EP2528855 - FULLERENE-DOPED NANOSTRUCTURES AND METHODS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.12.2015 [2015/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University 1705 El Camino Real Palo Alto, CA 94306-1106 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University 1705 El Camino Real Palo Alto, CA 94306-1106 / US | ||
Former [2012/49] | For all designated states The Board of Regents of the Leland Stanford Junior University 1705 Camino Real Palo Alto, CA 94306-1106 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEMIEUX, Melburne, C. 40 Sylvan Way La Honda CA 94020 / US | 02 /
VIRKAR, Ajay 334 Olmsted Road Apt. 336 Stanford CA 94305 / US | 03 /
BAO, Zhenan 848 Mayfield Avenue Stanford CA 94305 / US | [2012/49] | Representative(s) | Brookes IP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/49] | Brookes Batchellor LLP 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | Application number, filing date | 11735236.9 | 21.01.2011 | WO2011US22071 | Priority number, date | US20100298043P | 25.01.2010 Original published format: US 298043 P | [2012/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011091263 | Date: | 28.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2528855 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B82B1/00, B82B3/00 | [2012/49] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
B82B3/00 (KR);
H10K85/221 (US);
B82B1/00 (KR);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US);
C01B32/174 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/49] | Title | German: | FULLERENDOTIERTE NANOSTRUKTUREN UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2012/49] | English: | FULLERENE-DOPED NANOSTRUCTURES AND METHODS THEREFOR | [2012/49] | French: | NANOSTRUCTURES DOPÉES PAR FULLERÈNE ET PROCÉDÉS CORRESPONDANTS | [2012/49] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 21.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/49] | 04.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2004194705 (DAI HONGJIE [US], et al); | [Y]US2008001141 (GRUNER GEORGE [US], et al); | [Y]US2008191606 (GEOHEGAN DAVID BRUCE [US], et al); | [Y]US2009226704 (KAUPPINEN ESKO I [FI], et al); | [Y]US2010003781 (VAN DUREN JEROEN K J [US], et al); | [X]US2010012923 (HIURA HIDEFUMI [JP], et al) |