EP2504126 - WAFER POLISHING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Siltron Inc. 274, Imsu-dong Gumi-si Gyeongbuk 730-350 / KR | [2012/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Hyung Rak 265 Bunji Dae-ui-ri Gogyeong-myeon Yeongcheon-si Gyeongbuk 770-842 / KR | [2012/40] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [2020/21] |
Former [2012/40] | Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 11731891.5 | 05.01.2011 | [2020/21] | WO2011KR00034 | Priority number, date | KR20100002311 | 11.01.2010 Original published format: KR 20100002311 | [2012/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011083953 | Date: | 14.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2504126 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2504126 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B24B37/00, H01L21/304, B24B37/08, B24B37/11, B24D13/12 | [2019/49] | CPC: |
B24B37/08 (EP,US);
B24B37/11 (EP,US);
B24D13/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/40] | B24B37/00, H01L21/304 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WAFERPOLIERVORRICHTUNG | [2012/40] | English: | WAFER POLISHING APPARATUS | [2012/40] | French: | APPAREIL DE POLISSAGE DE TRANCHE | [2012/40] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2012 | Search fee paid | 25.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/40] | 03.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2019 | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.01.2011 | AL | 20.05.2020 | AT | 20.05.2020 | CY | 20.05.2020 | CZ | 20.05.2020 | DK | 20.05.2020 | EE | 20.05.2020 | ES | 20.05.2020 | FI | 20.05.2020 | HR | 20.05.2020 | IT | 20.05.2020 | LT | 20.05.2020 | LV | 20.05.2020 | MC | 20.05.2020 | MK | 20.05.2020 | NL | 20.05.2020 | PL | 20.05.2020 | RO | 20.05.2020 | RS | 20.05.2020 | SE | 20.05.2020 | SI | 20.05.2020 | SK | 20.05.2020 | SM | 20.05.2020 | TR | 20.05.2020 | BG | 20.08.2020 | NO | 20.08.2020 | GR | 21.08.2020 | PT | 21.09.2020 | GB | 05.01.2021 | IE | 05.01.2021 | LU | 05.01.2021 | BE | 31.01.2021 | CH | 31.01.2021 | FR | 31.01.2021 | LI | 31.01.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 05.01.2011 | |
AL | 20.05.2020 | ||
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CY | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
MK | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
GB | 05.01.2021 | ||
IE | 05.01.2021 | ||
LU | 05.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 05.01.2011 | |
AL | 20.05.2020 | ||
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CY | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
GB | 05.01.2021 | ||
IE | 05.01.2021 | ||
LU | 05.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CY | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
GB | 05.01.2021 | ||
IE | 05.01.2021 | ||
LU | 05.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
GB | 05.01.2021 | ||
IE | 05.01.2021 | ||
LU | 05.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
GB | 05.01.2021 | ||
IE | 05.01.2021 | ||
LU | 05.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
GB | 05.01.2021 | ||
IE | 05.01.2021 | ||
LU | 05.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
GB | 05.01.2021 | ||
LU | 05.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
GB | 05.01.2021 | ||
LU | 05.01.2021 | ||
FR | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
LU | 05.01.2021 | ||
FR | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
LU | 05.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 20.05.2020 | |
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 20.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5351447 (GRAUERT ROBERT J [US]) [Y] 6 * figure 1 *; | [Y]WO9640473 (CLOVER RICHMOND B [US]) [Y] 11-13 * figures 3,10,18 *; | [XYI]JPH1190801 (TOYO ADVANCED TECH CO) [X] 1,3,4,7-9 * abstract * [Y] 5,6,11-13 [I] 2,10; | [Y]EP1002626 (CHARTERED SEMICONDUCTOR MFG [SG]) [Y] 5 * paragraph [0040]; figures 3B, 4A, 4B *; | [A]JP2001030158 (SONY CORP) [A] 6* figure 2 * | International search | [A]JPH1080861 (SUPER SILICON KENKYUSHO KK); | [X]JPH1190801 (TOYO ADVANCED TECH CO); | [Y]JP2000108022 (SYSTEMSEIKO CO LTD); | [A]JP2009285774 (SHOWA DENKO KK) | by applicant | JPH1190801 |