EP2597966 - HARD COATING WITH ERYTHRITOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cargill, Incorporated 15407 McGinty Road West Wayzata, MN 55391 / US | [2013/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORTEBEECK, Bart Merkezeel 18 B-2830 Willebroek / BE | 02 /
VERCAUTEREN, Ronny Leontina Marcel Bergstraat 29 B-9120 Beveren / BE | 03 /
HEYLEN, An Amanda, Jules Linterpoortenlaan 242 B-1980 Zemst / BE | [2013/23] | Representative(s) | Elseviers, Myriam, et al Cargill R&D Centre Europe BVBA Bedrijvenlaan 9 2800 Mechelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | Elseviers, Myriam, et al Cargill Europe bvba Law-IP Department Bedrijvenlaan 9 2800 Mechelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 11735795.4 | 12.07.2011 | WO2011EP03474 | Priority number, date | EP20100007772 | 27.07.2010 Original published format: EP 10007772 | [2013/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012013295 | Date: | 02.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2597966 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A23G4/06, A23G4/20, A23G3/34, A23L1/00, A23G3/54 | [2015/40] | CPC: |
A23G3/34 (EP,US);
A23G4/20 (EP,KR,US);
A23G4/062 (US);
A23G3/0002 (KR);
A23G3/343 (EP,US);
A23G3/54 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/23] | A23L1/00, A23G3/54, A23G4/20, A23G3/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/23] | Title | German: | HARTBESCHICHTUNG MIT ERYTHRITOL | [2013/23] | English: | HARD COATING WITH ERYTHRITOL | [2013/23] | French: | REVÊTEMENT DUR CONTENANT DE L'ÉRYTHRITOL | [2013/23] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/23] | 17.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/29] | 07.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2007048418 (JOHNSTON ANDREW G [GB], et al); | [A]JP2007176908 (TOWA CHEMICAL IND); | [A]WO2008100851 (WRIGLEY W M JUN CO [US], et al); | [A]WO2009036954 (CARGILL INC [US], et al) | by applicant | US4238510 | US4423086 | US4681766 | US4786511 | US4828845 | US4840797 | WO9507625 | US5536511 | EP1057414 | WO2009016133 | WO2009036954 |