2014 | RO | 02.04.2014 | SE | 02.04.2014 | SI | 02.04.2014 | SK | 02.04.2014 | SM | 02.04.2014 | TR | 02.04.2014 | IE | 02.05.2014 | LU | 02.05.2014 | CH | 31.05.2014 | LI | 31.05.2014 | BG | 02.07.2014 | NO | 02.07.2014 | GR | 03.07.2014 | IS | 02.08.2014 | PT | 04.08.2014 | RS | 19.11.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 02.05.2011 | |
AT | 02.04.2014 | ||
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
MK | 02.04.2014 | ||
MT | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
SM | 02.04.2014 | ||
TR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IE | 02.05.2014 | ||
LU | 02.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 02.05.2011 | |
AT | 02.04.2014 | ||
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
MT | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
SM | 02.04.2014 | ||
TR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IE | 02.05.2014 | ||
LU | 02.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 02.05.2011 | |
AT | 02.04.2014 | ||
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
MT | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
SM | 02.04.2014 | ||
IE | 02.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
MT | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
SM | 02.04.2014 | ||
IE | 02.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
MT | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
IE | 02.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
IE | 02.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
IE | 02.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
RS | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
IE | 02.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
RS | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
RS | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RS | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RS | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RS | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RS | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RS | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 02.04.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9829708 (COGNEX CORP [US]) [A] 1,6 * page 2, line 35 - page 3, line 23 * | [A] - NAYAR S K ET AL, "Real-time focus range sensor", COMPUTER VISION, 1995. PROCEEDINGS., FIFTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON CAMBRIDGE, MA, USA 20-23 JUNE 1995, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19950620), doi:10.1109/ICCV.1995.466826, ISBN 978-0-8186-7042-8, pages 995 - 1001, XP010146959 [A] 1,6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCV.1995.466826 | by applicant | - NAYAR ET AL., PROC. OF FIFTH INTL. CONF. ON COMPUTER VISION, (1995), pages 995 - 1001 | - H.H. HOPKINS, PROC. ROY. SOC. OF LONDON, (1955), vol. A231, pages 91 - 103 |