EP2539781 - DIGITAL JUKEBOX DEVICE WITH IMPROVED USER INTERFACES, AND ASSOCIATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2020 [2020/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TouchTunes Music Corporation 850 Third Avenue, Suite 15C New York, NY 10022 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | For all designated states Touchtunes Music Corporation 850 Third Avenue, Suite 15C New York NY 10022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEAUMIER, Francois C/o Touchtunes Music Corporation 740 Broadway Suite 1102 New York, NY 10003 / US | 02 /
DESMARAIS, Remi C/o Touchtunes Music Corporation 740 Broadway Suite 1102 New York, NY 10003 / US | 03 /
HEBERT, Sebastien C/o Touchtunes Music Corporation 740 Broadway Suite 1102 New York, NY 10003 / US | 04 /
GRATTON, Loic C/o Touchtunes Music Corporation 740 Broadway Suite 1102 New York, NY 10003 / US | 05 /
KHENFIR, Mounir C/o Touchtunes Music Corporation 740 Broadway Suite 1102 New York, NY 10003 / US | 06 /
RIVERA, Ed C/o Touchtunes Music Corporation 740 Broadway Suite1102 New York, NY 10003 / US | 07 /
TOOKER, Michael C/o Touchtunes Music Corporation 740 Broadway Suite 1102 New York, NY 10003 / US | 08 /
POMPIDOR, Christian C/o Touchtunes Music Corporation 740 Broadway Suite 1102 New York, NY 10003 / US | [2013/01] | Representative(s) | Asquith, Julian Peter, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | Debay, Yves Cabinet Debay 126 Elysée 2 78170 La Celle Saint Cloud / FR | Application number, filing date | 11737592.3 | 26.01.2011 | WO2011US22598 | Priority number, date | US20110431036P | 09.01.2011 Original published format: US 431036 P | US20100298509P | 26.01.2010 Original published format: US 298509 P | [2013/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011094330 | Date: | 04.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2539781 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.08.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G05B15/00, G06F3/0488, G08B13/196, G06Q30/02, G06Q50/00, G11B27/10, G11B27/34, G07F11/00, G06F3/0484 | [2016/49] | CPC: |
H05B45/20 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/048 (KR);
G11B27/105 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/0481 (US);
G06F3/0482 (US);
G06F3/04847 (US);
G06F3/0485 (US);
G06F3/0488 (US);
G06F3/14 (KR);
G06F3/165 (US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q50/01 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q50/40 (KR);
G07F17/305 (EP,CN,US);
G07F9/001 (EP,CN,US);
G07F9/002 (EP,CN,US);
G07F9/009 (EP);
G08B13/19632 (US);
G11B20/10 (KR);
G11B27/34 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/239 (US);
H04N21/42203 (US);
H04N21/4223 (US);
H04N21/4788 (US);
H04N7/183 (US);
H05B33/10 (EP,US);
H05B45/10 (US);
H05B47/155 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/04883 (US);
G11B2220/41 (EP,CN,US);
Y10T29/49005 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/01] | G05B15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/01] | Title | German: | DIGITALE JUKEBOX-VORRICHTUNG MIT VERBESSERTEN BENUTZEROBERFLÄCHEN SOWIE ENTSPRECHENDE VERFAHREN | [2013/01] | English: | DIGITAL JUKEBOX DEVICE WITH IMPROVED USER INTERFACES, AND ASSOCIATED METHODS | [2013/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE JUKE-BOX NUMÉRIQUE AYANT DES INTERFACES D'UTILISATEUR PERFECTIONNÉES, ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2013/01] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2012 | Search fee paid | 23.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2012 | Examination requested [2013/01] | 01.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/53] | 21.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/53] | Divisional application(s) | EP12075107.8 / EP2568775 | EP12075108.6 / EP2597608 | EP12075109.4 / EP2568472 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.02.2019 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 15.11.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 15.11.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.11.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2020 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2007086280 (CAPPELLO PAUL [US], et al) [Y] 8-13 * paragraphs [0012] , [0027] , [0030] , [0037] - paragraph [0041] *; | [XY]US2008086379 (DION DOMINIQUE [CA], et al) [X] 1-7,14,15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0006] - paragraphs [0007] , [0016] * * paragraph [0092] - paragraphs [0103] , [0113] , [0124] , [0167] , [0217]; figures 3,4,16,19,26 * * paragraph [0233] - paragraphs [0235] , [0246] , [0264] , [0265] * [Y] 8-13; | [Y]US2008222546 (MUDD DENNIS M [US], et al) [Y] 8-10* paragraphs [0006] , [0042] , [0065] , [0137] - paragraph [0138]; figures 8, 35; table 4 * | International search | [Y]US2006239131 (NATHAN GUY [CA], et al); | [A]US2007247979 (BRILLON FRANCOIS [CA], et al); | [X]US2008086379 (DION DOMINIQUE [CA], et al); | [Y]US2009172565 (JACKSON JOHN CLARKE [US], et al) | by applicant | US6308204 | US20070902790 |