EP2462265 - FILAMENTS COMPRISING AN ACTIVE AGENT, NONWOVEN WEBS AND METHODS FOR MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/24] | FILAMENTS COMPRISING AN ACTIVE AGENT NONWOVEN WEBS AND METHODS FOR MAKING SAME | ||
[2016/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2016/28] |
Former [2012/24] | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | ||
For all designated states Hodson, Stephen Joseph 3450 Ash Meadow Lane Franklin, OH 45005 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLENN, Robert, Wayne, Jr. 7930 Royal Fern Court Liberty Township, OH 45044 / US | 02 /
GORDON, Gregory, Charles 6340 Gallaher Court Loveland, OH 45140 / US | 03 /
SIVIK, Mark, Robert 4424 Village Ridge Drive Mason, OH 45040 / US | 04 /
RICHARDS, Mark, Ryan 3660 Pennington Way Hamilton, OH 45011 / US | 05 /
HEINZMAN, Stephen, Wayne 3588 Mooney Avenue Cincinnati, OH 45208 / US | 06 /
JAMES, Michael, David 30 Arcadia Place Cincinnati, OH 45208 / US | 07 /
REYNOLDS, Geoffrey, William 10692 Deershadow Lane Montgomery, OH 45242 / US | 08 /
TROKHAN, Paul, Dennis 1356 Warvel Road Hamilton, OH 45013 / US | 09 /
WEISMAN, Paul, Thomas 10435 Rachel Anne Court Cincinnati, OH 45241 / US | 10 /
HAMAD-EBRAHIMPOUR, Alyssandrea, Hope 8880 Sandymar Drive Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | 11 /
DENOME, Frank, William 6234 Elmhill Court Cincinnati, OH 45248 / US | 12 /
HODSON, Stephen, Joseph 3450 Ash Meadow Lane Franklin, OH 45005 / US | [2012/24] | Representative(s) | Pickford, James Lawrence Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | [2013/38] |
Former [2012/50] | Goodier, Claire-Louise N.V.Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [2012/24] | Heide, Ute Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 11734211.3 | 30.06.2011 | [2017/32] | WO2011US42577 | Priority number, date | US20100361126P | 02.07.2010 Original published format: US 361126 P | [2012/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012003307 | Date: | 05.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2462265 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2462265 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | D01F1/10, C11D17/04 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
D01F1/10 (EP,US);
C11D17/041 (EP,US);
D04H3/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FASERN MIT WIRKSTOFF-VLIESNETZEN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2012/24] | English: | FILAMENTS COMPRISING AN ACTIVE AGENT, NONWOVEN WEBS AND METHODS FOR MAKING SAME | [2016/44] | French: | FILAMENTS COMPRENANT DES VOILES NON TISSÉES À AGENT ACTIF, ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION DE CES FILAMENTS | [2012/24] |
Former [2012/24] | FILAMENTS COMPRISING AN ACTIVE AGENT NONWOVEN WEBS AND METHODS FOR MAKING SAME | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/24] | 02.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 29.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/29] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 29.06.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 29.06.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.07.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2011 | AL | 09.08.2017 | AT | 09.08.2017 | CY | 09.08.2017 | CZ | 09.08.2017 | DK | 09.08.2017 | EE | 09.08.2017 | ES | 09.08.2017 | FI | 09.08.2017 | HR | 09.08.2017 | IT | 09.08.2017 | LT | 09.08.2017 | LV | 09.08.2017 | MC | 09.08.2017 | MK | 09.08.2017 | NL | 09.08.2017 | PL | 09.08.2017 | PT | 09.08.2017 | RO | 09.08.2017 | RS | 09.08.2017 | SE | 09.08.2017 | SI | 09.08.2017 | SK | 09.08.2017 | SM | 09.08.2017 | TR | 09.08.2017 | BG | 09.11.2017 | NO | 09.11.2017 | GR | 10.11.2017 | IS | 09.12.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 30.06.2011 | |
AT | 09.08.2017 | ||
CY | 09.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
MK | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PT | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 30.06.2011 | |
AT | 09.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PT | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 09.08.2017 | |
NO | 09.11.2017 | Cited in | International search | [I]US5120888 (NOHR RONALD S [US], et al) [I] 1-5,7-14 * claim - *; | [A]US6207274 (FERENC DIONISIO [AR], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 7 * * column 12, line 51 - line 58 ** claim - *; | [A]WO2005068604 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 21 - line 25 * * claim - *; | [XI]EP1887036 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,4-6,10,12-14 * examples 3,12 * * claim - * [I] 2,3,7,9,11; | [I]US2009041820 (WU MARGARET M [US], et al) [I] 1-4,7-14 * claims 36-51 * |