EP2588422 - MULTI-LAYER GLASS SHEET MADE BY CO-DRAWING USING THE OVERFLOW DOWNDRAW FUSION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, New York 14831 / US | [2020/11] |
Former [2013/19] | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, New York 14831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOOKBINDER, Dana C. 2675 Davis Road Corning, New York 14830 / US | 02 /
HOUSE, Keith Leonard 2249 Spencer Hill Road Corning, NY 14830 / US | 03 /
TANDON, Pushkar 3405 Deer Crest Painted Post, New York 14870 / US | [2013/19] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2020/11] |
Former [2013/19] | Anderson, James Edward George Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 11731195.1 | 22.06.2011 | [2020/11] | WO2011US41316 | Priority number, date | US20100359409P | 29.06.2010 Original published format: US 359409 P | [2013/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012005941 | Date: | 12.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2588422 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2588422 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C03B17/06, C03C17/02, C03C3/083, C03C3/091, B32B17/06, C03B17/02 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
C03B17/02 (EP,US);
C03B17/06 (KR);
B32B17/06 (KR);
C03B17/064 (EP,KR,US);
C03B17/068 (EP,US);
C03C17/02 (KR);
C03C3/083 (EP,KR,US);
C03C3/085 (US);
C03C3/087 (US);
C03C3/091 (EP,US);
C03C3/093 (US);
B32B2307/412 (KR);
Y10T428/2495 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/19] | C03B17/06, C03C17/02, C03C3/083, C03C3/091, B32B17/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANHAND VON GLEICHZIEHEN HERGESTELLTE MEHRLAGIGE GLASPLATTE UNTER VERWENDUNG DES ÜBERLAUF-TIEFZIEH-FUSIONSVERFAHRENS | [2013/19] | English: | MULTI-LAYER GLASS SHEET MADE BY CO-DRAWING USING THE OVERFLOW DOWNDRAW FUSION PROCESS | [2013/19] | French: | FEUILLE DE VERRE MULTICOUCHE RÉALISÉE PAR CO-ÉTIRAGE À L'AIDE DU PROCESSUS DE FUSION À ÉTIRAGE VERS LE BAS À DÉBORDEMENT | [2013/19] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/19] | 29.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.10.2019 | 16.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.06.2011 | AL | 11.03.2020 | AT | 11.03.2020 | CY | 11.03.2020 | CZ | 11.03.2020 | DK | 11.03.2020 | EE | 11.03.2020 | ES | 11.03.2020 | FI | 11.03.2020 | HR | 11.03.2020 | IT | 11.03.2020 | LT | 11.03.2020 | LV | 11.03.2020 | MC | 11.03.2020 | MK | 11.03.2020 | MT | 11.03.2020 | NL | 11.03.2020 | PL | 11.03.2020 | RO | 11.03.2020 | RS | 11.03.2020 | SE | 11.03.2020 | SI | 11.03.2020 | SK | 11.03.2020 | SM | 11.03.2020 | TR | 11.03.2020 | BG | 11.06.2020 | NO | 11.06.2020 | GR | 12.06.2020 | IE | 22.06.2020 | LU | 22.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | IS | 11.07.2020 | PT | 05.08.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 22.06.2011 | |
AL | 11.03.2020 | ||
AT | 11.03.2020 | ||
CY | 11.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
MT | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
TR | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IE | 22.06.2020 | ||
LU | 22.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 22.06.2011 | |
AT | 11.03.2020 | ||
CY | 11.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
MT | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
TR | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IE | 22.06.2020 | ||
LU | 22.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 11.03.2020 | |
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
TR | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IE | 22.06.2020 | ||
LU | 22.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 11.03.2020 | |
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IE | 22.06.2020 | ||
LU | 22.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 11.03.2020 | |
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IE | 22.06.2020 | ||
LU | 22.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 11.03.2020 | |
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
LU | 22.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 11.03.2020 | |
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
PL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SI | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 11.03.2020 | |
CZ | 11.03.2020 | ||
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
IT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
MC | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 11.03.2020 | |
DK | 11.03.2020 | ||
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
ES | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 11.03.2020 | |
EE | 11.03.2020 | ||
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 11.03.2020 | |
FI | 11.03.2020 | ||
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SK | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RO | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
SM | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LT | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
IS | 11.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
NL | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
BG | 11.06.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
GR | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
HR | 11.03.2020 | ||
LV | 11.03.2020 | ||
RS | 11.03.2020 | ||
SE | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 11.03.2020 | |
NO | 11.06.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3849097 (GIFFEN J, et al) [A] 1-19 * column 7, line 14; claims 1, 3-11 *; | [I]US4204027 (SIMON RAPHAEL A [US]) [I] 1-19 * figure 2; claims 1, 2 *; | [I]US4214886 (SHAY GEORGE C [US], et al) [I] 1-19 * column 7; figure 2 *; | [XI]US2006127679 (GULATI SURESH T [US], et al) [X] 1-4,11-13,16 * paragraphs [0031] - [0037]; figure 5; examples 1-3 * [I] 5-10,14,15,17-19; | [I]US2007190340 (COPPOLA FRANK T [US], et al) [I] 1-19 * paragraphs [0022] - [0059]; figure 1; example 1 *; | [A] - Corning Incorporated, "Gorilla Glass, technical information sheet", (2008), URL: http://www.corning.com/docs/specialtymaterials/pisheets/PI2317.pdf, (20110909), XP007919390 [A] 7 * the whole document * | [A] - Corning Incorporated, "Eagle XG Glass, technical information sheet", (2006), URL: http://www.delta-technologies.com/downloads/Eagle%20XG.pdf, (20110909), XP007919391 [A] 8,9 * the whole document * | by applicant | US20090613594 |