EP2582697 - NANOSTRUCTURED APREPITANT COMPOSITIONS, PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.04.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nanoform Cardiovascular Therapeutics Limited 100 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BN / GB | [2017/24] |
Former [2013/17] | For all designated states Druggability Technologies IP Holdco (Jersey) Limited 12 Castle Street St. Helier Jersey JE2 3RT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FILIPCSEI, Genovéva Petneházy utca 66. I/103. H-1135 Budapest / HU | 02 /
ÖTVÖS, Zsolt Raisio utca 4, I/2. H-6640 Csongrád / HU | 03 /
HELTOVICS, Gábor Bíró utca 12. H-1122 Budapest / HU | 04 /
DARVAS, Ferenc Lisznyai utca 15. H-1016 Budapest / HU | [2017/39] |
Former [2013/17] | 01 /
FILIPCSEI, Genovéva Petneházy utca 66. I/103. H-1135 Budapest / HU | ||
02 /
ÖTVÖS, Zsolt Raisio utca 4, I/2. H-6640Csongrád / HU | |||
03 /
HELTOVICS, Gábor Bíró utca 12. H-1122 Budapest / HU | |||
04 /
DARVAS, Ferenc Lisznyai utca 15. H-1016 Budapest / HU | Representative(s) | Molnar, Istvan DANUBIA Patent and Law Office LLC POB 198 1368 Budapest / HU | [2017/39] |
Former [2013/17] | Molnar, Istvan DANUBIA Patent and Law Office LLC POB 198 1368 Budapest / HU | Application number, filing date | 11736150.1 | 17.06.2011 | [2017/39] | WO2011HU00057 | Priority number, date | HU2010P000325 | 18.06.2010 Original published format: HU P1000325 | [2013/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011158053 | Date: | 22.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2582697 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2582697 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D413/06, A61P9/08, A61K31/5377 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
A61K9/14 (EP,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
A61P1/08 (EP);
A61P39/02 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
C07D413/06 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2982 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NANOSTRUKTURIERTE APREPITANT-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DAMIT | [2013/17] | English: | NANOSTRUCTURED APREPITANT COMPOSITIONS, PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THEM | [2013/17] | French: | COMPOSITIONS NANOSTRUCTURÉES D'APRÉPITANT, LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION, ET COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES LES CONTENANT | [2013/17] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 14.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.06.2018
02.07.2018
ADMISSIBLE Alkermes Pharma Ireland Limited Connaught House 1 Burlington Road Dublin 4 / IE Opponent's representative Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [2018/32] | 11.07.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 30.03.2020 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   01.12.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 27.09.2017 | AT | 27.09.2017 | CY | 27.09.2017 | CZ | 27.09.2017 | EE | 27.09.2017 | FI | 27.09.2017 | HR | 27.09.2017 | LT | 27.09.2017 | LV | 27.09.2017 | MK | 27.09.2017 | PL | 27.09.2017 | PT | 27.09.2017 | RO | 27.09.2017 | RS | 27.09.2017 | SI | 27.09.2017 | SK | 27.09.2017 | SM | 27.09.2017 | TR | 27.09.2017 | BG | 27.12.2017 | NO | 27.12.2017 | GR | 28.12.2017 | IS | 27.01.2018 | GB | 17.06.2019 | IE | 17.06.2019 | IT | 17.06.2019 | LU | 17.06.2019 | MT | 17.06.2019 | ES | 18.06.2019 | HU | 18.06.2019 | SE | 18.06.2019 | BE | 30.06.2019 | CH | 30.06.2019 | DK | 30.06.2019 | FR | 30.06.2019 | LI | 30.06.2019 | MC | 01.07.2019 | NL | 01.07.2019 | DE | 01.01.2020 | [2024/40] |
Former [2022/34] | AL | 27.09.2017 | |
AT | 27.09.2017 | ||
CY | 27.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MK | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
GB | 17.06.2019 | ||
IE | 17.06.2019 | ||
IT | 17.06.2019 | ||
LU | 17.06.2019 | ||
ES | 18.06.2019 | ||
HU | 18.06.2019 | ||
SE | 18.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
DK | 30.06.2019 | ||
FR | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
MC | 01.07.2019 | ||
NL | 01.07.2019 | ||
DE | 01.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 27.09.2017 | |
AT | 27.09.2017 | ||
CY | 27.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MK | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
GB | 17.06.2019 | ||
IE | 17.06.2019 | ||
IT | 17.06.2019 | ||
LU | 17.06.2019 | ||
HU | 18.06.2019 | ||
SE | 18.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
DK | 30.06.2019 | ||
FR | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
MC | 01.07.2019 | ||
NL | 01.07.2019 | ||
DE | 01.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | AL | 27.09.2017 | |
AT | 27.09.2017 | ||
CY | 27.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MK | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
GB | 17.06.2019 | ||
IE | 17.06.2019 | ||
IT | 17.06.2019 | ||
LU | 17.06.2019 | ||
HU | 18.06.2019 | ||
SE | 18.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
FR | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
MC | 01.07.2019 | ||
NL | 01.07.2019 | ||
DE | 01.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/31] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CY | 27.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MK | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
GB | 17.06.2019 | ||
IE | 17.06.2019 | ||
IT | 17.06.2019 | ||
LU | 17.06.2019 | ||
HU | 18.06.2019 | ||
SE | 18.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
FR | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
MC | 01.07.2019 | ||
NL | 01.07.2019 | ||
DE | 01.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
GB | 17.06.2019 | ||
IE | 17.06.2019 | ||
IT | 17.06.2019 | ||
LU | 17.06.2019 | ||
HU | 18.06.2019 | ||
SE | 18.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
FR | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
MC | 01.07.2019 | ||
NL | 01.07.2019 | ||
DE | 01.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
GB | 17.06.2019 | ||
IE | 17.06.2019 | ||
IT | 17.06.2019 | ||
LU | 17.06.2019 | ||
HU | 18.06.2019 | ||
SE | 18.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
MC | 01.07.2019 | ||
NL | 01.07.2019 | ||
DE | 01.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
GB | 17.06.2019 | ||
IE | 17.06.2019 | ||
IT | 17.06.2019 | ||
LU | 17.06.2019 | ||
HU | 18.06.2019 | ||
SE | 18.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
MC | 01.07.2019 | ||
NL | 01.07.2019 | ||
DE | 01.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
GB | 17.06.2019 | ||
IE | 17.06.2019 | ||
IT | 17.06.2019 | ||
HU | 18.06.2019 | ||
SE | 18.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
MC | 01.07.2019 | ||
NL | 01.07.2019 | ||
DE | 01.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
GB | 17.06.2019 | ||
IE | 17.06.2019 | ||
IT | 17.06.2019 | ||
HU | 18.06.2019 | ||
SE | 18.06.2019 | ||
MC | 01.07.2019 | ||
NL | 01.07.2019 | ||
DE | 01.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
IE | 17.06.2019 | ||
SE | 18.06.2019 | ||
MC | 01.07.2019 | ||
NL | 01.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/20] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
SE | 18.06.2019 | ||
MC | 01.07.2019 | ||
NL | 01.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
SE | 18.06.2019 | ||
MC | 01.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
SE | 18.06.2019 | ||
MC | 01.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
MC | 01.07.2019 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 27.09.2017 | |
NO | 27.12.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03049718 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * claim 3 *; | [X]WO2007088483 (GLENMARK PAHRMACEUTICALS LTD [IN], et al) [X] 1-8 * Examples *; | [X]WO2008104512 (SANDOZ AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-8 * Figures;; claim 1 *; | [X]WO2009131930 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * figure 2 *; | [XP]WO2010092591 (USV LTD [IN], et al) [XP] 1-8 * claim 1 *; | [XP]WO2010140132 (RANBAXY LAB LTD [IN], et al) [XP] 1-8* the whole document *; | [X] - SHONO Y ET AL, "Forecasting in vivo oral absorption and food effect of micronized and nanosized aprepitant formulations in humans", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS AND BIOPHARMACEUTICS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 76, no. 1, ISSN 0939-6411, (20100601), pages 95 - 104, (20100601), XP027210087 [X] 1-8 * figure 8 * | [X] - WU Y ET AL, "The role of biopharmaceutics in the development of a clinical nanoparticle formulation of MK-0869: a Beagle dog model predicts improved bioavailability and diminished food effect on absorption in human", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, (20041105), vol. 285, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.IJPHARM.2004.08.001, ISSN 0378-5173, pages 135 - 146, XP004602823 [X] 1-8 * paragraph [2.3.1] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijpharm.2004.08.001 | [I] - IAN OLVER ET AL, "Nanomedicines in the treatment of emesis during chemotherapy: focus on aprepitant", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF NANOMEDICINE, DOVE MEDICAL PRESS LTD, AUCKLAND, NZ, (20070501), vol. 2, no. 1, doi:10.2147/IJN.S, ISSN 1176-9114, pages 13 - 18, XP009152304 [I] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2147/IJN.S | by applicant | US5145684 | US5534270 | US5543133 | US5665331 | US5719147 | US5718388 | US5862999 | US6048859 | US6096742 | US6235735 | WO2007016582 | WO2007088483 | WO2007112457 | WO2007147160 | WO2008044102 | US2008214535 | WO2008104512 | WO2009001203 | WO2009108828 | Opposition | US4826689 | US5145684 | US2007104792 | EP1455756 | WO2009133418 | - WU et al., "The role of biopharmaceutics in the development of a clinical nanoparticle formulation of MK-0869: a Beagle dog model predicts improved bioavailability and diminished food effect on absorption in human.", International Journal of Pharmaceutics, (20041105), vol. 285, pages 135 - 146, XP004602823 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijpharm.2004.08.001 | - MERISKO-LIVERSIDGE ET AL et al., Advanced Drug Delivery Reviews, (20110109), vol. 63, pages 427 - 440, XP028374102 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addr.2010.12.007 | - C TIMPE, "Combining Science and technology to create advanced drug delivery systems", APV fOCUS Group Drug Delivery, International Association for Pharmaceutical Technology Newsletter, (20100000), pages 1 - 16, XP055515006 | - ANGI ET AL et al., "Novel continuous flow technology for the development of a nanostructured Aprepitant formulation with improved pharmacokinetic properties", European Journal of Pharmaceutics & Biopharmaceutics, (20140000), vol. 86, pages 361 - 368, XP028845346 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejpb.2013.10.004 | - MOSCHWITZER et al., "Chapter 5", MOSCHWITZER et al., THASSU D. ET AL., Nanoparticulate drug Delivery Systems, (20050629), pages 71 - 88, ISBN 0-8493-9073-7, XP055515020 | - ALI et al., "Preparation of hydrocortisone nanosuspension through a bottom-up nanoprecipitation technique using microfluidic reactors.", International Journal of Pharmaceutics, (20090000), vol. 375, pages 107 - 113, XP026143342 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijpharm.2009.03.029 | - M. AULTON, Pharmaceutics: the science of dosage form design, (19880000), pages 277 - 278, ISBN 0-443-03643-8, XP055515040 | - "Emend aprepitant capsul", FDA NDA 21-549, (20030300), pages 21 - 549, XP055515592 | - "Emend (fosaprepitant dimenglumine)", Emend (powder) FDA label NDA 22-023, (20080000), pages 1-17 - 2, 3, XP055515599 | - "SOLUPLUS 005346234", EUIPO, (20180524), pages 1 - 3, XP055515609 | - E. FALLON, Declaration | - CHEN et al., "Quantitative Analysis of Powder Mixtures by Raman Spectrometry: the influence of particle size and its correction", Analytical Chemistry, (20120000), vol. 84, no. 9, pages 4088 - 4094, XP055515615 |