EP2614229 - REDUCING AGENT DOSING SYSTEM FOR INJECTING A REDUCING AGENT INTO THE EXHAUST-GAS FLOW OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Albonair GmbH Carlo-Schmid-Allee 1 44263 Dortmund / DE | [2013/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KASSEL, Armin Neuer Schlossweg 23 58119 Hagen / DE | 02 /
OVERHOFF, Werner Fährweg 92 45772 Marl / DE | [2013/29] | Representative(s) | Patentanwaltskanzlei Methling Danziger Straße 20 23758 Wangels Hansühn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/45] | Patentanwaltskanzlei Methling An der Kuhl 4 45239 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2013/29] | Methling, Frank-Oliver Patentanwaltskanzlei Methling An der Kuhl 4 45239 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 11732373.3 | 29.06.2011 | WO2011EP03196 | Priority number, date | DE20101044468 | 06.09.2010 Original published format: DE102010044468 | [2013/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012031642 | Date: | 15.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2614229 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2614229 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/20 | [2013/29] | CPC: |
F01N3/2066 (EP,US);
F01N3/20 (KR);
F01N3/24 (KR);
F01N3/28 (KR);
F01N2610/02 (EP,US);
F01N2610/08 (EP,US);
F01N2610/14 (EP,US);
F01N2610/1433 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y10T137/85978 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REDUKTIONSMITTELDOSIERSYSTEM ZUR EINDÜSUNG EINES REDUKTIONSMITTELS IN DEN ABGASSTROM EINES VERBRENNUNGSMOTORS | [2013/29] | English: | REDUCING AGENT DOSING SYSTEM FOR INJECTING A REDUCING AGENT INTO THE EXHAUST-GAS FLOW OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2013/29] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DOSAGE D'AGENT RÉDUCTEUR POUR INJECTION D'UN AGENT RÉDUCTEUR DANS LE FLUX DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT D'UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2013/29] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/29] | 16.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 15.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.06.2011 | AL | 25.02.2015 | BG | 25.02.2015 | CY | 25.02.2015 | CZ | 25.02.2015 | DK | 25.02.2015 | EE | 25.02.2015 | FI | 25.02.2015 | HR | 25.02.2015 | LT | 25.02.2015 | LV | 25.02.2015 | MC | 25.02.2015 | MK | 25.02.2015 | MT | 25.02.2015 | PL | 25.02.2015 | PT | 25.02.2015 | RO | 25.02.2015 | RS | 25.02.2015 | SI | 25.02.2015 | SK | 25.02.2015 | SM | 25.02.2015 | TR | 25.02.2015 | NO | 25.05.2015 | GR | 26.05.2015 | IS | 25.06.2015 | IE | 29.06.2015 | LU | 29.06.2015 | BE | 30.06.2015 | CH | 30.06.2015 | LI | 30.06.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 29.06.2011 | |
BG | 25.02.2015 | ||
CY | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MK | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PT | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
SM | 25.02.2015 | ||
TR | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
IE | 29.06.2015 | ||
LU | 29.06.2015 | ||
BE | 30.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 29.06.2011 | |
BG | 25.02.2015 | ||
CY | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
SM | 25.02.2015 | ||
TR | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
IE | 29.06.2015 | ||
LU | 29.06.2015 | ||
BE | 30.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
IE | 29.06.2015 | ||
LU | 29.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
IE | 29.06.2015 | ||
LU | 29.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
IE | 29.06.2015 | ||
LU | 29.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
LU | 29.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 25.02.2015 | |
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
RS | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | FI | 25.02.2015 | |
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 25.02.2015 | |
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 25.02.2015 | |
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 25.02.2015 | |
NO | 25.05.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1195500 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1-6* column 9, line 28 - line 58; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2010115932 (KASSEL ARMIN [DE], et al) [A] 1,7,8,10 * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0076]; figures 1-3 * | Examination | EP1676988 |