EP2529184 - SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND APPARATUSES FOR PROVIDING CONTEXT-BASED NAVIGATION SERVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2012/49] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERONEN, Antti Johannes Rintamaenkatu 13 A 6 FIN-33820 Tampere / FI | 02 /
LEPPANEN, Jussi Artturi Kossinkatu 1B FIN-33580 Tampere / FI | 03 /
HANNUKSELA, Miska Matias Pitkatie 14 FIN-36110 Ruutana / FI | [2012/49] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2012/49] | Jaatinen, Jussi Imari Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department PO Box 407 00045 Nokia Group / FI | Application number, filing date | 11736693.0 | 26.01.2011 | WO2011IB50348 | Priority number, date | US20100299671P | 29.01.2010 Original published format: US 299671 P | [2012/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011092639 | Date: | 04.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2529184 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 04.08.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/34, G01C21/20 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
G01C21/3484 (EP,US);
G01C21/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/49] | G01C21/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/49] | Title | German: | SYSTEME, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG KONTEXTBASIERTER NAVIGATIONSDIENSTE | [2012/49] | English: | SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND APPARATUSES FOR PROVIDING CONTEXT-BASED NAVIGATION SERVICES | [2012/49] | French: | SYSTÈMES, PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREILS DE DÉLIVRANCE DE SERVICES DE NAVIGATION À BASE DE CONTEXTE | [2012/49] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 28.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/49] | 08.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/09] | 14.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1612707 (NAVTEQ NORTH AMERICA LLC [US]) [X] 1,7,8* paragraphs [0049] - [0055] - [0068] , [0084] *; | [X]US2009063099 (COUNTS SCOTT J [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0002] , [0005] , [0007] , [0008] , [0037] , [0038] , [0045]; figure - * | International search | [A]US2006041378 (CHENG HUA [US], et al); | [A]US2007027591 (GOLDENBERG SHARON [IL], et al); | [X]DE102007025352 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [XP]US7831433 (BELVIN ROBERT [US], et al); | [X] - ANYA, O. ET AL., "Towards multi-perspective intelligent layout design for context-driven route navigation.", EMS 2008, EUROPEAN MODELLING SYMPOSIUM, 2ND UKSIM EUROPEAN SYMPOSIUM ON COMPUTER MODELLING AND SIMULATION. 8-10 SEP. 2008., (20080908), pages 400 - 405, XP031321150 | [A] - BRADLEY N.A. ET AL., "Understanding contextual interaction to design navigational context-aware applications. Human Computer Interaction with Mobile Devices.", 4TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM, MOBILE HCI 2002. PROCEEDINGS., (2002), pages 349 - 353, XP008160023 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-45756-9_37 |