EP2591411 - DEVICE, METHOD, AND GRAPHICAL USER INTERFACE FOR USER INTERFACE SCREEN NAVIGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2013/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAMES, Bryan, J. 327 Chester Street Menlo Park CA 94025 / US | 02 /
WOOD, Policarpo, Bonilla, Jr. 269 Anderson Street San Francisco CA 94110 / US | 03 /
FINO, Jorge 1799 Camino Leonor San Jose CA 95131 / US | 04 /
LEE, Jeffrey, Theodore 2378 Villanova Road San Jose CA 95130 / US | [2013/20] | Representative(s) | Gillard, Matthew Paul, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | Gillard, Matthew Paul, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 11733962.2 | 08.07.2011 | WO2011US43302 | Priority number, date | US20100832900 | 08.07.2010 Original published format: US 832900 | [2013/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012006494 | Date: | 12.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2591411 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/048 | [2013/20] | CPC: |
G06F3/04883 (EP,US);
G06F3/0481 (KR);
G06F1/1643 (EP,US);
G06F3/0482 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04808 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/20] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND GRAFISCHE BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLE FÜR NAVIGATION AUF EINEM BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLENSCHIRM | [2013/20] | English: | DEVICE, METHOD, AND GRAPHICAL USER INTERFACE FOR USER INTERFACE SCREEN NAVIGATION | [2013/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF, PROCÉDÉ ET INTERFACE GRAPHIQUE UTILISATEUR POUR UNE NAVIGATION SUR DES ÉCRANS D'INTERFACE UTILISATEUR | [2013/20] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/20] | 22.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/07] | 16.09.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/07] | 30.09.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.01.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2009064055 (CHAUDHRI IMRAN A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,10-22,24-26,30-37 * page 7, paragraph 83 - paragraph 84; figure 8B * * page 8, paragraph 95 * [Y] 7-9,27-29 [I] 3,23; | [Y]WO2006020305 (APPLE COMPUTER [US], et al) [Y] 7-9,27-29 * page 30, line 28 - page 31, line 26; figures 20,21A-21D,23A * * page 31, line 9 - line 13 *; | [A]US7458014 (RUBIN DARRYL E [US], et al) [A] 1-37 * column 21, line 1 - line 36; figures 5,11 *; | [A]US2002126148 (ROSENKRANZ DANIEL [CH], et al) [A] 1-37 * page 2, paragraph 35 - paragraph 37; figure 4 *; | [A]US2009278806 (DUARTE MATIAS GONZALO [US], et al) [A] 1-37 * page 4, paragraph 0076; figure 4W * * page 5, paragraph 0093 * * page 7, paragraph 0122 *; | [A]US2009007017 (ANZURES FREDDY ALLEN [US], et al) [A] 1-37 * page 23, paragraph 341 - page 24, paragraph 342; figure 11C * | Examination | US2008168349 | by applicant | US6323846 | US6570557 | US6677932 | US2002015024 | US2005190059 | US2006017692 | US20060459606 | US20060459615 | US20050322549 | US20060381313 | US20040840862 | US20040903964 | US20050048264 | US20050038590 | US20050228758 | US20050228700 | US20050228737 | US20060367749 | US20050241839 | US20050240788 | US20110070207 | US20060586862 | US20060638251 | US20070936562 | US20070968067 |