EP2528603 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS FOR THE TREATMENT OF PAIN AND OTHER INDICATONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.09.2015 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.10.2015 [2015/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | [2012/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOBANIAN, Harry 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 02 /
LIN, Linus, S. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 03 /
LIU, Ping 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 04 /
CHOIDA, Marc, D. 10 Commercial Avenue, Suite 3-C New Brunswick, New Jersey 08901 / US | 05 /
DEVITA, Robert, J. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 06 /
NARGRUND, Ravi, P. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 07 /
GUO, Yan 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 08 /
HAMILL, Terence 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point, Pennsylvania 19486 / US | 09 /
LI, Wenping 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point, Pennsylvania 19486 / US | 10 /
HENZE, Darrell, A. 770 Sumneytown Pike West Point, Pennsylvania 19486 / US | [2012/49] | Representative(s) | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 120 Moorgate London, EC2M 6UR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/49] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 11737514.7 | 25.01.2011 | WO2011US22412 | Priority number, date | US20100299087P | 28.01.2010 Original published format: US 299087 P | [2012/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011094209 | Date: | 04.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2528603 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.08.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/42 | [2012/49] | CPC: |
A61K31/4178 (EP,US);
A61K31/42 (KR);
A61K31/422 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/49] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON SCHMERZ UND ANDEREN ANZEIGEN | [2012/49] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS FOR THE TREATMENT OF PAIN AND OTHER INDICATONS | [2012/49] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA DOULEUR ET D'AUTRES INDICATIONS | [2012/49] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 28.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/49] | 05.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/42] | 21.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.12.2014 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 05.06.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 05.06.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.07.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 05.06.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 05.06.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.07.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2010017079 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-16,25 * The preferred compounds of formula (I) of the present application, as FAAH inhibitors and their use for the treatment of pain and other conditions which benefit from inhibition of FAAH, (e.g. obesity), alone or in combination with other agents (e.g.lowering cholesterol levels: see page 3, lines 21-28; page 19, lines 10-20; examples 1-138 and claims *; | [Y]WO2009152025 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-16,25 * See the FAAH inhibitors comprising an imidazole ring, and their use for the treatment of pain and other disorders which benefit from inhibition of FAAH, such as obsity, alone or in combination with another active agent: see page 3, lines 21-28; page 17, lines 13-38; page 19, lines 11-15; claims and examples in tables 1-148 *; | [Y]US2010004261 (APODACA RICHARD [US], et al) [Y] 1-16,25 * FAAH inhibitors for use in the treatment of pain and other disorders, alone or in combination with other analgesic agents: see paragraphs 3-15, 276, 283, claims 1, 35, 36 *; | [Y]WO2008147553 (BOGER DALE L [US]) [Y] 1-16,25 * Oxazole compounds as FAAH inhibitors for use in the treatment of pain and other conditions *; | [Y]WO2009151991 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-16,25 * Pyrazol compounds as FAAH inhibitors for treatment of pain and other diseases *; | [Y] - NAIDU P S ET AL, "Synergy between enzyme inhibitors of fatty acid amide hydrolase and cyclooxygenase in visceral nociception", JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL THERAPEUTICS 200904 US, (200904), vol. 329, no. 1, ISSN 0022-3565, pages 48 - 56, XP002703294 [Y] 1-16,25 * Combination of a FAAH inhibitor (URB597) and an NSAIDs (diclofenac) produces a synergistic effect in the treatment of pain: see abstract; pages 51-52, and figure 4. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/jpet.108.143487 | [Y] - PIL'O S G ET AL, "Synthesis of new 5-mercapto-1,3-oxazole derivatives on the basis of 2-acylamino-3,3-dichloroacrylnitriles and their analogs", RUSSIAN JOURNAL OF GENERAL CHEMISTRY, PLEIADES PUBLISHING / SPRINGER, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20020101), vol. 72, no. 11, doi:10.1023/A:1023333011230, ISSN 1070-3632, pages 1714 - 1723, XP002553243 [Y] 1-16,25 * See the compounds having the registry numbers: 537709-43-6 and 537709-95-8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1023333011230 | [Y] - KREISBERG J D ET AL, "Pummerer reaction methodology for the synthesis of 5-thiophenyl substituted oxazoles", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20021007), vol. 43, no. 41, doi:10.1016/S0040-4039(02)01704-5, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 7393 - 7396, XP004389301 [Y] 1-16,25 * See compound 17 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(02)01704-5 | International search | [Y]US2010004261 (APODACA RICHARD [US], et al); | [Y]US2008275046 (CELANIRE SYLVAIN [FR], et al); | [Y]WO2009152025 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) |