EP2526480 - SOCIAL AND CONTEXTUAL SEARCHING FOR ENTERPRISE BUSINESS APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magnet Systems, Inc. 471 Emerson Street Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | [2012/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHUANG, Alfred, S. 13938 La Paloma Los Altos Hills CA 94022 / US | [2012/48] | Representative(s) | Smith, Samuel Leonard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2012/48] | Application number, filing date | 11735049.6 | 18.01.2011 | WO2011US21568 | Priority number, date | US20100691621 | 21.01.2010 Original published format: US 691621 | [2012/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011090945 | Date: | 28.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2526480 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.07.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/00, G06F17/30 | [2015/14] | CPC: |
G06F16/9535 (EP,US);
G06F16/24578 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/48] | G06F7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/48] | Title | German: | SOZIALE UND KONTEXTBEZOGENE SUCHE FÜR UNTERNEHMENSGESCHÄFTSANWENDUNGEN | [2012/48] | English: | SOCIAL AND CONTEXTUAL SEARCHING FOR ENTERPRISE BUSINESS APPLICATIONS | [2012/48] | French: | RECHERCHE SOCIALE ET CONTEXTUELLE POUR LES APPLICATIONS D'ENTREPRISE | [2012/48] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 17.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/48] | 19.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/12] | 02.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2009006388 (IVES STEPHEN [GB], et al) [I] 1-13 * paragraphs [0071] , [ 105] , [ 113]; figure 1 *; | [I]US2005216457 (WALTHER ECKART [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0062] , [0 67] , [ 161] *; | [I]US2006195428 (PECKOVER DOUGLAS [US]) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0073] , [ 141] , [ 192]; figure 2 * | International search | [X]US2009282002 (REEDER TRAVIS [US], et al); | [X]US2009171941 (STERN EDITH HELEN [US], et al); | [X]US2007203906 (CONE JULIAN M [NZ], et al); | [X]US2006167942 (LUCAS SCOTT G [US], et al); | [A]US2009204601 (GRASSET NICOLAS [SE]); | [A]US2006218111 (COHEN HUNTER C [US]); | [A]US2006129538 (BAADER ANDREA [DE], et al); | [A]US2006004789 (LUNT CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) |